Lander v. Sun Life Assurance Company of Canada
Plaintiff: Caley Lander
Defendant: Sun Life Assurance Company of Canada
Case Number: 2:2018cv00152
Filed: September 19, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Vermont
Presiding Judge: John M Conroy
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1001
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 15, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint. Answer due 12/21/2018. Signed by Judge John M. Conroy on 11/15/2018. (This is a text-only Order.) (eh)
November 15, 2018 Filing 7 STIPULATED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint filed by Sun Life Assurance Company of Canada.(Decker, Byrne)
November 14, 2018 Filing 6 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Local Rule 7.1(a) by Sun Life Assurance Company of Canada (Decker, Byrne)
November 14, 2018 Filing 5 CONSENT to Direct Assignment by Sun Life Assurance Company of Canada (Decker, Byrne)
October 25, 2018 Filing 4 CONSENT to Direct Assignment by Caley Lander (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Anderson, Arthur)
October 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER: Plaintiff's Magistrate Judge Assignment Form due by 11/6/2018. Signed by Judge John M. Conroy on 10/19/2018. (hbc)
October 2, 2018 Filing 2 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed: Sun Life Assurance Company of Canada waiver sent on 9/25/2018, answer due 11/26/2018.(Anderson, Arthur)
September 19, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Sun Life Assurance Company of Canada filed by Caley Lander. Summons issued. LR 73 Forms issued. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (eh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Vermont District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lander v. Sun Life Assurance Company of Canada
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sun Life Assurance Company of Canada
Represented By: Byrne J. Decker, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Caley Lander
Represented By: Arthur P. Anderson, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?