American Cable Association et al v. Scott et al Featured Case

A lawsuit filed by US telecommunications organizations against the State of Vermont to stop a state law which, in order to qualify for government contracts, requires ISPs follow net neutrality principles.

Plaintiff: CTIA - The Wireless Association, USTelecom - The Broadband Association, New England Cable & Telecommunications Association, NCTA - The Internet & Television Association and American Cable Association
Defendant: Philip B. Scott, June E. Tierney, Susanne R. Young and John J. Quinn, III
Case Number: 2:2018cv00167
Filed: October 18, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Vermont
0 Judge: John M Conroy
1 Judge: Christina Reiss
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 47:151
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 8, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 8, 2018 Filing 22 NOTICE of Case Reassignment pursuant to Local Rule 73(d). Case reassigned to Judge Christina Reiss. Judge John M. Conroy no longer assigned to the case. (law)
November 8, 2018 Filing 21 OBJECTION to Direct Assignment by American Cable Association, CTIA - The Wireless Association, NCTA - The Internet & Television Association, New England Cable & Telecommunications Association, USTelecom - The Broadband Association (Pocius, David)
November 8, 2018 Filing 20 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by American Cable Association, CTIA - The Wireless Association, USTelecom - The Broadband Association re #18 Waiver of Service Returned Executed, #17 Waiver of Service Returned Executed, #16 Waiver of Service Returned Executed, #19 Waiver of Service Returned Executed.(Pocius, David)
November 8, 2018 Filing 19 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed: June E. Tierney waiver sent on 10/23/2018, answer due 12/24/2018.(Pocius, David)
November 8, 2018 Filing 18 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed: John J. Quinn, III waiver sent on 10/23/2018, answer due 12/24/2018.(Pocius, David)
November 8, 2018 Filing 17 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed: Susanne R. Young waiver sent on 10/23/2018, answer due 12/24/2018.(Pocius, David)
November 8, 2018 Filing 16 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed: Philip B. Scott waiver sent on 10/23/2018, answer due 12/24/2018.(Pocius, David)
October 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #10 MOTION for Appearance Pro Hac Vice of Brendan J. Crimmins; granting #11 MOTION for Appearance Pro Hac Vice of Scott H. Angsteich; granting #12 MOTION for Appearance Pro Hac Vice of Jeffrey A. Lamken; granting #13 MOTION for Appearance Pro Hac Vice of Adam J. Tuetken; granting #14 MOTION for Appearance Pro Hac Vice of Matthew T. Murchison. Signed by Judge John M. Conroy on 10/26/2018. (This is a text-only Order.) (hbc)
October 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #7 MOTION for Appearance Pro Hac Vice of Rachel P. May; granting #8 MOTION for Appearance Pro Hac Vice of Matthew A. Brill. Signed by Judge John M. Conroy on 10/26/2018. (This is a text-only Order.) (hbc)
October 25, 2018 Filing 14 MOTION for Appearance Pro Hac Vice of Matthew T. Murchison filed by American Cable Association, CTIA - The Wireless Association, NCTA - The Internet & Television Association, New England Cable & Telecommunications Association, USTelecom - The Broadband Association. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Certificate of Good Standing)(jlh)
October 25, 2018 Filing 13 MOTION for Appearance Pro Hac Vice of Adam J. Tuetken filed by American Cable Association, CTIA - The Wireless Association, NCTA - The Internet & Television Association, New England Cable & Telecommunications Association, USTelecom - The Broadband Association. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Certificate of Good Standing)(jlh)
October 25, 2018 Filing 12 MOTION for Appearance Pro Hac Vice of Jeffrey A. Lamken filed by American Cable Association, CTIA - The Wireless Association, NCTA - The Internet & Television Association, New England Cable & Telecommunications Association, USTelecom - The Broadband Association. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Certificate of Good Standing)(jlh)
October 25, 2018 Filing 11 MOTION for Appearance Pro Hac Vice of Scott H. Angsteich filed by American Cable Association, CTIA - The Wireless Association, NCTA - The Internet & Television Association, New England Cable & Telecommunications Association, USTelecom - The Broadband Association. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Certificate of Good Standing)(jlh)
October 25, 2018 Filing 10 MOTION for Appearance Pro Hac Vice of Brendan J. Crimmins filed by American Cable Association, CTIA - The Wireless Association, NCTA - The Internet & Television Association, New England Cable & Telecommunications Association, USTelecom - The Broadband Association. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Certificate of Good Standing)(jlh)
