Lewis v. Bellows Falls Congregation of Jehovah's Witnesses, Bellows Falls, Vermont, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: |
Annessa Lewis |
Defendant: |
Bellows Falls Congregation of Jehovah's Witnesses, Bellows Falls, Vermont, Inc., Watchtower Bible and Tract Society of New York, Inc. and Norton True |
Case Number: |
1:2014cv00205 |
Filed: |
October 1, 2014 |
Court: |
US District Court for the District of Vermont |
Office: |
Brattleboro Office |
County: |
XX US, Outside State |
Presiding Judge: |
J. Garvan Murtha |
Nature of Suit: |
Other Personal Injury |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. § 1332 |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
March 30, 2017 |
Filing
208
RULING: Defendants' 188 Joint Motion for Summary Judgment is GRANTED. Defendant's 199 Motion for Summary Judgment is GRANTED. Defendants' 196 and 206 Motions to Strike Statements of Disputed Material Facts are DENIED asmoot. The case is DISMISSED with prejudice.Signed by District Judge J. Garvan Murtha on 3/30/2017. (kak)
|
February 11, 2016 |
Filing
154
SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER Regarding Defendant Bellows Falls Congregation of Jehovah's Witnesses, Bellows Falls, Vermont, Inc.'s 110 Motion to Compel Overdue Discovery Responses From Plaintiff Anessa Lewis re: Facebook account. Signed by District Judge J. Garvan Murtha on 2/11/2016. (esb)
|
July 30, 2015 |
Filing
38
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying 34 Motion to Phase Discovery and adopting 31 Proposed Stipulated Discovery Schedule/Order. The parties shall proceed with all discovery. Signed by District Judge J. Garvan Murtha on 7/30/2015. (esb)
|
March 25, 2015 |
Filing
15
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 11 Motion to Dismiss; denying 11 Motion for More Definite Statement; denying 12 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; denying 12 Motion for More Definite Statement. Plain tiff may move to amend her complaint by 4/24/2015. The parties shall file a proposed Stipulated Discovery Schedule on or before 4/24/2015. See D. Vt. L.R.26(a). Signed by District Judge J. Garvan Murtha on 3/25/2015. (esb) Text clarified on 3/25/2015 (jlh)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Vermont District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Search for this case: Lewis v. Bellows Falls Congregation of Jehovah's Witnesses, Bellows Falls, Vermont, Inc. et al |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Plaintiff: Annessa Lewis |
Represented By: |
Jerome F. O'Neill, Esq. |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: Bellows Falls Congregation of Jehovah's Witnesses, Bellows Falls, Vermont, Inc. |
Represented By: |
Pietro J. Lynn, Esq. |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: Watchtower Bible and Tract Society of New York, Inc. |
Represented By: |
Pietro J. Lynn, Esq. |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: Norton True |
Represented By: |
Thomas W. Costello |
Represented By: |
William E. Kraham, Esq. |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?