Broadcast Music, Inc. et al v. Sierra Enterprises, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Broadcast Music, Inc, Broadcast Music, Inc., Rising Gorge Music, Don Kirshner Entertainment Company and Cruven, Inc. a Joint Venture doing business as Kirshner CBS Music Publishing, Painted Desert Music Corporation, Interior Music Corp., Songs of Universal, Inc. and EMI Blackwood Music, Inc.
Defendant: Sierra Enterprises, Inc, Lauren D. Bryant, Sierra Enterprises, Inc. doing business as The Publyk House and Steven E. Bryant
Not Classified By Court: ENE Evaluator
Case Number: 1:2016cv00276
Filed: October 19, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Vermont
Office: Brattleboro Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: J Garvan Murtha
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17 U.S.C. ยง 101
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 14, 2017. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 14, 2017 Filing 39 STIPULATED NOTICE of Dismissal With Prejudice by Broadcast Music, Inc.(Vitt, Geoffrey)
September 7, 2017 Filing 38 NOTICE of Dismissal With Prejudice by Broadcast Music, Inc..(Vitt, Geoffrey)
July 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER denying without prejudice #23 Motion to Compel in light of #36 Evaluator's Report. Signed by District Judge J. Garvan Murtha on 7/12/2017. (This is a text-only Order.) (kbl)
June 23, 2017 Filing 36 REPORT of Early Neutral Evaluator. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Cleary, David)
June 22, 2017 Filing 35 REPLY to Response to #23 MOTION to Compel Discovery Response filed by Broadcast Music, Inc.. (Vitt, Geoffrey)
June 15, 2017 Filing 34 DISCOVERY CERTIFICATE re: Defendants L.R. 16.1(h) Evaluation Statement by Lauren D. Bryant, Steven E. Bryant, Sierra Enterprises, Inc..(Kennelly, John)
June 9, 2017 Filing 33 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re: Confidential Mediation Statement by Broadcast Music, Inc..(Vitt, Geoffrey) Text clarified on 6/14/2017 (jlh).
June 9, 2017 Filing 32 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re: Confidential Mediation Statement by Broadcast Music, Inc..(Vitt, Geoffrey) Text clarified on 6/14/2017 (jlh).
June 9, 2017 Filing 31 DISCOVERY CERTIFICATE - Request for Admissions by Lauren D. Bryant, Steven E. Bryant, Sierra Enterprises, Inc..(Kennelly, John)
June 9, 2017 Filing 30 RESPONSE to #23 MOTION to Compel Discovery Response filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Kennelly, John)
June 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER granting absent objection #22 MOTION to Reschedule Early Neutral Evaluation. ENE set for 6/23/2017 at 9:00 AM. Signed by District Judge J. Garvan Murtha on 6/7/2016. (This is a text-only Order.) (kbl)
June 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER granting #26 Assented-To Motion to Extend Defendants' Time to Respond re: #23 MOTION to Compel Discovery. Defendants' response shall be filed on or before 6/9/2017. Signed by District Judge J. Garvan Murtha on 6/6/2017. (This is a text-only Order.) (kbl)
June 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER granting #24 Motion to be Relieved as Counsel re: Lloyd J. Weinstein, Esq. for dfts; finding as moot #24 request for stay to permit dfts an opportunity to retain counsel. Signed by District Judge J. Garvan Murtha on 6/6/2017. (This is a text-only Order.) (kbl)
June 1, 2017 Filing 26 ASSENTED-TO MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #23 MOTION to Compel Discovery Response filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Kennelly, John)
June 1, 2017 Filing 25 NOTICE of Attorney Substitution by John J. Kennelly, Esq as to Lauren D. Bryant, Steven E. Bryant, Sierra Enterprises, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Kennelly, John)
May 30, 2017 Filing 24 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney and REQUEST for Interim Stay filed by Lauren D. Bryant, Steven E. Bryant, Sierra Enterprises, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Lloyd Weinstein, #2 Certificate of Service)(Weinstein, Lloyd). Added MOTION to Stay, attachment names clarified on 5/31/2017 (jlh).
May 18, 2017 Filing 23 MOTION to Compel Discovery Response filed by Broadcast Music, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Geoffrey J. Vitt, #2 Affidavit of Phillipa Gage Lilienthal)(Vitt, Geoffrey)
May 18, 2017 Filing 22 MOTION to Modify the Discovery Schedule/Order filed by Broadcast Music, Inc..(Vitt, Geoffrey)
May 11, 2017 Filing 21 ENE LETTER to counsel re: past-due ENE session date. Responses due by 5/18/2017. (hbc)
March 6, 2017 Filing 20 DISCOVERY CERTIFICATE - First Request for Admissions, First Request for Production of Documents and First Set of Interrogatories by Broadcast Music, Inc. (Vitt, Geoffrey) Text clarified on 3/7/2017 (law).
