Dalton et al v. Biden et al
Plaintiff: Zebediah George Dalton, Blueribbon Coalition, Kyle Kimmerle and Suzette Ranea Morris
Defendant: Joseph R. Biden, Jr., Debra A. Haaland, Department of the Interior, Tracy Stone-Manning, Bureau of Land Management, Thomas J. Vilsack, Department of Agriculture, Randy Moore and United States Forest Service
Petitioner: Navajo Nation, National Parks Conservation Association, Wilderness Society, Grand Canyon Trust, Great Old Broads for Wilderness, Western Watersheds Project, WildEarth Guardians, Sierra Club, Center for Biological Diversity, Southern Utah Wilderness Alliance, National Resources Defense Counsel, Hopi Tribe, Ute Mountain Ute Tribe, Pueblo of Zuni, Grand Staircase Escalante Partners, Society of Vertebrate Paleontology, Conservation Lands Foundation, Utah Dine Bikeyah, Friends of Cedar Mesa, Archaeology Southwest, Patagonia Works, Access Fund, The, National Trust for Historic Preservation in the United States, The, American Anthropological Association, Archaeological Institute of America and Society for American Archaeology
Case Number: 4:2022cv00060
Filed: August 25, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: Paul Kohler
Referring Judge: David Nuffer
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 16 U.S.C. ยง 0431 Antiquities Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 30, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER for Consolidation: this case is ordered consolidated into case 4:22cv00059 DN-PK. All further pleadings shall be filed only in case 4:22cv00059. Signed by Judge David Nuffer on 11/30/22 (alt) Modified on 12/1/2022: corrected Date Filed to 11/30/22 (alt)
November 30, 2022 Civil Case Terminated per consolidation into 4:22cv00059 - CASE CLOSED. Magistrate Judge Paul Kohler no longer assigned to this case. (alt)
November 30, 2022 Filing 62 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Attorney Planning Meeting Report and Proposed Scheduling Order and Requesting Status Conference filed by Plaintiffs Blueribbon Coalition, Zebediah George Dalton, Kyle Kimmerle, Suzette Ranea Morris. Motions referred to Paul Kohler.(Brammer, J.)
November 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER granting #58 Motion for 30-Day Extension of Time to Answer re #2 Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul Kohler on 11/28/22 (alt)
November 28, 2022 Filing 60 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #58 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #2 Complaint,, and Memorandum in Support filed by Plaintiffs Blueribbon Coalition, Zebediah George Dalton, Kyle Kimmerle, Suzette Ranea Morris. (Brammer, J.)
November 28, 2022 Filing 59 Motions No Longer Referred: #49 MOTION to Intervene and Memorandum in Support , #52 MOTION to Intervene and Memorandum in Support , #54 MOTION to Intervene and Memorandum in Support , #51 Amended MOTION to Intervene and Memorandum in Support , #53 MOTION to Intervene and Memorandum in Support . Motions will be addressed by the District Judge. (tlc)
November 25, 2022 Filing 58 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #2 Complaint,, and Memorandum in Support filed by Defendants Joseph R. Biden, Jr, Bureau of Land Management, Department of Agriculture, Department of the Interior, Debra A. Haaland, Randy Moore, Tracy Stone-Manning, United States Forest Service, Thomas J. Vilsack. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) Motions referred to Paul Kohler.(Sawyer, Michael)
November 23, 2022 Filing 57 EXHIBITS filed by American Anthropological Association, Archaeological Institute of America, Society for American Archaeology re #55 Exhibits,, #56 Exhibits, #54 MOTION to Intervene and Memorandum in Support . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 10 Part 1 Deep Roots, Utah BLM Special Publication, #2 Exhibit 10 Part 2 BLM Publication, #3 Exhibit 11 - A Preliminary Assessment of Archaeological Resources, #4 Exhibit 12 - The Archaeology of Bears Ears, #5 Exhibit 13 - Bears Ears Archaeological Experts Gathering Report, #6 Exhibit 14 - What Trump_s Shrinking of National Monuments Actually Means, #7 Exhibit 15 - Proposal for the Creation of Bears Ears)(Petty, Wayne)
