Reynolds v. Demas et al
Plaintiff: Jacqueline D. Reynolds
Defendant: Elizabeth Demas, Bruce D. Clarke and Bruce D. Baker
Case Number: 2:2018cv00226
Filed: December 19, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Vermont
Presiding Judge: John M Conroy
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 11, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE OF DOCKET ENTRY CORRECTION re: #7 Consent to Direct Assignment filed by Jacqueline D. Reynolds. The incorrect document was uploaded and has been replaced on the docket. The correct document is now attached to #7 as well as this entry. (jlh)
February 11, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS RETURNED Executed. Elizabeth Demas served on 1/16/2019. (eh) Text clarified on 2/12/2019 (law).
February 11, 2019 Filing 7 CONSENT to Direct Assignment by Jacqueline D. Reynolds. (eh) (Main Document 7 replaced on 2/11/2019) (jlh).
February 5, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint by Elizabeth Demas. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Gagnon, William)
February 5, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by William L. Gagnon, Esq on behalf of Elizabeth Demas. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Gagnon, William)
January 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: On or before 2/20/2019, Plaintiff shall return executed her Magistrate Judge Assignment Form. (This is a text-only Order.) Signed by Judge John M. Conroy on 1/25/2019. (eh)
January 9, 2019 Filing 3 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Elizabeth Demas, Bruce D. Baker filed by Jacqueline D. Reynolds. (Attachments: #1 List of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit 13, #15 Exhibit 14, #16 Exhibit 15, #17 Exhibit 16, #18 Exhibit 17, #19 Exhibit 18, #20 Exhibit 19, #21 Exhibit 20, #22 Exhibit 21, #23 Exhibit 22, #24 Exhibit 23, #25 Exhibit 24, #26 Exhibit 25, #27 Exhibit 26, #28 Exhibit 27, #29 Exhibit 28, #30 Exhibit 29, #31 Exhibit 30, #32 Exhibit 31, #33 Exhibit 32, #34 Exhibit 33, #35 Exhibit 34, #36 Exhibit 35, #37 Exhibit 36, #38 Exhibit 37, #39 Exhibit 38, #40 Exhibit 39, #41 Exhibit 40, #42 Exhibit 41, #43 Exhibit 42, #44 Exhibit 43, #45 Exhibit 44, #46 Exhibit 45, #47 Exhibit 46, #48 Exhibit 47, #49 Exhibit 48, #50 Exhibit 49, #51 Exhibit 50, #52 Exhibit 51) (eh)
December 13, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE OF PRO SE APPEARANCE by Jacqueline D. Reynolds. (eh)
December 13, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Bruce D. Clarke, Elizabeth Demas filed by Jacqueline D. Reynolds. Summons issued as to dft E. Demas. LR 73 Forms issued. (Attachments: #1 List of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit 13, #15 Exhibit 14, #16 Exhibit 15, #17 Exhibit 16, #18 Exhibit 17, #19 Exhibit 18, #20 Exhibit 19, #21 Exhibit 20, #22 Exhibit 21, #23 Exhibit 22, #24 Exhibit 23, #25 Exhibit 24, #26 Exhibit 25, #27 Exhibit 26, #28 Exhibit 27, #29 Exhibit 28, #30 Exhibit 29, #31 Exhibit 30, #32 Exhibit 31, #33 Exhibit 32, #34 Exhibit 33, #35 Exhibit 34, #36 Exhibit 35, #37 Exhibit 36, #38 Exhibit 37, #39 Exhibit 38, #40 Exhibit 39, #41 Exhibit 40, #42 Exhibit 41, #43 Exhibit 42, #44 Exhibit 43, #45 Exhibit 44, #46 Exhibit 45, #47 Exhibit 46, #48 Exhibit 47, #49 Exhibit 48, #50 Exhibit 49, #51 Exhibit 50, #52 Exhibit 51, #53 Civil Cover Sheet)(eh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Vermont District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Reynolds v. Demas et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jacqueline D. Reynolds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elizabeth Demas
Represented By: William L. Gagnon, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bruce D. Clarke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bruce D. Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?