Witherbee v. Town of Brattleboro et al

Plaintiff: Penny Witherbee
Defendant: Peter Elwell, Michael R. Fitzgerald, Patrick M. Moreland, Mark E. Carnigan, Brattleboro Police Department and Brattleboro, Town of
Case Number: 2:2018cv00113
Filed: July 16, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Vermont
Office: Burlington Office
County: Windham
Presiding Judge: Christina Reiss
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 11, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Kaveh Shahi, Esq. for Patrick M. Moreland and MOTION to Dismiss filed by Patrick M. Moreland. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Shahi, Kaveh) Text clarified on 9/11/2018 (law).
August 15, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Constance T. Pell, Esq on behalf of Mark E. Carnigan. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Pell, Constance)
July 16, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Brattleboro Police Department, Town of Brattleboro, Mark E. Carnigan, Peter Elwell, Michael R. Fitzgerald, Patrick M. Moreland filed by Penny Witherbee. Summonses issued. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service) (pac)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Vermont District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Witherbee v. Town of Brattleboro et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peter Elwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael R. Fitzgerald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patrick M. Moreland
Represented By: Kaveh S. Shahi, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark E. Carnigan
Represented By: Constance T. Pell, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brattleboro Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brattleboro, Town of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Penny Witherbee
Represented By: Susan T. Edwards, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?