Rousseau et al v. Coates et al
Plaintiff: Cheryl Rousseau and Peter Rousseau
Defendant: Central Vermont Medical Center, Inc. and John Boyd Coates, III
Case Number: 2:2018cv00205
Filed: December 4, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Vermont
Presiding Judge: William K Sessions
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 18, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 1, 2019 Filing 8 DISCOVERY CERTIFICATE - Interrogatories and Request to Produce to Defendant Coates; Requests to Produce to Defendant CVMC, Inc. by Cheryl Rousseau, Peter Rousseau.(Laramie, Celeste)
January 31, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Entry of Discovery Schedule/Order filed by Cheryl Rousseau, Peter Rousseau. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Service)(Laramie, Celeste)
January 29, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Curtis L.S. Carpenter, Esq on behalf of John Boyd Coates, III.(Carpenter, Curtis)
January 15, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Central Vermont Medical Center, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Berger, Ritchie)
January 11, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction filed by John Boyd Coates, III. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Certificate of Service)(Joslin, Peter)
December 20, 2018 Filing 3 ACKNOWLEDGMENT/ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE. Central Vermont Medical Center, Inc. served on 12/12/2018, answer due 1/2/2019.(O'Neill, Jerome)
December 10, 2018 Filing 2 ACKNOWLEDGMENT/ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE. John Boyd Coates, III served on 12/6/2018, answer due 12/27/2018.(O'Neill, Jerome)
December 4, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Central Vermont Medical Center, Inc., John Boyd Coates, III filed by Peter Rousseau, Cheryl Rousseau. Summonses issued. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(law)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Vermont District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rousseau et al v. Coates et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Central Vermont Medical Center, Inc.
Represented By: Ritchie E. Berger, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Boyd Coates, III
Represented By: Curtis L.S. Carpenter, Esq.
Represented By: Peter B. Joslin, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cheryl Rousseau
Represented By: Celeste E. Laramie, Esq.
Represented By: Jerome F. O'Neill, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peter Rousseau
Represented By: Celeste E. Laramie, Esq.
Represented By: Jerome F. O'Neill, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?