Tucker v. Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC
Plaintiff: Toby Tucker
Defendant: Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC
Case Number: 2:2018cv00140
Filed: August 30, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Vermont
Presiding Judge: Christina Reiss
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 26, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 26, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Douglas J. Wolinsky, Esq on behalf of Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Wolinsky, Douglas)
October 5, 2018 Filing 2 AFFIDAVIT of Service filed by Toby Tucker. Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC served on 10/5/2018, answer due 10/26/2018(Cohen, Joshua)
September 13, 2018 ISSUED Summons as to Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC.(law)
August 30, 2018 Filing 1 CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT against Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC filed by Toby Tucker. Summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (pac)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Vermont District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tucker v. Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC
Represented By: Douglas J. Wolinsky, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Toby Tucker
Represented By: Joshua R.I. Cohen, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?