Browe et al v. CTC Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Donna Browe, Tyler Burgess, Bonnie Jamieson, Philip Jordan and Lucille Launderville
Defendant: CTC Corporation and Bruce Laumeister
Case Number: 2:2015cv00267
Filed: December 28, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of Vermont
Office: Burlington Office
County: Bennington
Presiding Judge: Christina Reiss
Nature of Suit: Employee Retirement Income Security Act of 1974
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 221 OPINION AND ORDER Regarding Post-Trial Issues. Signed by Judge Christina Reiss on 10/18/2018. (pac) Filing date corrected on 10/19/2018 (jlh).
June 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 216 FINDINGS OF FACT AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW: The Court GRANTS judgment for Defendants re: Count I, for Plaintiffs on Counts III through V, for Plaintiffs on Count VI and for Defendants re: counterclaim seeking a right of contribution and indemnification. The Court DENIES Plaintiffs' request re: Count II. Award of attorney's fees is declined at this time for either party. Plaintiffs shall have thirty (30) days from the date of this Order to specify their requested relief. Defendants shall file an opposition and specify the contribution and indemnification they seek within thirty (30) days of Plaintiffs' request. Signed by Judge Christina Reiss on 6/22/2018. (esb)
December 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 182 OPINION AND ORDER Granting in Part 162 Plaintiffs' Motion in Limine to Exclude the Opinions Offered by Timothy Voigt and James Herlihy and Conditionally Denying 163 Plaintiffs' Motion in Limine to Exclude Testimony from Arthur Wolfe. Signed by Chief Judge Christina Reiss on 12/1/2017. (pac)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Vermont District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Browe et al v. CTC Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donna Browe
Represented By: Patrick J. Bernal, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tyler Burgess
Represented By: Patrick J. Bernal, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bonnie Jamieson
Represented By: Patrick J. Bernal, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Philip Jordan
Represented By: Patrick J. Bernal, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lucille Launderville
Represented By: Patrick J. Bernal, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CTC Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bruce Laumeister
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?