Firemen's Insurance Company of Washington, D.C. v. Keymont Construction, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Firemen's Insurance Company of Washington, D.C.
Defendant: Fairlee, Town of, Keymont Construction, Inc. and Town of Fairlee
Case Number: 2:2018cv00115
Filed: July 19, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Vermont
Office: Burlington Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Christina Reiss
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 13, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 13, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Michael F. Aylward, Esq on behalf of Firemen's Insurance Company of Washington, D.C..(Aylward, Michael)
September 13, 2018 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint by Town of Fairlee. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service Certificate of Service)(Meub, William)
August 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER GRANTING #5 Assented to Motion for Extension of Time to Answer #1 Complaint. Defendant Town of Fairlee's Answer is due 9/15/2018. Signed by Judge Christina Reiss on 8/23/2018. (This is a text-only Order.) (ejh)
August 21, 2018 Filing 5 CONSENED TO MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Fairlee, Town of. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Larson, Christopher)
August 21, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Christopher J. Larson, Esq on behalf of Fairlee, Town of.(Larson, Christopher)
August 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER GRANTING #2 Motion of Michael F. Aylward, Esq. for Admission Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Christina Reiss on 8/2/2018. (This is a text-only Order.) (ejh)
July 31, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION for Appearance Pro Hac Vice of Michael F. Ayward filed by Firemen's Insurance Company of Washington, D.C. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Michael F. Aylward, #2 Certificate of Good Standing)(jlh)
July 19, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Declaratory Relief against Town of Fairlee, Vermont, Keymont Construction, Inc. filed by Firemen's Insurance Company of Washington, D.C. Summonses issued. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (pac)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Vermont District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Firemen's Insurance Company of Washington, D.C. v. Keymont Construction, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fairlee, Town of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keymont Construction, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Town of Fairlee
Represented By: Christopher J. Larson, Esq.
Represented By: William H. Meub
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Firemen's Insurance Company of Washington, D.C.
Represented By: William A. Staar, Esq.
Represented By: Michael F. Aylward, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?