Teresa v. Mayo Foundation for Medical Education and Research
Plaintiff: Sherry Teresa
Defendant: Mayo Foundation for Medical Education and Research
Case Number: 4:2024cv00033
Filed: March 12, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: Ann Marie McIff Allen
Referring Judge: Paul Kohler
2 Judge: Ted Stewart
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. § 1332 Diversity
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 27, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 1, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 19 REASSIGNMENT to Newly Appointed District Judge. Under DUCivR 83-2, this case is reassigned to District Judge Ann Marie McIff Allen. Judge Ted Stewart no longer assigned to the case. Orders of the prior judge are affirmed including the order of reference to Magistrate Judge Kohler under 28:636 (b)(1)(A) re 5 Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge. Case number will now read 4:23cv00033-AMA-PK. Please make changes to document captions accordingly. (jrj)
April 22, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 18 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT under FRCP 7.1 filed by Defendant Mayo Foundation for Medical Education and Research. (Bauhs, Maryann)
April 19, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #13 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Andrew Brantingham for Mayo Foundation for Medical Education and Research.Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at #https://www.pacer.uscourts.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html. Instructions are available at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing.A Pro Hac Vice Attorney who fails to register for CM/ECF access will not receive notifications of electronic filings.Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/rules-practice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul Kohler on 4/19/2024. (mh)
April 19, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #12 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Brock Huebner for Mayo Foundation for Medical Education and Research.Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at #https://www.pacer.uscourts.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html. Instructions are available at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing.A Pro Hac Vice Attorney who fails to register for CM/ECF access will not receive notifications of electronic filings.Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/rules-practice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul Kohler on 4/19/2024. (mh)
April 19, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #11 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Michael Edward Rowe, III for Mayo Foundation for Medical Education and Research.Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at #https://www.pacer.uscourts.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html. Instructions are available at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing.A Pro Hac Vice Attorney who fails to register for CM/ECF access will not receive notifications of electronic filings.Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/rules-practice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul Kohler on 4/19/2024. (mh)
April 19, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #9 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. The deadline for the Defendant to answer or otherwise respond to the #1 Complaint is extended until May 31, 2024. If Defendant's response to the #1 Complaint is a motion requiring response and reply memoranda, the deadline for Plaintiff's opposition brief is June 28, 2024 and the deadline for Defendant's reply brief is July 19, 2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul Kohler on 4/19/2024. (mh)
April 18, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Andrew Brantingham , Registration fee $ 50, receipt number AUTDC-5037724,Attorneys awaiting Pro Hac Vice admission should immediately register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at #https://www.pacer.uscourts.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html.Registration requests will not be approved until the court has granted the pro hac vice motion. Instructions are available on the court's website at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing. filed by Defendant Mayo Foundation for Medical Education and Research. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Application for Pro Hac Vice Admission, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Bauhs, Maryann)
April 18, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Brock Huebner , Registration fee $ 50, receipt number AUTDC-5037718,Attorneys awaiting Pro Hac Vice admission should immediately register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at #https://www.pacer.uscourts.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html.Registration requests will not be approved until the court has granted the pro hac vice motion. Instructions are available on the court's website at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing. filed by Defendant Mayo Foundation for Medical Education and Research. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Application for Pro Hac Vice Admission, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Bauhs, Maryann)
