Greco et al v. Department of the Air Force of the United States of America, The
Plaintiff: James Leas, Rosanne Greco and Richard Joseph
Defendant: Department of the Air Force of the United States of America, The
Case Number: 2:2018cv00169
Filed: October 19, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Vermont
Office: Burlington Office
Presiding Judge: Christina Reiss
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05:552
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 19, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 19, 2018 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint by Department of the Air Force of the United States of America, The. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Torti, Julia)
November 5, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE OF DOCKET ENTRY CORRECTION re: #4 Summons Returned Executed, 5 Notice of Docket Entry Correction.The docket text of both entries have been clarified to indicate Department of The Air Force of the United States of America was served on 10/19/2018, answer due 12/18/2018. (law)
October 30, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE OF DOCKET ENTRY CORRECTION re: #2 Summons Returned Executed. Docket text has been clarified to show The Department of the Air Force of the United States of America served on 10/19/2018, answer due 12/18/2018. (jlh) Date served clarified on 11/5/2018 (law).
October 29, 2018 Filing 4 SUMMONS RETURNED Executed. The Department of the Air Force of the United States of America (Vermont U.S. Attorney) served on 10/19/2018, answer due 12/18/2018 .(Dumont, James) Text clarified on 11/5/2018 (law).
October 29, 2018 Filing 3 SUMMONS RETURNED Executed. The Department of the Air Force of the United States of America (U.S. Attorney General).(Dumont, James)
October 29, 2018 Filing 2 SUMMONS RETURNED Executed. The Department of the Air Force of the United States of America (Secretary of the Air Force) served on 10/29/2018.(Dumont, James) Text clarified on 11/5/2018 (law).
October 19, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Department of the Air Force of the United States of America, The filed by Rosanne Greco, Richard Joseph, James Leas.Summonses issued. (Attachments: #1 Attachment A, #2 Attachment B, #3 Attachment C, #4 Attachment D, #5 Attachment E, #6 Civil Cover Sheet) (pac)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Vermont District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Greco et al v. Department of the Air Force of the United States of America, The
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Leas
Represented By: James A. Dumont, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rosanne Greco
Represented By: James A. Dumont, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Joseph
Represented By: James A. Dumont, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of the Air Force of the United States of America, The
Represented By: Julia L. Torti, AUSA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?