Lewis v. Menard et al

Plaintiff: Michael J. Lewis
Defendant: John Does (1), Jane Does (2), David Turner, Jane Does (1), Joel Machado, Korey Stone, Joshua Rutherford, Lisa M. Menard and John Does (2)
Case Number: 2:2018cv00123
Filed: August 2, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Vermont
Office: Burlington Office
County: Windsor
Presiding Judge: John M Conroy
Referring Judge: Christina Reiss
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 4, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 4, 2018 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed: Lisa M. Menard waiver sent on 8/15/2018, answer due 10/15/2018.(law)
September 4, 2018 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed: Joel Machado waiver sent on 8/15/2018, answer due 10/15/2018.(law)
September 4, 2018 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed: David Turner waiver sent on 8/15/2018, answer due 10/15/2018.(law)
September 4, 2018 Filing 7 WAIVERS OF SERVICE Returned Executed: Joshua Rutherford waivers sent on 8/15/2018, answer due 10/15/2018.(law)
September 4, 2018 Filing 6 WAIVERS OF SERVICE Returned Executed: Korey Stone waivers sent on 8/15/2018, answer due 10/15/2018.(law)
August 15, 2018 ISSUED Waiver as to Lisa Menard, David Turner, Korey Stone, Joshua Rutherford, Joel Machado. (eh) Text clarified on 8/16/2018 (law).
August 13, 2018 Filing 5 COMPLAINT against Lisa M. Menard, Joshua Rutherford, Joel Machado, Korey Stone, David Turner, Jane Does (1), John Does (1), Jane Does (2), John Does (2) filed by Michael J. Lewis. (Attachments: #1 Attached 1, #2 Attached 2, #3 Complaint Exhibits, #4 Exhibit A, #5 Exhibit B, #6 Exhibit C, #7 Exhibit D, #8 Exhibit E, #9 Exhibit F, #10 Exhibit G, #11 Exhibit H, #12 Exhibit I, #13 Exhibit J, #14 Exhibit K, #15 Exhibit L, #16 Exhibit M, #17 Exhibit N, #18 Exhibit O, #19 Exhibit P, #20 Exhibit Q, #21 Exhibit R, #22 Complaint) (eh) Defendants clarified on 8/16/2018 (law).
August 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER Directing Monthly Payments be made from the prison account of Michael J. Lewis. Signed by Judge John M. Conroy on 8/13/2018. (eh)
August 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis. Signed by Judge John M. Conroy on 8/13/2018. (eh)
August 2, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE OF PRO SE APPEARANCE by Michael J. Lewis. (eh)
August 2, 2018 Filing 1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis filed by Michael J. Lewis. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Michael J. Lewis, #2 Proposed Complaint (sealed), #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (eh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Vermont District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lewis v. Menard et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does (1)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Does (2)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Does (1)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joel Machado
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Korey Stone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joshua Rutherford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lisa M. Menard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does (2)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael J. Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?