Commo v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Lynn L. Commo
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Case Number: 2:2018cv00197
Filed: November 26, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Vermont
Presiding Judge: John M Conroy
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 15, 2019 Filing 11 CONSENT to Direct Assignment by Commissioner of Social Security Administration (Peck, Jason)
December 28, 2018 Filing 10 NOTICE OF DOCKET ENTRY CORRECTION re: #9 Certificate of Service filed by Lynn L. Commo. The docket entry has been clarified to indicated Commissioner of Social Security Administration served on 12/13/2018, answer due 2/11/2019. (law)
December 27, 2018 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed. Commissioner of Social Security Administration served on 12/13/2018, answer due 2/11/2019. by Lynn L. Commo. (Attachments: #1 Return Receipts)(Rubenstein, Phyllis) Text clarified on 12/28/2018 (law).
December 27, 2018 Filing 8 CONSENT to Direct Assignment by Lynn L. Commo (Rubenstein, Phyllis)
December 7, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jason P. Peck, SAUSA on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security Administration.(Peck, Jason)
December 6, 2018 ISSUED Summons as to Commissioner of Social Security Administration., ISSUED Local Rule 73 Forms. (eh)
December 5, 2018 Filing 6 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security Administration filed by Lynn L. Commo. (hbc)
December 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #4 REVISED MOTION for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis; denying as moot #1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis. Signed by Judge John M. Conroy on 12/5/2018. (This is a text-only Order.) (hbc)
December 4, 2018 Filing 4 REVISED MOTION for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis filed by Lynn L. Commo. (eh)
November 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER: On or before 12/17/2018, Plaintiff shall file a revised IFP Application wherein Plaintiff shall report the value of the real estate upon which Plaintiff reports a monthly mortgage obligation. See, Doc. 1-1, para. 5 and 6. Signed by Judge John M. Conroy on 11/27/2018. (This is a text-only Order) (eh) Text clarified on 11/28/2018 (hbc).
November 27, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE OF DOCKET ENTRY CORRECTION re: #1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis filed by Lynn L. Commo. The JS 44 Civil Cover Sheet has been replaced to update Sections IV and VIII. The revised document is now attached to #1 and this entry. (law)
November 26, 2018 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis filed by Lynn L. Commo. (Attachments: #1 Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs, #2 Proposed Complaint (image is sealed), #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (eh) (Attachment 3 replaced on 11/27/2018) (law).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Vermont District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Commo v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lynn L. Commo
Represented By: Phyllis E. Rubenstein, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Represented By: Jason P. Peck, SAUSA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?