November 23, 2022 Filing 56 EXHIBITS filed by American Anthropological Association, Archaeological Institute of America, Society for American Archaeology re #54 MOTION to Intervene and Memorandum in Support , #55 Exhibits,,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 16 - Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit 17 - Proposed Answer)(Petty, Wayne)
November 23, 2022 Filing 55 EXHIBITS filed by American Anthropological Association, Archaeological Institute of America, Society for American Archaeology re #54 MOTION to Intervene and Memorandum in Support . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 5 - Declaration of Edward B. Liebow, #2 Exhibit 6 Part 1 Declaration of Oona Schmid, #3 Exhibit 6 Part 2 Schmid Declaration, #4 Exhibit 7 - Declaration of Catherine M. Cameron, #5 Exhibit 8 - Declaration of Robin Willscheidt, #6 Exhibit 9 - Declaration of Phil R. Geib)(Petty, Wayne)
November 23, 2022 Filing 54 MOTION to Intervene and Memorandum in Support filed by Movants American Anthropological Association, Archaeological Institute of America, Society for American Archaeology. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Declaration of Jerry Spangler, #2 Exhibit 2 - Declaration of Ralph E. Burillo, #3 Exhibit 3 - Part 1 Declaration of Josh Ewing, #4 Exhibit 3 - Part 2 Ewing Declaration, #5 Exhibit 4 - Declaration of Rebecca King) Motions referred to Paul Kohler.(Petty, Wayne)
November 23, 2022 Filing 53 MOTION to Intervene and Memorandum in Support filed by Movants Access Fund, The, Archaeology Southwest, Conservation Lands Foundation, Friends of Cedar Mesa, National Trust for Historic Preservation in the United States, The, Patagonia Works, Society of Vertebrate Paleontology, Utah Dine Bikeyah. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - M. Maryboy Declaration, #2 Exhibit B - V. Hadenfeldt Declaration, #3 Exhibit C - D. Polly Declaration, #4 Exhibit D - E. Merritt Declaration, #5 Exhibit E - Answer, #6 Text of Proposed Order) Motions referred to Paul Kohler. Attorney Brent V. Manning added to party Conservation Lands Foundation(pty:mov), Attorney Brent V. Manning added to party Society of Vertebrate Paleontology(pty:mov)(Manning, Brent)
November 23, 2022 Filing 52 MOTION to Intervene and Memorandum in Support filed by Movants Grand Staircase Escalante Partners, Society of Vertebrate Paleontology, Conservation Lands Foundation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Bauman Declaration, #2 Exhibit Holland Declaration, #3 Exhibit Murray Declaration, #4 Exhibit Polly Declaration, #5 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order, #6 Exhibit Proposed Answer) Motions referred to Paul Kohler. Attorney Raymond Scott Berry added to party Grand Staircase Escalante Partners(pty:mov), Attorney Raymond Scott Berry added to party Society of Vertebrate Paleontology(pty:mov), Attorney Raymond Scott Berry added to party Conservation Lands Foundation(pty:mov)(Berry, Raymond)
November 22, 2022 Filing 51 Amended MOTION to Intervene and Memorandum in Support filed by Movants Hopi Tribe, Navajo Nation, Pueblo of Zuni, Ute Mountain Ute Tribe. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Text of Proposed Order) Motions referred to Paul Kohler.(Moquin, Daniel)
November 22, 2022 Filing 50 Amended MOTION to Intervene and Memorandum in Support filed by Movant Navajo Nation. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) Motions referred to Paul Kohler.(Moquin, Daniel)
November 22, 2022 Filing 49 MOTION to Intervene and Memorandum in Support filed by Movants Center for Biological Diversity, Grand Canyon Trust, Great Old Broads for Wilderness, National Parks Conservation Association, National Resources Defense Counsel, Sierra Club, Southern Utah Wilderness Alliance, Western Watersheds Project, WildEarth Guardians, Wilderness Society. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Declaration of E. Atencio, #2 Exhibit 2 - Declaration of R. Bloxham, #3 Exhibit 3 - Declaration of J. Hanley, #4 Exhibit 4 - Declaration of W. Hoskisson, #5 Exhibit 5 - Declaration of S. Husby-Good, #6 Exhibit 6 - Declaration of D. Kent, #7 Exhibit 7 - Declaration of T. McKinnon, #8 Exhibit 8 - Declaration of E. Molvar, #9 Exhibit 9 - Declaration of T. Peterson, Jr., #10 Exhibit 10 - Declaration of K. Umekubo, #11 Exhibit 11 - Declaration of L. Welp, #12 Exhibit 12 - Proposed Order, #13 Exhibit 13 - Proposed Answer) Motions referred to Paul Kohler.(McIntosh, Heidi)
