JENCO, LC et al v. Valderra Development, LLC et al
Plaintiff: JENCO, LC and Dean Gardner Investment, LC
Defendant: Valderra Development, LLC, Valderra Land Holdings, LLC, The Ledges of St. George Master Owners Association, Valderra Development LLC and Valderra Land Holdings LLC
Case Number: 4:2024cv00019
Filed: February 14, 2024
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: Paul Kohler
Referring Judge: David Nuffer
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1114 Trademark Infringement
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 25, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 25, 2024 Filing 19 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and Memorandum in Support, MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Memorandum in Support filed by Defendants The Ledges of St. George Master Owners Association, Valderra Development LLC, Valderra Land Holdings LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Lynn Padan, #2 Exhibit B - Recorded CC&Rs, #3 Exhibit C - State of Utah corporation filings, #4 Exhibit D - Death Certificate for Alan Wright)(Miles, Jeffrey)
March 22, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #17 Stipulated Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint: The Ledges of St. George Master Owners Association, Valderra Development LLC, Valderra Land Holdings LLC answer/response due 3/25/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul Kohler on 3/22/24 (alt)
March 20, 2024 Filing 17 Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, filed by Defendants The Ledges of St. George Master Owners Association, Valderra Development, LLC, Valderra Land Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) Motions referred to Paul Kohler. Attorney Jeffrey R. Miles added to party The Ledges of St. George Master Owners Association(pty:dft), Attorney Jeffrey R. Miles added to party Valderra Development, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Jeffrey R. Miles added to party Valderra Land Holdings, LLC(pty:dft)(Miles, Jeffrey)
February 28, 2024 Filing 16 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Executed served on Attorney Jeffrey R. Miles of Snow Jensen & Reece PC for Defendant The Ledges of St. George Master Owners Association on 02/28/2024. Acknowledgment filed by JENCO, LC, Dean Gardner Investment, LC. (Milne, Eli)
February 28, 2024 Filing 15 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Executed served on Attorney Jeffrey R. Miles of Snow Jensen & Reece PC for Defendant Valderra Land Holdings LLC on 02/28/2024. Acknowledgment filed by JENCO, LC, Dean Gardner Investment, LC. (Milne, Eli)
February 28, 2024 Filing 14 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Executed served on Attorney Jeffrey R. Miles of Snow Jensen & Reece PC for Defendant Valderra Development LLC on 02/28/2024. Acknowledgment filed by JENCO, LC, Dean Gardner Investment, LC. (Milne, Eli)
February 16, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER Supplementing #12 Order to Propose Schedule. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul Kohler on 2/16/24 (alt)
February 16, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER TO PROPOSE SCHEDULE - See order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul Kohler on 2/16/24 (alt)
February 15, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 11 DOCKET TEXT ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Paul Kohler under 28:636 (b)(1)(A), Magistrate Judge to hear and determine all nondispositive pretrial matters. No attached document. Signed by Judge David Nuffer on 2/15/2024. (pjd)
February 15, 2024 Filing 10 NOTICE FROM THE COURT This case is assigned to the Southern Region of the Central Division of the District of Utah. More information is on the court's #Southern Region web page. (pjd)
February 14, 2024 Filing 9 Summons Issued Electronically as to The Ledges of St. George Master Owners Association. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (sg)
February 14, 2024 Filing 8 Summons Issued Electronically as to Valderra Development, LLC. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (sg)
February 14, 2024 Filing 7 Summons Issued Electronically as to Valderra Land Holdings, LLC. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (sg)
February 14, 2024 Filing 6 NOTICE OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE AVAILABILITY TO PRESIDE OVER CASE- Under 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed. R. Civ. P. 73, and DUCivR 72-4, you are hereby notified that a magistrate judge for the District of Utah may conduct any or all proceedings in this case, including a jury or bench trial and entry of a final judgment. Exercise of this jurisdiction by the magistrate judge is permitted only if all parties voluntarily sign and return the form. To consent, return the Consent Form to the clerk's office within 21 days via email at consents@utd.uscourts.gov or mail at the address on the form. Please do not efile the Consent Form in the case. Notice e-mailed or mailed to Plaintiffs Dean Gardner Investment, LC, JENCO, LC. (Notice generated by Clerk's Office) Form due by 3/6/2024. (sg)
February 14, 2024 Filing 5 Report on the Filing of an action sent to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Attachments: #1 Complaint) (sg)
February 14, 2024 Filing 4 Requested Summons as to Valderra Land Holdings, LLC. (Milne, Eli)
February 14, 2024 Filing 3 Requested Summons as to The Ledges of St. George Master Owners Association. (Milne, Eli)
February 14, 2024 Filing 2 Requested Summons as to Valderra Development, LLC. (Milne, Eli)
February 14, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 405, receipt number AUTDC-4968998) filed by JENCO, LC, Dean Gardner Investment, LC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit TSDR Status Report re: Registration No. 3,222,476, #3 Exhibit TSDR Status Report re: Registration No. 3,236,789, #4 Exhibit Letterhead, #5 Exhibit Invitation, #6 Exhibit Online Form, #7 Exhibit) (Milne, Eli)
February 14, 2024 Judge David Nuffer added. Case number will now read 4:24-cv-00019-DN. Please make changes to document captions accordingly. (sg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: JENCO, LC et al v. Valderra Development, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JENCO, LC
Represented By: Bryan J. Pattison
Represented By: Eli Milne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dean Gardner Investment, LC
Represented By: Bryan J. Pattison
Represented By: Eli Milne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Valderra Development, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Valderra Land Holdings, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Ledges of St. George Master Owners Association
Represented By: Jeffrey R. Miles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Valderra Development LLC
Represented By: Jeffrey R. Miles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Valderra Land Holdings LLC
Represented By: Jeffrey R. Miles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?