October 25, 2018 Filing 8 MOTION for Appearance Pro Hac Vice of Matthew A. Brill filed by American Cable Association, CTIA - The Wireless Association, NCTA - The Internet & Television Association, New England Cable & Telecommunications Association, USTelecom - The Broadband Association. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Certificate of Good Standing)(jlh)
October 25, 2018 Filing 7 MOTION for Appearance Pro Hac Vice of Rachel P. May filed by American Cable Association, CTIA - The Wireless Association, NCTA - The Internet & Television Association, New England Cable & Telecommunications Association, USTelecom - The Broadband Association. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Certificate of Good Standing)(jlh)
October 23, 2018 ISSUED Summons as to John J. Quinn, III, Philip B. Scott, June E. Tierney, Susanne R. Young.(kac)
October 22, 2018 Filing 6 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Local Rule 7.1(a) by USTelecom - The Broadband Association (Pocius, David)
October 22, 2018 Filing 5 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Local Rule 7.1(a) by NCTA - The Internet & Television Association (Pocius, David)
October 22, 2018 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Local Rule 7.1(a) by New England Cable & Telecommunications Association (Pocius, David)
October 22, 2018 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Local Rule 7.1(a) by CTIA - The Wireless Association (Pocius, David)
October 22, 2018 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Local Rule 7.1(a) by American Cable Association (Pocius, David)
October 18, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Philip B. Scott, June E. Tierney, John J. Quinn, III, Susanne R. Young filed by American Cable Association, CTIA - The Wireless Association, New England Cable & Telecommunications Association, USTelecom - The Broadband Association, NCTA - The Internet & Television Association.Summonses issued. LR 73 Forms issued. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(law)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Vermont District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: American Cable Association et al v. Scott et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CTIA - The Wireless Association
Represented By: David M. Pocius, Esq.
Represented By: Scott H. Angstreich, Esq.
Represented By: Brendan J. Crimmins, Esq.
Represented By: Adam Tuetken, Esq.
Represented By: Matthew A. Brill, Esq.
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Lamken, Esq.
Represented By: Rachel P. May, Esq.
Represented By: Matthew T. Murchison, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: USTelecom - The Broadband Association
Represented By: David M. Pocius, Esq.
Represented By: Scott H. Angstreich, Esq.
Represented By: Brendan J. Crimmins, Esq.
Represented By: Adam Tuetken, Esq.
Represented By: Matthew A. Brill, Esq.
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Lamken, Esq.
Represented By: Rachel P. May, Esq.
Represented By: Matthew T. Murchison, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: New England Cable & Telecommunications Association
Represented By: David M. Pocius, Esq.
Represented By: Scott H. Angstreich, Esq.
Represented By: Brendan J. Crimmins, Esq.
Represented By: Adam Tuetken, Esq.
Represented By: Matthew A. Brill, Esq.
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Lamken, Esq.
Represented By: Rachel P. May, Esq.
Represented By: Matthew T. Murchison, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NCTA - The Internet & Television Association
Represented By: David M. Pocius, Esq.
Represented By: Scott H. Angstreich, Esq.
Represented By: Brendan J. Crimmins, Esq.
Represented By: Adam Tuetken, Esq.
Represented By: Matthew A. Brill, Esq.
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Lamken, Esq.
Represented By: Rachel P. May, Esq.
Represented By: Matthew T. Murchison, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: American Cable Association
Represented By: David M. Pocius, Esq.
Represented By: Scott H. Angstreich, Esq.
Represented By: Brendan J. Crimmins, Esq.
Represented By: Adam Tuetken, Esq.
Represented By: Matthew A. Brill, Esq.
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Lamken, Esq.
Represented By: Rachel P. May, Esq.
Represented By: Matthew T. Murchison, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Philip B. Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: June E. Tierney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Susanne R. Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John J. Quinn, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?