Shippee v. Bristol-Myers Squibb Company et al
Plaintiff: Kyle Shippee
Defendant: Otsuka America Pharmaceutical, Inc. and Bristol-Myers Squibb Company
Case Number: 2:2018cv00198
Filed: November 26, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Vermont
Presiding Judge: William K Sessions
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 21, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 21, 2018 Filing 17 MOTION to Stay the Time for Filing a Discovery Schedule filed by Bristol-Myers Squibb Company.(Keyes, Allan)
December 21, 2018 Filing 16 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by Bristol-Myers Squibb Company.(Keyes, Allan)
December 10, 2018 Filing 15 ERRATA re: #14 Response to #1 Notice of Removal filed by Kyle Shippee. (jam) Text clarified on 12/11/2018 (law).
December 3, 2018 Filing 14 RESPONSE re #1 Notice of Removal by Kyle Shippee. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service) (originally filed 11/26/2018 in state court) (law)
December 3, 2018 Filing 13 NOTICE by Bristol-Myers Squibb Company re #1 Notice of Removal. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Removal, #2 Certificate of Service) (originally filed 11/26/2018 in state court) (law)
December 3, 2018 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Kyle Shippee re Summons and #10 Complaint. (originally filed 10/2/2018 in state court)(law)
December 3, 2018 Filing 11 LETTER to plaintiff Kyle Shippee. (Attachments: #1 Summons) (originally filed 10/16/2018 in state court) (law)
December 3, 2018 Filing 10 COMPLAINT against Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Otsuka America Pharmaceutical, Inc. filed by Kyle Shippee. (Attachments: #1 Summons) (originally filed 10/15/2018 in state court) (law)
December 3, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE for Self-Represented Litigant by Kyle Shippee. (originally filed 10/15/2018 in state court)(law)
December 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 Application to Waive Filing Fees and Service Costs. Signed by Clerk Kostecki on 10/15/2018. (originally filed 10/15/2018 in state court)(law)
December 3, 2018 Filing 7 APPLICATION to Waive Filing Fees and Service Costs by Kyle Shippee. (originally filed 10/15/2018 in state court) (law)
December 3, 2018 Filing 6 RECEIVED FILE and certified copy of docket sheet from State Court. (law)
November 27, 2018 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint by Bristol-Myers Squibb Company.(Keyes, Allan)
November 26, 2018 Filing 4 LETTER to Vermont Superior Court, Civil Division, Windham Unit requesting original case file and certified docket sheet. (law)
November 26, 2018 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Local Rule 7.1(a) by Bristol-Myers Squibb Company. (law)
November 26, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Allan R. Keyes on behalf of Bristol-Myers Squibb Company.(law)
November 26, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Bristol-Myers Squibb Company from Vermont Superior Court, Windham Unit, Civil Division, case number 377-10-18-Wmcv. ( Filing fee $ 400) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Notice of Filing Notice of Removal, #5 Copy of Plaintiff's Notice of Pro Se Appearance, #6 Copy of Plaintiff's Certificate of Service with IFP Request, #7 Civil Cover Sheet, #8 Certificate of Service)(law)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Vermont District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shippee v. Bristol-Myers Squibb Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Otsuka America Pharmaceutical, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bristol-Myers Squibb Company
Represented By: Allan R. Keyes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kyle Shippee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?