Simuro et al v. Shedd et al

Plaintiff: Ernest Simuro
Defendant: Linda Shedd, Erin Keefe, Windsor, Town of and Does 1 through X
Case Number: 2:2013cv00030
Filed: February 13, 2013
Court: Vermont District Court
Office: Burlington Office
County: Windsor
Presiding Judge: William K. Sessions
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 1, 2016 166 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER granting the Town of Windsor's 122 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings; granting in part and denying in part defendant Shedd's 141 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying as moot the Town of Windsor's 142 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge William K. Sessions III on 3/31/2016. (law)
November 6, 2014 109 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER AND OPINION granting in part and denying in part 103 Motion to Quash Subpoena of Defendant Linda Shedd. Signed by Judge William K. Sessions III on 11/6/2014. (law)
April 15, 2014 73 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting 63 Motion for Leave to File First Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge William K. Sessions III on 4/15/2014. (law)
July 23, 2013 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER AND OPINION granting 20 Motion to Dismiss without prejudice in regard to Shedd's individual liability for gross negligent conduct, which forms the legal basis of Counts IX and XII. Signed by Judge William K. Sessions III on 7/23/2013. (law)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Vermont District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Simuro et al v. Shedd et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ernest Simuro
Represented By: Michael J. Lightfoot, Esq.
Represented By: Erin M. Murphy, Esq.
Represented By: Stephen B. Sadowsky, Esq.
Represented By: Wayne R. Young, Esq.
Represented By: Michael J. Lightfoot, Esq.
Represented By: Erin M. Murphy, Esq.
Represented By: Stephen B. Sadowsky, Esq.
Represented By: Wayne R. Young, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Linda Shedd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Erin Keefe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Windsor, Town of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through X
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?