Molenda v. Garfield County Sheriff's Office et al
Plaintiff: Jenelle Molenda
Defendant: Deputy Cree Carter, Deputy Wesley Syrett, Garfield County Sheriff's Office, Garfield County, Garfield County Jail, Deputy Carter, Deputy Syrett, Jimmy Oldham, James D. Perkins, Barry Huntington, Scott Burns, Carter Cree, Wesley Syrett and Garfield County Sheriffs Office
Case Number: 4:2023cv00111
Filed: November 27, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: Paul Kohler
Referring Judge: Ted Stewart
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 25, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 25, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER granting #31 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Garfield Defendants' answer is due on March 8, 2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul Kohler on 1/25/2024. (mh)
January 24, 2024 Filing 31 Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer and Memorandum in Support filed by Defendants Scott Burns, Carter Cree, Garfield County, Garfield County Jail, Garfield County Sheriffs Office, Barry Huntington, Jimmy Oldham, James D. Perkins, Wesley Syrett. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Stipulated Motion to Consolidate Answer Deadline for all Defendants) Motions referred to Paul Kohler.(Hamilton, R.)
January 24, 2024 Filing 30 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Jenelle Molenda (Tanner, Emma)
January 24, 2024 Filing 29 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Jenelle Molenda (Tanner, Emma)
January 10, 2024 Filing 28 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jenelle Molenda as to Garfield County Jail served on 1/3/2024, answer due 1/24/2024. (Tanner, Emma)
January 10, 2024 Filing 27 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jenelle Molenda as to Garfield County served on 1/3/2024, answer due 1/24/2024. (Tanner, Emma)
January 10, 2024 Filing 26 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jenelle Molenda as to Carter Cree served on 1/3/2024, answer due 1/24/2024. (Tanner, Emma)
January 10, 2024 Filing 25 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jenelle Molenda as to Barry Huntington served on 1/3/2024, answer due 1/24/2024. (Tanner, Emma)
January 10, 2024 Filing 24 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jenelle Molenda as to Garfield County Sheriffs Office served on 1/3/2024, answer due 1/24/2024. (Tanner, Emma)
January 10, 2024 Filing 23 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jenelle Molenda as to Wesley Syrett served on 1/3/2024, answer due 1/24/2024. (Tanner, Emma)
January 10, 2024 Filing 22 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jenelle Molenda as to James D. Perkins served on 1/3/2024, answer due 1/24/2024. (Tanner, Emma)
January 4, 2024 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by Janise Kekauoha Macanas on behalf of Scott Burns, Carter Cree, Garfield County, Garfield County Jail, Garfield County Sheriffs Office, Barry Huntington, Jimmy Oldham, James D. Perkins, Wesley Syrett (Macanas, Janise)
January 4, 2024 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by R. Blake Hamilton on behalf of Scott Burns, Carter Cree, Garfield County, Garfield County Jail, Garfield County Sheriffs Office, Barry Huntington, Jimmy Oldham, James D. Perkins, Wesley Syrett (Hamilton, R.)