November 22, 2022 Modification of Docket: Error: cc. Correction: cc. re #47 MOTION to Intervene, #50 Amended MOTION to Intervene. Filer did not identify all parties who would be moving to intervene. Correction: All Movant parties have been added to the case - filer will now re-file their motion correctly with all 4 movants selected as filers and attachments properly separated from the main document. (alt)
November 21, 2022 Filing 48 Motions No Longer Referred: #47 MOTION to Intervene and Memorandum in Support (rsd)
November 18, 2022 Filing 47 MOTION to Intervene and Memorandum in Support filed by Movant Navajo Nation. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) Motions referred to Paul Kohler.(Moquin, Daniel)
November 16, 2022 Filing 46 NOTICE of Unopposed Motion to Consolidate Cases by Joseph R. Biden, Jr, Bureau of Land Management, Department of Agriculture, Department of the Interior, Debra A. Haaland, Randy Moore, Tracy Stone-Manning, United States Forest Service, Thomas J. Vilsack (Sawyer, Michael)
November 10, 2022 Filing 45 NOTICE of Unavailability by Blueribbon Coalition, Zebediah George Dalton, Kyle Kimmerle, Suzette Ranea Morris (Brammer, J.)
November 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER granting #43 Joint Motion for 23-Day Extension to File Attorney Planning Meeting Report and Proposed Scheduling Order, and Defendants' Unopposed Motion for 13-Day Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint. The Attorney Planning Meeting Report and Proposed Scheduling Order are due on or before November 30, 2022. Defendants' response to Plaintiffs' Complaint is due on or before December 6, 2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul Kohler on 11/8/22. (dla)
November 7, 2022 Filing 43 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Attorney Planning Meeting Report and Proposed Scheduling Order (23-Day Extension), Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #2 Complaint,, (13-Day Extension) filed by Plaintiffs Blueribbon Coalition, Zebediah George Dalton, Kyle Kimmerle, Suzette Ranea Morris. Motions referred to Paul Kohler.(Brammer, J.)
October 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER granting #41 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #2 Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul Kohler on 10/20/22 (alt)
October 19, 2022 Filing 41 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Defendants Joseph R. Biden, Jr, Bureau of Land Management, Department of Agriculture, Department of the Interior, Debra A. Haaland, Randy Moore, Tracy Stone-Manning, United States Forest Service, Thomas J. Vilsack. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) Motions referred to Paul Kohler.(Sawyer, Michael)
October 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER granting #39 Motion for Extension of Time: parties shall have until 11/7/22, to file their attorney planning meeting report and proposed scheduling order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul Kohler on 10/11/22 (alt)
October 7, 2022 Filing 39 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Attorney Planning Meeting Report and Proposed Scheduling Order filed by Plaintiffs Blueribbon Coalition, Zebediah George Dalton, Kyle Kimmerle, Suzette Ranea Morris. Motions referred to Paul Kohler.(Brammer, J.)
October 7, 2022 Filing 38 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael S. Sawyer on behalf of Joseph R. Biden, Jr, Bureau of Land Management, Department of Agriculture, Department of the Interior, Debra A. Haaland, Randy Moore, Tracy Stone-Manning, United States Forest Service, Thomas J. Vilsack (Sawyer, Michael)
October 4, 2022 Filing 37 NOTICE of Change of Address by J. Brady Brammer and Matthew C. Piccolo (Brammer, J.)
October 4, 2022 Filing 36 STRICKEN INCORRECT DOCUMENT DOCKETED PER COUNSEL NOTICE of Change of Address by J. Brady Brammer & Matthew C. Piccolo (Brammer, J.) Modified by striking docket entry on 10/4/2022 (dla).
