Kent et al v. R.L. Vallee, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Jacob B. Kent, Anne B. Vera, Barbara Carter, Dawn M. Mahar, David C. Carter and Thomas R. Mahar
Defendant: Champlain Oil Co., Inc., S.B. Collins, Inc., Wesco, Inc. and R.L. Vallee, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2018cv00201
Filed: November 28, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Vermont
Presiding Judge: William K Sessions
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1446
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #12 Unopposed Motion to Stay the Filing of Reply Brief and Vacate the Hearing Date. The hearing now scheduled for Tuesday, January 22, 2019 at 2:00 p.m. has been postponed. Signed by Judge William K. Sessions III on 1/11/2019. (This is a text-only Order.) (eae)
January 11, 2019 Filing 12 UNOPPOSED MOTION to Stay Filing of Their Brief and UNOPPOSED MOTION to Continue Hearing re #7 MOTION to Quash Subpoena filed by Daniel McLean, Office of United States Senator Bernard Sanders.(Bryan, Patricia) Link clarified, Added MOTION to Continue on 1/11/2019 (law).
January 8, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Hearing re: #7 MOTION to Quash Subpoena. Motion Hearing set for 1/22/2019 at 02:00 PM in Burlington Courtroom 110 before Judge William K. Sessions III.(jam)
December 13, 2018 Filing 10 RESPONSE in Opposition re #7 MOTION to Quash Subpoena filed by R.L. Vallee, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Tristram J. Coffin, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit K, #13 Exhibit L, #14 Exhibit M, #15 Exhibit N, #16 Exhibit O, #17 Exhibit P, #18 Exhibit Q, #19 Exhibit R, #20 Exhibit S, #21 Exhibit T, #22 Exhibit U, #23 Exhibit V, #24 Exhibit W, #25 Exhibit X, #26 Exhibit Y)(Coffin, Tristram)
December 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 Assented to Motion For Leave to Exceed Page Limit. Signed by Judge William K. Sessions III on 12/13/2018. (This is a text-only Order.) (eae)
December 13, 2018 Filing 8 ASSENTED-TO MOTION for Leave to Exceed Page Limit re #7 MOTION to Quash Subpoena filed by R.L. Vallee, Inc..(Coffin, Tristram)
November 29, 2018 Filing 7 MOTION to Quash Subpoena with Supporting Memorandum filed by Daniel McLean, Office of United States Senator Bernard Sanders. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Bryan, Patricia)
November 29, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Evan J. O'Brien, Esq on behalf of R.L. Vallee, Inc..(O'Brien, Evan)
November 29, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Tristram J. Coffin, Esq on behalf of R.L. Vallee, Inc..(Coffin, Tristram)
November 28, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Grant R. Vinik, Esq on behalf of Daniel McLean, Office of United States Senator Bernard Sanders. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(law)
November 28, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Morgan J. Frankel, Esq on behalf of Daniel McLean, Office of United States Senator Bernard Sanders. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(law)
November 28, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Patricia M. Bryan, Esq on behalf of Daniel McLean, Office of United States Senator Bernard Sanders. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(law)
November 28, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Office of United States Senator Bernard Sanders, Daniel McLean from Vermont Superior Court, Chittenden Unit, Civil Division, case number 617-6-15 Cncv. ( Filing fee $ 400) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Certificate of Service)(law)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Vermont District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kent et al v. R.L. Vallee, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Champlain Oil Co., Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S.B. Collins, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wesco, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R.L. Vallee, Inc.
Represented By: Tristram J. Coffin, Esq.
Represented By: Evan J. O'Brien, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jacob B. Kent
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anne B. Vera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barbara Carter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dawn M. Mahar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David C. Carter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas R. Mahar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?