Drake et al v. Allergan, Inc.
Plaintiff: |
Kevin Drake and Lori Drake |
Defendant: |
Allergan, Inc. |
Case Number: |
2:2013cv00234 |
Filed: |
September 3, 2013 |
Court: |
US District Court for the District of Vermont |
Office: |
Burlington Office |
County: |
XX US, Outside State |
Presiding Judge: |
William K. Sessions |
Nature of Suit: |
Personal Injury: Health Care |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. § 1332 |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
May 22, 2015 |
Filing
212
OPINION AND ORDER granting 206 Motion for Judgment on Verdict; denying 207 Post-trial Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law or, in the alternative, MOTION for New Trial. Signed by Judge William K. Sessions III on 5/22/2015. (law)
|
October 31, 2014 |
Filing
153
OPINION AND ORDER denying 94 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge William K. Sessions III on 10/31/2014. (law)
|
October 29, 2014 |
Filing
139
OPINION AND ORDER denying 124 MOTION to Compel Production of Materials Relating to Plaintiffs' Expert Dr. David Kessler. Signed by Judge William K. Sessions III on 10/29/2014. (hbc)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Vermont District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Search for this case: Drake et al v. Allergan, Inc. |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Plaintiff: Kevin Drake |
Represented By: |
Katherine L. Amestoy, Esq. |
Represented By: |
Leo A. Bisson, Jr., Esq. |
Represented By: |
Ray C. Chester, Esq. |
Represented By: |
Andrew M. Edge, Esq. |
Represented By: |
Stephen M. Orsinger, Esq. |
Represented By: |
Brian T. Thompson, Esq. |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Plaintiff: Lori Drake |
Represented By: |
Katherine L. Amestoy, Esq. |
Represented By: |
Leo A. Bisson, Jr., Esq. |
Represented By: |
Ray C. Chester, Esq. |
Represented By: |
Andrew M. Edge, Esq. |
Represented By: |
Stephen M. Orsinger, Esq. |
Represented By: |
Brian T. Thompson, Esq. |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: Allergan, Inc. |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?