Acushnet et al v. McMurdie et al
Plaintiff: Acushnet and Scott Cameron Golf Design
Defendant: Derek McMurdie, Taylor McMurdie, Jax McMurdie and Lemon and Lucy
Case Number: 4:2023cv00025
Filed: March 30, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: Paul Kohler
Referring Judge: David Nuffer
2 Judge: Daphne A Oberg
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1125 Trademark Infringement (Lanham Act)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 18, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ANSWER to Complaint filed by Lemon and Lucy, Derek McMurdie, Taylor McMurdie, Jax McMurdie.(Gurr, Robert)
May 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 19 NOTICE OF NON-CONSENT: Consent to the jurisdiction of the Magistrate Judge under DUCivR 72-4 has not been obtained. Case randomly assigned to Judge David Nuffer and Magistrate Judge Paul Kohler is automatically referred under 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A). Magistrate Judge Paul Kohler no longer assigned as the presiding judge to the case. (alf)
April 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 18 RECEIVED Consent/Reassignment Form from Plaintiffs Acushnet, Scott Cameron Golf Design. (alf)
April 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #14 Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer as to #2 Complaint. Answer deadline updated for defendants to 5/25/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul Kohler on 4/24/2023. (alf)
April 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 16 NOTICE - This case is assigned to a magistrate judge. Under 28 U.S.C. 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73, you are hereby notified that a magistrate judge for the District of Utah may conduct any or all proceedings in this case, including a jury or bench trial and entry of a final judgment. Exercise of this jurisdiction by the magistrate judge is permitted only if all parties voluntarily sign and return the form. To consent, return the Consent Form to the clerk's office within 21 days via email at consents@utd.uscourts.gov or mail at the address on the form and place Attention: Consent Clerk on the envelope. Please do not e-file the Consent Form in the case. Notice e-mailed or mailed to Plaintiffs Acushnet, Scott Cameron Golf Design, Defendants Lemon and Lucy, Derek McMurdie, Taylor McMurdie, Jax McMurdie. Form due by 5/15/2023. (alf)
April 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 NOTICE OF ADR, e-mailed or mailed to Plaintiffs Acushnet, Scott Cameron Golf Design, Defendants Lemon and Lucy, Derek McMurdie, Taylor McMurdie, Jax McMurdie. (alf)
April 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Defendants Lemon and Lucy, Derek McMurdie, Taylor McMurdie, Jax McMurdie. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order ORDER GRANTING STIPULATED MOTION TO EXTEND ANSWER DEADLINE)(Gurr, Robert)
April 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert A. Gurr on behalf of Lemon and Lucy, Derek McMurdie, Taylor McMurdie, Jax McMurdie (Gurr, Robert)
April 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Acushnet, Scott Cameron Golf Design as to Jax McMurdie served on 4/4/2023, answer due 4/25/2023. (Cameron, Jordan)
April 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Acushnet, Scott Cameron Golf Design as to Taylor McMurdie served on 4/4/2023, answer due 4/25/2023. (Cameron, Jordan)
April 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Acushnet, Scott Cameron Golf Design as to Derek McMurdie served on 4/4/2023, answer due 4/25/2023. (Cameron, Jordan)
April 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Magistrate Judge Paul Kohler added. Magistrate Judge Daphne A. Oberg no longer assigned to case, Case initially assigned from incorrect deck and needed a judge in the southern region.Case number will now read 4:23-cv-00025-PK. Please make changes to document captions accordingly. (nl)
March 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER TO PROPOSE SCHEDULE - See order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daphne A. Oberg on 3/31/2023. (alf)
March 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Summons Issued Electronically as to Taylor McMurdie. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (haa)
March 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Summons Issued Electronically as to Lemon and Lucy. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (haa)
March 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Summons Issued Electronically as to Jax McMurdie. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (haa)
March 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Summons Issued Electronically as to Derek McMurdie. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (haa)
March 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 REFUND REQUEST FOR DUPLICATE FEE PAYMENT re #2 Complaint filed by Cameron, Jordan.Authorized refunds for credit card or debit card payments will be processed through Pay.gov. Authorized refunds of ACH payments will be issued by check through the U.S. Treasury. A waiting period of up to 30 days may be required before your request is approved. If you have not received your refund after 40 days, please contact the clerk's office and ask to speak someone in the finance department. (Cameron, Jordan)
March 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Report on the Filing of an action sent to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (haa)
March 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 2 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number BUTDC-4634008) filed by Acushnet, Scott Cameron Golf Design. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet) (Cameron, Jordan)
March 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 1 Case has been indexed and assigned to Magistrate Judge Daphne A. Oberg. Plaintiffs Acushnet, Scott Cameron Golf Design is directed to E-File the Complaint and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 402. by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the courts #PDF version and email it to utdecf_clerk@utd.uscourts.gov for issuance. (ks)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Acushnet et al v. McMurdie et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Acushnet
Represented By: Jordan K. Cameron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott Cameron Golf Design
Represented By: Jordan K. Cameron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Derek McMurdie
Represented By: Robert A. Gurr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Taylor McMurdie
Represented By: Robert A. Gurr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jax McMurdie
Represented By: Robert A. Gurr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lemon and Lucy
Represented By: Robert A. Gurr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?