B. et al v. BlueCross BlueShield of Texas et al
Plaintiff: S. B. and R. B.
Defendant: BlueCross BlueShield of Texas and American Heart Association Managed HealthCare Plan
Case Number: 4:2022cv00091
Filed: November 30, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: Paul Kohler
Referring Judge: David Nuffer
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 1001 E.R.I.S.A.: Employee Retirement
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 11, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 11, 2023 Filing 17 NOTICE OF NON-CONSENT Consent to the jurisdiction of the Magistrate Judge under DUCivR 72-4 has not been obtained. The case is randomly reassigned to Judge David Nuffer as the presiding judge and automatically referred to Magistrate Judge Paul Kohler under 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A). Magistrate Judge Paul Kohler is no longer assigned as the presiding judge.(alf)
January 11, 2023 Filing 16 RECEIVED Consent/Reassignment Form from Defendant American Heart Association Managed HealthCare Plan. (alf)
January 10, 2023 Filing 15 RECEIVED Consent/Reassignment Form from Plaintiffs R. B., S. B.. (alf)
January 10, 2023 Filing 14 RECEIVED Consent/Reassignment Form from Defendant BlueCross BlueShield of Texas. (alf)
January 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #10 Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint. Answer deadline updated for American Heart Association Managed HealthCare Plan and BlueCross BlueShield of Texas to 2/17/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul Kohler on 1/10/2023. (alf)
January 10, 2023 Filing 12 NOTICE - This case is assigned to a magistrate judge. Under 28 U.S.C. 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73, you are hereby notified that a magistrate judge for the District of Utah may conduct any or all proceedings in this case, including a jury or bench trial and entry of a final judgment. Exercise of this jurisdiction by the magistrate judge is permitted only if all parties voluntarily sign and return the form. To consent, return the Consent Form to the clerk's office within 21 days via email at consents@utd.uscourts.gov or mail at the address on the form and place Attention: Consent Clerk on the envelope. Please do not e-file the Consent Form in the case. Notice e-mailed or mailed to Defendants American Heart Association Managed HealthCare Plan, BlueCross BlueShield of Texas, Plaintiffs R. B., S. B.. Form due by 1/31/2023. (alf)
January 10, 2023 Filing 11 NOTICE OF ADR, e-mailed or mailed to Defendants American Heart Association Managed HealthCare Plan, BlueCross BlueShield of Texas, Plaintiffs R. B., S. B.. (alf)
January 9, 2023 Filing 10 Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint filed by Defendant American Heart Association Managed HealthCare Plan. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Mathisen, Eric)
January 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Eric P. Mathisen for American Heart Association Managed HealthCare Plan.Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at #https://www.pacer.uscourts.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html. Instructions are available at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing.Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/rules-practice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul Kohler on 1/6/2023. (mh)
January 5, 2023 Filing 8 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Eric P. Mathisen , Registration fee $ 250, receipt number AUTDC-4548738,Attorneys awaiting Pro Hac Vice admission should immediately register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at #https://www.pacer.uscourts.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html.Registration requests will not be approved until the court has granted the pro hac vice motion. Instructions are available on the court's website at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing. filed by Defendant American Heart Association Managed HealthCare Plan. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Weron, Kathleen)
December 28, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE OF REQUIREMENTS for appearance phv mailed to attorney Eric P. Mathisen, for Defendant American Heart Association Managed HealthCare Plan (alf)
December 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER TO PROPOSE SCHEDULE - See order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul Kohler on 12/22/2022. (jl)
December 22, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Rebecca R. Hanson on behalf of BlueCross BlueShield of Texas (Hanson, Rebecca)
December 20, 2022 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by S. B., R. B. as to BlueCross BlueShield of Texas Waiver sent on 12/1/2022, answer due 1/30/2023. (King, Brian)
December 20, 2022 Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by S. B., R. B. as to American Heart Association Managed HealthCare Plan Waiver sent on 12/1/2022, answer due 1/30/2023. (King, Brian)
November 30, 2022 Filing 2 NOTICE FROM THE COURT re #1 Complaint. Attorney selected the incorrect division when creating the case. Case 2:22-cv-00043 will be closed and all pleadings will be transferred to case 4:22-ccv-0091. Case number will now read 4:22-v-00091. Please make changes to document captions accordingly. (nl)
November 30, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against American Heart Association Managed HealthCare Plan, BlueCross BlueShield of Texas (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AUTDC-4517842) filed by S. B., R. B.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (King, Brian)
November 30, 2022 Magistrate Judge Paul Kohler added. Case number will now read 4:22-cv-00091-PK. Please make changes to document captions accordingly. (haa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: B. et al v. BlueCross BlueShield of Texas et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: S. B.
Represented By: Brent J. Newton
Represented By: Samuel Martin Hall
Represented By: Brian S. King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: R. B.
Represented By: Brian S. King
Represented By: Samuel Martin Hall
Represented By: Brent J. Newton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BlueCross BlueShield of Texas
Represented By: Rebecca R. Hanson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Heart Association Managed HealthCare Plan
Represented By: Kathleen D Weron
Represented By: Eric P. Mathisen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?