October 3, 2022 Filing 35 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE for Complaint served on Bureau of Land Management on 08/26/2022, filed by Plaintiffs Blueribbon Coalition, Zebediah George Dalton, Kyle Kimmerle, Suzette Ranea Morris. (Brammer, J.)
October 3, 2022 Filing 34 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE for Complaint served on Tracy Stone-Manning on 08/26/2022, filed by Plaintiffs Blueribbon Coalition, Zebediah George Dalton, Kyle Kimmerle, Suzette Ranea Morris. (Brammer, J.)
September 20, 2022 Filing 32 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE for Complaint served on Department of the Interior on 09/06/2022, filed by Plaintiffs Blueribbon Coalition, Zebediah George Dalton, Kyle Kimmerle, Suzette Ranea Morris. (Brammer, J.)
September 12, 2022 Filing 31 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE for Complaint served on U.S. Forest Service on 08/31/2022, filed by Plaintiffs Blueribbon Coalition, Zebediah George Dalton, Kyle Kimmerle, Suzette Ranea Morris. (Brammer, J.)
September 12, 2022 Filing 30 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE for Complaint served on Randy Moore on 08/31/2022, filed by Plaintiffs Blueribbon Coalition, Zebediah George Dalton, Kyle Kimmerle, Suzette Ranea Morris. (Brammer, J.)
September 12, 2022 Filing 29 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE for Complaint served on Department of Agriculture on 08/31/2022, filed by Plaintiffs Blueribbon Coalition, Zebediah George Dalton, Kyle Kimmerle, Suzette Ranea Morris. (Brammer, J.)
September 12, 2022 Filing 28 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE for Complaint served on Thomas J. Vilsack on 08/31/2022, filed by Plaintiffs Blueribbon Coalition, Zebediah George Dalton, Kyle Kimmerle, Suzette Ranea Morris. (Brammer, J.)
September 12, 2022 Filing 27 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE for Complaint served on Debra A. Haaland on 09/01/2022, filed by Plaintiffs Blueribbon Coalition, Zebediah George Dalton, Kyle Kimmerle, Suzette Ranea Morris. (Brammer, J.)
September 12, 2022 Filing 26 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE for Complaint served on Joseph R. Biden, Jr. on 08/26/2022, filed by Plaintiffs Blueribbon Coalition, Zebediah George Dalton, Kyle Kimmerle, Suzette Ranea Morris. (Brammer, J.)
September 12, 2022 Filing 25 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE for Complaint served on Trina A. Higgins, U.S. Attorney on 08/26/2022, filed by Plaintiffs Blueribbon Coalition, Zebediah George Dalton, Kyle Kimmerle, Suzette Ranea Morris. (Brammer, J.)
September 12, 2022 Filing 24 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE for Complaint served on U.S. Attorney General on 08/31/2022, filed by Plaintiffs Blueribbon Coalition, Zebediah George Dalton, Kyle Kimmerle, Suzette Ranea Morris. (Brammer, J.)
September 2, 2022 Filing 23 NOTICE TO PLAINTIFFS OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE AVAILABILITY TO PRESIDE OVER CASE- Under 28 U.S.C. 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73, you are hereby notified that a magistrate judge for the District of Utah is available to conduct proceedings in this case, including a jury or bench trial and entry of a final judgment. The magistrate judge may preside over this case only after the relevant parties voluntarily sign and return the #Consent Form. To have a magistrate judge preside over this case, please complete and return the Consent Form to the clerk's office within 21 days via email at consents@utd.uscourts.gov or mail to the address on the form. Please do not file the Consent Form in the case docket. Notice e-mailed or mailed to Plaintiffs Blueribbon Coalition, Zebediah George Dalton, Kyle Kimmerle, Suzette Ranea Morris. Form due by 9/23/2022. (alf)
September 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 22 DOCKET TEXT ORDER granting #5 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Harry S. Graver for Blueribbon Coalition, Zebediah George Dalton, Kyle Kimmerle, Suzette Ranea Morris.Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at #https://www.pacer.uscourts.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html. Instructions are available at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing.Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/rules-practice. So ordered by Magistrate Judge Paul Kohler on 9/2/22 (docket text only - no attached document) (alt)
September 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 21 DOCKET TEXT ORDER granting #4 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney James M. Burnham for Blueribbon Coalition, Zebediah George Dalto, Kyle Kimmerle, Suzette Ranea Morris.Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at #https://www.pacer.uscourts.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html. Instructions are available at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing.Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/rules-practice. So ordered by Magistrate Judge Paul Kohler on 9/2/22 (docket text only - no attached document) (alt)
