Addison County Sheriff's Department v. United States Office of Special Counsel
Plaintiff: Addison County Sheriff's Department
Defendant: United States Office of Special Counsel
Case Number: 2:2018cv00143
Filed: August 31, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Vermont
Presiding Judge: Christina Reiss
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05:552
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 9, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 9, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE OF DOCKET ENTRY CORRECTION re: #3 Answer to Complaint filed by United States Office of Special Counsel. The document has been replaced to correct the information in the Certificate of Service. The corrected document is now attached to #3 as well as this entry. (jlh)
October 9, 2018 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint by United States Office of Special Counsel.(Torti, Julia) (Main Document 3 replaced on 10/9/2018) (jlh).
September 14, 2018 Filing 2 SUMMONS Returned Executed. United States Office of Special Counsel served on 9/6/2018, answer due 11/5/2018. (Attachments: #1 Summons as to U.S. Attorney General, #2 Summons as to United States of Special Counsel)(law)
August 31, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief against United States Office of Special Counsel filed by Addison County Sheriff's Department. Summonses issued. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (pac) Text clarified on 8/31/2018 (law).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Vermont District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Addison County Sheriff's Department v. United States Office of Special Counsel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Office of Special Counsel
Represented By: Julia L. Torti, AUSA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Addison County Sheriff's Department
Represented By: James C. Foley, Jr., Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?