Hicks v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: George William Hicks
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Case Number: 2:2018cv00206
Filed: December 4, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Vermont
Presiding Judge: John M Conroy
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 15, 2019 Filing 6 CONSENT to Direct Assignment by Commissioner of Social Security Administration (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Aden, Sergei)
January 10, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Sergei Aden, SAUSA on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security Administration.(Aden, Sergei)
December 21, 2018 Filing 4 CONSENT to Direct Assignment by George William Hicks. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service) (eh)
December 6, 2018 ISSUED Summons as to Commissioner of Social Security Administration., ISSUED Local Rule 73 Forms. (eh)
December 5, 2018 Filing 3 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security Administration filed by George William Hicks. (hbc)
December 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER granting #1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Judge John M. Conroy on 12/5/2018. (This is a text-only Order.) (hbc)
December 4, 2018 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis filed by George William Hicks. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit in Support of Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, #2 Proposed Complaint (image is sealed), #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (eh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Vermont District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hicks v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: George William Hicks
Represented By: James Torrisi, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Represented By: Sergei Aden, SAUSA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?