August 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER TO PROPOSE SCHEDULE - Plaintiff must propose a schedule to defendant in the form of a draft Attorney Planning Meeting Report within the earlier of fourteen (14) days after any defendant has appeared or twenty-eight (28) days after any defendant has been served with the complaint. See order for additional instructions. Signed by Judge David Nuffer on 8/30/22 (alt)
August 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Paul Kohler under 28:636 (b)(1)(A), Magistrate to hear and determine all nondispositive pretrial matters. No attached document. Signed by Judge David Nuffer on 8/30/2022. (pjd)
August 29, 2022 Filing 18 NOTICE FROM THE COURT This case is assigned to the Southern Region of the Central Division of the District of Utah. More information is on the court's #Southern Region web page. (pjd)
August 25, 2022 Filing 17 NOTICE OF REQUIREMENTS for appearance phv mailed to attorney James M Burnham, and Harry S Graver, for Plaintiffs Blueribbon Coalition, Zebediah George Dalton, Kyle Kimmerle, Suzette Ranea Morris (ks)
August 25, 2022 Filing 16 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to the U.S. Attorney General. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (mh)
August 25, 2022 Filing 15 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to the U.S. Attorney's Office. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (mh)
August 25, 2022 Filing 14 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Thomas J. Vilsack. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (mh)
August 25, 2022 Filing 13 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Bureau of Land Management. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (mh)
August 25, 2022 Filing 12 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Randy Moore. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (mh)
August 25, 2022 Filing 11 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Tracy Stone-Manning. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (mh)
August 25, 2022 Filing 10 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Debra A. Haaland. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (mh)
August 25, 2022 Filing 9 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to United States Forest Service. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (mh)
August 25, 2022 Filing 8 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Department of the Interior. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (mh)
August 25, 2022 Filing 7 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Department of Agriculture. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (mh)
August 25, 2022 Filing 6 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Joseph R. Biden, Jr. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (mh)
August 25, 2022 Filing 5 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Harry S. Graver , Registration fee $ 250, receipt number AUTDC-4428222,Attorneys awaiting Pro Hac Vice admission should immediately register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at #https://www.pacer.uscourts.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html.Registration requests will not be approved until the court has granted the pro hac vice motion. Instructions are available on the court's website at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing. filed by Plaintiffs Blueribbon Coalition, Zebediah George Dalton, Kyle Kimmerle, Suzette Ranea Morris. (Attachments: #1 Application, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Brammer, J.)
August 25, 2022 Filing 4 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of James M. Burnham , Registration fee $ 250, receipt number AUTDC-4428212,Attorneys awaiting Pro Hac Vice admission should immediately register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at #https://www.pacer.uscourts.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html.Registration requests will not be approved until the court has granted the pro hac vice motion. Instructions are available on the court's website at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing. filed by Plaintiffs Blueribbon Coalition, Zebediah George Dalton, Kyle Kimmerle, Suzette Ranea Morris. (Attachments: #1 Application, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Brammer, J.)
August 25, 2022 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT under FRCP 7.1 filed by Plaintiff Blueribbon Coalition. (Brammer, J.)
August 25, 2022 Filing 2 COMPLAINT for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AUTDC-4428160) filed by Kyle Kimmerle, Blueribbon Coalition, Zebediah George Dalton, Suzette Ranea Morris. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Ben Burr, #2 Exhibit B - Declaration of Simone Griffin, #3 Exhibit C - Declaration of Richard Klein, #4 Exhibit D - Declaration of Brent Johansen, #5 Exhibit E - Declaration of Shane Shumway, #6 Exhibit F - Declaration of Kyle Kimmerle, #7 Exhibit G - Declaration of Zebediah George Dalton, #8 Exhibit H - Declaration of Suzette Ranea Morris, #9 Civil Cover Sheet Attachment) Assigned to Judge David Nuffer (Brammer, J.)