December 18, 2023 Filing 19 Summons Issued Electronically as to Wesley Syrett. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (haa)
December 18, 2023 Filing 18 Summons Issued Electronically as to Jimmy Oldham. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (haa)
December 18, 2023 Filing 17 Summons Issued Electronically as to Garfield County Jail. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (haa)
December 18, 2023 Filing 16 Summons Issued Electronically as to Garfield County Sheriffs Office. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (haa)
December 18, 2023 Filing 15 Summons Issued Electronically as to James D. Perkins. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (haa)
December 18, 2023 Filing 14 Summons Issued Electronically as to Carter Cree. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (haa)
December 18, 2023 Filing 13 Summons Issued Electronically as to Scott Burns. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (haa)
December 18, 2023 Filing 12 Summons Issued Electronically as to Barry Huntington. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (haa)
December 18, 2023 Filing 11 Summons Issued Electronically as to Garfield County. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (haa)
December 18, 2023 Filing 10 Requested Summons as to Scott Burns, Carter Cree, Garfield County, Garfield County Jail, Garfield County Sheriffs Office, Barry Huntington, Jimmy Oldham, James D. Perkins, Wesley Syrett. (Attachments: #1 Wesley Syrett, #2 Garfield County Jail, #3 Garfield County Sheriff's Office, #4 James D. Perkins, #5 Cree Carter, #6 Scott Burns, #7 Barry Huntington, #8 Garfield County)(Tanner, Emma)
December 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SUPPLEMENTING ORDER TO PROPOSED SCHEDULE AND TO PREPARE FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE - See order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul Kohler on 12/12/2023. (mh)
December 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER TO PROPOSE SCHEDULE - See order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul Kohler on 12/12/2023. (mh)
November 29, 2023 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Emma D. Tanner on behalf of Jenelle Molenda (Tanner, Emma)
November 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Paul Kohler under 28:636 (b)(1)(A), Magistrate Judge to hear and determine all nondispositive pretrial matters. No attached document. Signed by Judge Ted Stewart on 11/28/2023. (maa)
November 27, 2023 Filing 5 Civil Cover Sheet (JS44) re #1 Complaint Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the courts #PDF version and email it to utdecf_clerk@utd.uscourts.gov for issuance, filed by Jenelle Molenda. (Taylor, Jacob)
November 27, 2023 Filing 4 NOTICE OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE AVAILABILITY TO PRESIDE OVER CASE- Under 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed. R. Civ. P. 73, and DUCivR 72-4, you are hereby notified that a magistrate judge for the District of Utah may conduct any or all proceedings in this case, including a jury or bench trial and entry of a final judgment. Exercise of this jurisdiction by the magistrate judge is permitted only if all parties voluntarily sign and return the form. To consent, return the Consent Form to the clerk's office within 21 days via email at consents@utd.uscourts.gov or mail at the address on the form. Please do not efile the Consent Form in the case. Notice e-mailed or mailed to Plaintiff Jenelle Molenda. (Notice generated by Clerk's Office) Form due by 12/18/2023. (sg)
November 27, 2023 Filing 3 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY re #1 Complaint. The Civil Cover Sheet is missing. All civil actions presented for filing must be accompanied by a completed Civil Cover Sheet. See Local Rule DUCivR3-4. Counsel must file a completed Civil Cover Sheet JS44 immediately (sg)
November 27, 2023 Filing 2 NOTICE FROM THE COURT re #1 Complaint. Attorney selected the incorrect division when creating the case. Case 2:23-cv-00861 will be closed and all pleadings will be transferred to case 4:23-cv-00111. Case number will now read 4:23-cv-00111. Please make changes to document captions accordingly. (sg)
November 27, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AUTDC-4886957) filed by Jenelle Molenda. (Taylor, Jacob)
November 27, 2023 Judge Ted Stewart added. Case number will now read 4:23-cv-00111-TS. Please make changes to document captions accordingly. (sg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Molenda v. Garfield County Sheriff's Office et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deputy Cree Carter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deputy Wesley Syrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Garfield County Sheriff's Office
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Garfield County
Represented By: R. Blake Hamilton
Represented By: Janise Kekauoha Macanas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Garfield County Jail
Represented By: R. Blake Hamilton
Represented By: Janise Kekauoha Macanas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deputy Carter
Represented By: R. Blake Hamilton
Represented By: Janise Kekauoha Macanas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deputy Syrett
Represented By: R. Blake Hamilton
Represented By: Janise Kekauoha Macanas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jimmy Oldham
Represented By: R. Blake Hamilton
Represented By: Janise Kekauoha Macanas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James D. Perkins
Represented By: R. Blake Hamilton
Represented By: Janise Kekauoha Macanas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barry Huntington
Represented By: R. Blake Hamilton
Represented By: Janise Kekauoha Macanas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Burns
Represented By: R. Blake Hamilton
Represented By: Janise Kekauoha Macanas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carter Cree
Represented By: R. Blake Hamilton
Represented By: Janise Kekauoha Macanas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wesley Syrett
Represented By: R. Blake Hamilton
Represented By: Janise Kekauoha Macanas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Garfield County Sheriffs Office
Represented By: R. Blake Hamilton
Represented By: Janise Kekauoha Macanas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jenelle Molenda
Represented By: Emma D. Tanner
Represented By: Jacob S. Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?