April 18, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Michael Rowe , Registration fee $ 50, receipt number AUTDC-5037698,Attorneys awaiting Pro Hac Vice admission should immediately register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at #https://www.pacer.uscourts.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html.Registration requests will not be approved until the court has granted the pro hac vice motion. Instructions are available on the court's website at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing. filed by Defendant Mayo Foundation for Medical Education and Research. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Application for Pro Hac Vice Admission, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Bauhs, Maryann)
April 18, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Milo Steven Marsden on behalf of Mayo Foundation for Medical Education and Research (Marsden, Milo)
April 18, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,,,,,, filed by Defendant Mayo Foundation for Medical Education and Research. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) Motions referred to Paul Kohler. Attorney Maryann Bauhs added to party Mayo Foundation for Medical Education and Research (pty:dft)(Bauhs, Maryann)
April 12, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Summons Issued Electronically as to Mayo Foundation for Medical Education and Research. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (sg)
April 11, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Requested Summons as to Mayo Foundation for Medical Education and Research. (Scofield, David)
March 14, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER TO PROPOSE SCHEDULE - See order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul Kohler on 03/14/2024. (haa)
March 13, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Paul Kohler under 28:636 (b)(1)(A), Magistrate Judge to hear and determine all nondispositive pretrial matters. No attached document. Signed by Judge Ted Stewart on 03/13/2024. (maa)
March 12, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE AVAILABILITY TO PRESIDE OVER CASE- Under 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed. R. Civ. P. 73, and DUCivR 72-4, you are hereby notified that a magistrate judge for the District of Utah may conduct any or all proceedings in this case, including a jury or bench trial and entry of a final judgment. Exercise of this jurisdiction by the magistrate judge is permitted only if all parties voluntarily sign and return the form. To consent, return the Consent Form to the clerk's office within 21 days via email at consents@utd.uscourts.gov or mail at the address on the form. Please do not efile the Consent Form in the case. Notice e-mailed or mailed to Plaintiff Sherry Teresa. (Notice generated by Clerk's office) Form due by 4/2/2024. (kec)
March 12, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTICE OF REQUIREMENTS for appearance Pro Hac Vice mailed to attorney Frank S. Hedin and Arun G. Ravindran for Sherry Teresa per #1 complaint. (kec)
March 12, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet (JS44) Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the courts #PDF version and email it to utdecf_clerk@utd.uscourts.gov for issuance, filed by Sherry Teresa. (Scofield, David)
March 12, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Mayo Foundation for Medical Education and Research (Filing fee $ 405, receipt number AUTDC-4996348) filed by Sherry Teresa. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Mayo Clinic Health Letter Mailing List, #2 Exhibit B - FTC, The Information Marketplace Merging and Exchanging Consumer Data, #3 Exhibit C - Wall Street Journal, Webs Hot New Commodity Privacy, #4 Exhibit D - Statement of FTC Commissioner Pamela Jones Harbour, #5 Exhibit E - Time.com, Martha C. White, Big Data Knows What Youre Doing Right Now, #6 Exhibit F - N.Y. Times, Natasha Singer, You for Sale Mapping, and Sharing, the Consumer Genome, #7 Exhibit G - Letter from Senator John D. Rockefeller IV, Chairman, Senate Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation, to Scott E. Howe, Chief Executive Officer, Acxiom, #8 Exhibit H - Website of Senator Ed Markey, Bipartisan Group of Lawmakers Query Data Brokers About Practices Involving Consumers Personal Information, #9 Exhibit I - FTC, Prize Scams, #10 Exhibit J - N.Y. Times, Charles Duhigg, Bilking the Elderly, With a Corporate Assist, #11 Exhibit K - FTC, Fraud Against Seniors Hearing before the Senate Special Committee on Aging, #12 Exhibit L - 2014 TRUSTe US Consumer Confidence Privacy Report, TRUSTe, #13 Exhibit M - N.Y. Times, Joshua Brustein, Start-Ups Seek to Help Users Put a Price on Their Personal Data, #14 Exhibit Exhibit N - ENISA, Study on monetising privacy, #15 Exhibit Exhibit O - Hann, et al., The Value of Online Information Privacy An Empirical Investigation) (Scofield, David)
March 12, 2024 Opinion or Order Judge Ted Stewart added. Case number will now read 4:24-cv-00033-TS. Please make changes to document captions accordingly. (kec)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Teresa v. Mayo Foundation for Medical Education and Research
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sherry Teresa
Represented By: David W. Scofield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mayo Foundation for Medical Education and Research
Represented By: Milo Steven Marsden
Represented By: Brock Huebner
Represented By: Andrew Brantingham
Represented By: Maryann Bauhs
Represented By: Michael Edward Rowe, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?