March 1, 2017 Filing 19 DISCOVERY CERTIFICATE - Initial Disclosures by Lauren D. Bryant, Steven E. Bryant, Sierra Enterprises, Inc..(Weinstein, Lloyd)
March 1, 2017 Filing 18 DISCOVERY CERTIFICATE - Initial Disclosures by Broadcast Music, Inc..(Vitt, Geoffrey)
February 15, 2017 Filing 17 NOTICE OF DOCKET ENTRY CORRECTION re: #15 Stipulated Discovery Schedule/Order. The document was in edit mode and has been replaced on the docket. The corrected document is now attached to #15 as well as this entry. (jlh)
February 14, 2017 Filing 16 NOTICE OF DOCKET ENTRY CORRECTION re: #15 Stipulated Discovery Schedule/Order. Docket text has been clarified to show ENE is set for 4/7/17. (jlh)
February 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 15 STIPULATED DISCOVERY SCHEDULE/ORDER Discovery due by 8/30/2017. Motions due by 11/1/2017. Early Neutral Evaluation set for 4/7/2017 at 09:00 AM. Ready for Trial by 2/1/2018. Signed by District Judge J. Garvan Murtha on 2/14/2017. (kak) ENE date corrected on 2/14/2017 (jlh). (Main Document 15 replaced on 2/15/2017) (jlh).
February 13, 2017 Filing 14 PROPOSED Stipulated Discovery Schedule/Order by Broadcast Music, Inc.(Vitt, Geoffrey)
January 19, 2017 Filing 13 ENE Evaluator David L. Cleary, Esq. assigned. (hbc)
January 17, 2017 Filing 12 ENE Evaluator Selection Response by Broadcast Music, Inc.(Vitt, Geoffrey)
December 30, 2016 Filing 11 ENE LETTER re: Potential Evaluators sent; responses due by 1/17/2017. (hbc)
December 30, 2016 Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint by Lauren D. Bryant, Steven E. Bryant, Sierra Enterprises, Inc..(Weinstein, Lloyd)
November 28, 2016 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Lauren D. Bryant, Steven E. Bryant, Sierra Enterprises, Inc. re #8 Stipulation.(Weinstein, Lloyd)
November 24, 2016 Filing 8 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer, Move or Respond re #1 Complaint, by Lauren D. Bryant, Steven E. Bryant, Sierra Enterprises, Inc. (Weinstein, Lloyd)
November 23, 2016 Filing 7 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Lloyd J. Weinstein, Esq on behalf of Lauren D. Bryant, Steven E. Bryant, Sierra Enterprises, Inc..(Weinstein, Lloyd)
November 10, 2016 Filing 6 SUMMONS RETURNED Executed. Steven E. Bryant served on 11/7/2016, answer due 11/28/2016. (Vitt, Geoffrey) Party served added on 11/10/2016 (jlh).
November 10, 2016 Filing 5 SUMMONS RETURNED Executed. Lauren D. Bryant served on 11/7/2016, answer due 11/28/2016.(Vitt, Geoffrey) Party served added on 11/10/2016 (jlh).
November 10, 2016 Filing 4 SUMMONS RETURNED Executed. Sierra Enterprises, Inc. served on 11/7/2016, answer due 11/28/2016.(Vitt, Geoffrey) Party served corrected on 11/10/2016 (jlh).
October 20, 2016 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Local Rule 7.1(a) by Broadcast Music, Inc. (Vitt, Geoffrey)
October 19, 2016 Filing 2 MAILED: Form AO 121 to Register of Copyrights (Document image is sealed). (esb)
October 19, 2016 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Lauren D. Bryant, Steven E. Bryant, Sierra Enterprises, Inc. filed by Songs of Universal, Inc., Don Kirshner Entertainment Company and Cruven, Inc., Rising Gorge Music, Painted Desert Music Corporation, Interior Music Corp., Broadcast Music, Inc., EMI Blackwood Music, Inc.. Summonses issued. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (esb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Vermont District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Broadcast Music, Inc. et al v. Sierra Enterprises, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sierra Enterprises, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lauren D. Bryant
Represented By: Lloyd J. Weinstein, Esq.
Represented By: John J. Kennelly, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sierra Enterprises, Inc. doing business as The Publyk House
Represented By: Lloyd J. Weinstein, Esq.
Represented By: John J. Kennelly, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven E. Bryant
Represented By: Lloyd J. Weinstein, Esq.
Represented By: John J. Kennelly, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Broadcast Music, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Broadcast Music, Inc.
Represented By: Geoffrey J. Vitt, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rising Gorge Music
Represented By: Geoffrey J. Vitt, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Don Kirshner Entertainment Company and Cruven, Inc. a Joint Venture doing business as Kirshner CBS Music Publishing
Represented By: Geoffrey J. Vitt, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Painted Desert Music Corporation
Represented By: Geoffrey J. Vitt, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Interior Music Corp.
Represented By: Geoffrey J. Vitt, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Songs of Universal, Inc.
Represented By: Geoffrey J. Vitt, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EMI Blackwood Music, Inc.
Represented By: Geoffrey J. Vitt, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: ENE Evaluator
Represented By: David L. Cleary, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?