National Federation of the Blind et al v. Scribd, Inc.
Plaintiff: National Federation of the Blind and Heidi Viens
Defendant: Scribd, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2014cv00162
Filed: July 29, 2014
Court: US District Court for the District of Vermont
Office: Burlington Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: William K. Sessions
Nature of Suit: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 54 OPINION AND ORDER denying 37 Motion for Certification of Order for Interlocutory Review and denying as moot MOTION to Stay Action Pending Further Appellate Proceedings. Signed by Judge William K. Sessions III on 5/29/2015. (law)
March 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 30 OPINION AND ORDER denying 13 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Signed by Judge William K. Sessions III on 3/19/2015. (law)
February 11, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting 21 Unopposed Motion to Request Transcriptionists for Plaintiffs' Attorney. Signed by Judge William K. Sessions III on 2/10/2015. (law)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Vermont District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: National Federation of the Blind et al v. Scribd, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: National Federation of the Blind
Represented By: Gregory P. Care, Esq.
Represented By: James T. DeWeese, Esq.
Represented By: Daniel F. Goldstein, Esq.
Represented By: Emily J. Joselson, Esq.
Represented By: Laurence Paradis, Esq.
Represented By: Rebecca J. Rodgers, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Heidi Viens
Represented By: Gregory P. Care, Esq.
Represented By: James T. DeWeese, Esq.
Represented By: Haben Girma, Esq.
Represented By: Daniel F. Goldstein, Esq.
Represented By: Emily J. Joselson, Esq.
Represented By: Laurence Paradis, Esq.
Represented By: Rebecca J. Rodgers, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scribd, Inc.
Represented By: Haben Girma, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?