August 25, 2022 Filing 1 Case has been indexed and assigned to Judge David Nuffer. Plaintiffs Blueribbon Coalition, Zebediah George Dalton, Kyle Kimmerle, and Suzette Ranea Morris are directed to E-File the Complaint and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 402. by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the courts #PDF version and email it to utdecf_clerk@utd.uscourts.gov for issuance. (ks)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dalton et al v. Biden et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zebediah George Dalton
Represented By: J. Brady Brammer
Represented By: Matthew C Piccolo
Represented By: James M. Burnham
Represented By: Harry S. Graver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Blueribbon Coalition
Represented By: J. Brady Brammer
Represented By: Matthew C Piccolo
Represented By: James M. Burnham
Represented By: Harry S. Graver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kyle Kimmerle
Represented By: J. Brady Brammer
Represented By: Matthew C Piccolo
Represented By: James M. Burnham
Represented By: Harry S. Graver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Suzette Ranea Morris
Represented By: J. Brady Brammer
Represented By: Matthew C Piccolo
Represented By: James M. Burnham
Represented By: Harry S. Graver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph R. Biden, Jr.
Represented By: Michael S. Sawyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Debra A. Haaland
Represented By: Michael S. Sawyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of the Interior
Represented By: Michael S. Sawyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tracy Stone-Manning
Represented By: Michael S. Sawyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bureau of Land Management
Represented By: Michael S. Sawyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas J. Vilsack
Represented By: Michael S. Sawyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Agriculture
Represented By: Michael S. Sawyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Randy Moore
Represented By: Michael S. Sawyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Forest Service
Represented By: Michael S. Sawyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Navajo Nation
Represented By: Daniel G. Moquin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: National Parks Conservation Association
Represented By: Heidi J. McIntosh
Represented By: Michelle B. White
Represented By: Stephen H. Bloch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Wilderness Society
Represented By: Heidi J. McIntosh
Represented By: Michelle B. White
Represented By: Stephen H. Bloch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Grand Canyon Trust
Represented By: Heidi J. McIntosh
Represented By: Michelle B. White
Represented By: Stephen H. Bloch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Great Old Broads for Wilderness
Represented By: Heidi J. McIntosh
Represented By: Michelle B. White
Represented By: Stephen H. Bloch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Western Watersheds Project
Represented By: Heidi J. McIntosh
Represented By: Michelle B. White
Represented By: Stephen H. Bloch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: WildEarth Guardians
Represented By: Heidi J. McIntosh
Represented By: Michelle B. White
Represented By: Stephen H. Bloch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Sierra Club
Represented By: Heidi J. McIntosh
Represented By: Michelle B. White
Represented By: Stephen H. Bloch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Center for Biological Diversity
Represented By: Heidi J. McIntosh
Represented By: Michelle B. White
Represented By: Stephen H. Bloch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Southern Utah Wilderness Alliance
Represented By: Heidi J. McIntosh
Represented By: Michelle B. White
Represented By: Stephen H. Bloch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: National Resources Defense Counsel
Represented By: Heidi J. McIntosh
Represented By: Michelle B. White
Represented By: Stephen H. Bloch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Hopi Tribe
Represented By: Daniel G. Moquin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Ute Mountain Ute Tribe
Represented By: Daniel G. Moquin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Pueblo of Zuni
Represented By: Daniel G. Moquin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Grand Staircase Escalante Partners
Represented By: Raymond Scott Berry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Society of Vertebrate Paleontology
Represented By: Brent V. Manning
Represented By: Raymond Scott Berry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Conservation Lands Foundation
Represented By: Brent V. Manning
Represented By: Raymond Scott Berry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Utah Dine Bikeyah
Represented By: Brent V. Manning
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Friends of Cedar Mesa
Represented By: Brent V. Manning
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Archaeology Southwest
Represented By: Brent V. Manning
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Patagonia Works
Represented By: Brent V. Manning
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Access Fund, The
Represented By: Brent V. Manning
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: National Trust for Historic Preservation in the United States, The
Represented By: Brent V. Manning
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: American Anthropological Association
Represented By: Wayne G. Petty, I
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Archaeological Institute of America
Represented By: Wayne G. Petty, I
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Society for American Archaeology
Represented By: Wayne G. Petty, I
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?