Young v. Department of Corrections

Plaintiff: Diheim Young
Defendant: Department of Corrections
Case Number: 2:2016cv00143
Filed: May 27, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Vermont
Office: Burlington Office
County: Addison
Presiding Judge: John M. Conroy
Presiding Judge: William K. Sessions
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 23 AMENDED ORDER Adopting 21 Report and Recommendation denying 14 Motion for Extension of Time to Amend Complaint; denying 16 Motion to Appoint Counsel. This case is closed. Signed by Judge William K. Sessions III on 9/26/2017. (jam)
September 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER Adopting 21 Report and Recommendation denying 14 Motion for Extension of Time to Amend Complaint; denying 16 Motion to Appoint Counsel. Signed by Judge William K. Sessions III on 9/26/2017. (jam)
November 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER Adopting 8 Report and Recommendation granting 5 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Plaintiff is allowed 30 days in which to file an amended complaint. Signed by Judge William K. Sessions III on 11/2/2016. (law)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Vermont District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Young v. Department of Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Diheim Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?