McDermott v. Town of Castleton et al

Plaintiff: Cheri McDermott
Defendant: Castleton, Town of and Peter Mantello
Case Number: 2:2018cv00156
Filed: September 27, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Vermont
Presiding Judge: William K Sessions
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 8, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 8, 2018 Filing 4 DISCOVERY CERTIFICATE re: Affidavit of Service of Subpoena to Produce Documents, Information, or Objects or to Permit Inspection of Premises in a Civil Action and Schedule A by Cheri McDermott.(Levins, III, James)
November 8, 2018 Filing 3 AFFIDAVIT of Service filed by Cheri McDermott. Subpoena served upon Joseph DeLorey, AFSCME Counsel 93 on November 7, 2018 (Levins, III, James)
October 26, 2018 Filing 2 ACKNOWLEDGMENT/ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE. Peter Mantello, Town of Castleton served on 10/19/2018, answers due 11/9/2018.(Levins, III, James) Text clarified on 10/26/2018 (law).
September 27, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Town of Castleton, Peter Mantello filed by Cheri McDermott.Summonses issued. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(law)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Vermont District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McDermott v. Town of Castleton et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cheri McDermott
Represented By: James G. Levins, III, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Castleton, Town of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peter Mantello
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?