Van Eck v. Deutsche Bank Americas Holding Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Jan Van Eck
Defendant: Deutsche Bank Americas Holding Corporation, Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Deutsche Bank National Trust Company and Deutsche Bank Trust Corporation
Case Number: 2:2018cv00232
Filed: December 28, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Vermont
Presiding Judge: John M Conroy
Referring Judge: William K Sessions
Nature of Suit: Banks and Banking
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 25, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Case Reassignment pursuant to Local Rule 73(d). Case reassigned to Judge William K. Sessions III. Judge John M. Conroy no longer assigned to the case. (law)
February 25, 2019 Filing 7 OBJECTION to Direct Assignment by Jan Van Eck. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(law)
February 21, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Appearance Pro Hac Vice of Chirstopher J. Valente filed by Deutsche Bank Americas Holding Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Certificate of Good Standing)(jlh)
February 19, 2019 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Deutsche Bank Americas Holding Corporation re #4 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim , #3 Notice of Appearance.(Pocius, David)
February 19, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Deutsche Bank Americas Holding Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C) (Pocius, David) Attachment names clarified on 2/22/2019 (hbc).
February 19, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by David M. Pocius, Esq on behalf of Deutsche Bank Americas Holding Corporation.(Pocius, David)
February 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER: On or before 2/25/2019 Plaintiff shall return executed his Magistrate Judge Assignment Form. Signed by Judge John M. Conroy on 2/8/2019. (eh)
December 28, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Deutsche Bank Americas Holding Corporation, Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Deutsche Bank Trust Corporation filed by Jan Van Eck.Summons issued. LR 73 Forms issued. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (eh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Vermont District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Van Eck v. Deutsche Bank Americas Holding Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deutsche Bank Americas Holding Corporation
Represented By: Christopher J. Valente, Esq.
Represented By: David M. Pocius, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deutsche Bank National Trust Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deutsche Bank Trust Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jan Van Eck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?