Ally Bank v. Webster et al

Plaintiff: Ally Bank
Defendant: Best Friends Animal Society, Best Friends Animal Sanctuary and Stephen W. Webster
Case Number: 2:2019cv00021
Filed: February 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Vermont
Presiding Judge: William K Sessions
Nature of Suit: Banks and Banking
Cause of Action: 28:1335
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 18, 2019 Filing 54 DISCOVERY CERTIFICATE re: Audio Recording of the October 15 2018 Windsor Probate Division Hearing by Stephen W. Webster.(Ellis, Stephen)
June 17, 2019 Filing 53 DISCOVERY CERTIFICATE re: Estate's Third Supplemental Disclosures (bates-stamped ADM00787-792) by Stephen W. Webster.(Ellis, Stephen)
June 13, 2019 Filing 52 DISCOVERY CERTIFICATE - Notice of Deposition of Plaintiff Ally Bank by Stephen W. Webster.(Ellis, Stephen)
June 11, 2019 Filing 51 NOTICE OF DOCKET ENTRY CORRECTION re: #44 Reply to Response to #37 Amended Motion to Lift Stay filed by Stephen W. Webster. The Statement of Undisputed Material Facts has been replaced to correct the title of the pleading. The corrected document is now attached to #44 as well as this entry. (jlh)
June 11, 2019 Filing 50 DISCOVERY CERTIFICATE re: Second Supplemental Disclosures (ADM00780-ADM00786) by Stephen W. Webster. (Ellis, Stephen)
June 10, 2019 Filing 49 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge William K. Sessions III: Motion Hearing held on 6/10/2019 re #21 EMERGENCY MOTION for Hearing re #14 MOTION to Change Venue, #14 MOTION to Change Venue, #34 MOTION to Lift Stay and #37 AMENDED MOTION to Lift Stay. Elizabeth Flowers, Esq. (via phone) & Shannon Lamb, Esq. present for pltf; Stephen Ellis, Esq. present for dft Webster; Clint Hansen, Esq. (via phone) & Scott McGee, Esq. present for dft Best Friend Animal Society. Court makes inquiries. Statements by counsel. ORDERED: granting #21 EMERGENCY MOTION for Hearing re: #14 MOTION to Change Venue, granting #34 MOTION to Lift Stay and granting #37 AMENDED MOTION to Lift Stay; stay is lifted for the purpose of limited discovery re: #14 Motion to Change Venue; plft to review documents and make sure everything has been turned over to dfts re: #14 Motion to Change Venue including phone calls and depositions; Supplemental/Post Hearing Memorandum due by 7/10/2019; if case is resolved at ENE, ptys are to notify the Court. (Court Reporter: JoAnn Carson, Capitol Court Reporting, Inc.) (jam)
June 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER granting #46 Motion To Allow Pro Hac Vice Counsel to Participate By Telephone; granting #47 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Clint R. Hansen. Signed by Judge William K. Sessions III on 6/10/2019. (This is a text-only Order.) (eae)
June 7, 2019 Filing 47 MOTION for Appearance Pro Hac Vice of Clint Hansen filed by Best Friends Animal Society. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Proposed Order, #4 Certificate of Service)(jlh)
June 6, 2019 Filing 46 MOTION to Allow Pro Hac Vice Counsel to Participate By Telephone filed by Best Friends Animal Society. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(law)
June 6, 2019 Filing 45 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Micaela Tucker, Esq on behalf of Best Friends Animal Society. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(law)
June 6, 2019 Filing 44 REPLY to Response to #37 AMENDED MOTION to Lift Stay filed by Stephen W. Webster. (Attachments: #1 Appendix One, #2 Statement of Undisputed Material Facts, #3 Index of Exhibits, #4 Exhibit 1, #5 Exhibit 2, #6 Exhibit 3, #7 Exhibit 4, #8 Exhibit 5, #9 Exhibit 6, #10 Exhibit 7, #11 Exhibit 8, #12 Exhibit 9, #13 Exhibit 10, #14 Exhibit 11, #15 Exhibit 12, #16 Exhibit 13, #17 Exhibit 14, #18 Exhibit 15, #19 Exhibit 16, #20 Exhibit 17, #21 Exhibit 18, #22 Exhibit 19, #23 Exhibit 20, #24 Exhibit 21, #25 Exhibit 22, #26 Exhibit 23, #27 Exhibit 24, #28 Exhibit 25, #29 Exhibit 26, #30 Exhibit 27, #31 Exhibit 28, #32 Exhibit 29, #33 Exhibit 30, #34 Exhibit 31, #35 Exhibit 32, #36 Exhibit 33, #37 Exhibit 34, #38 Exhibit 35, #39 Exhibit 36, #40 Exhibit 37, #41 Exhibit 38, #42 Exhibit 39, #43 Exhibit 40, #44 Exhibit 41, #45 Exhibit 42, #46 Exhibit 43, #47 Exhibit 44, #48 Exhibit 45, #49 Exhibit 46, #50 Exhibit 47, #51 Certificate of Service)(Ellis, Stephen) (Attachment 2 replaced on 6/11/2019) (jlh).
May 30, 2019 Filing 43 RESPONSE in Opposition re #37 AMENDED MOTION to Lift Stay filed by Ally Bank. (Lamb, Shannon)
May 30, 2019 Filing 42 RESPONSE in Opposition re #37 AMENDED MOTION to Lift Stay filed by Best Friends Animal Society. (McGee, III, P.)
May 29, 2019 Filing 41 NOTICE of Hearing re: #37 AMENDED MOTION to Lift Stay, #21 EMERGENCY MOTION for Hearing re #14 MOTION to Change Venue, #34 MOTION to Lift Stay, #14 MOTION to Change Venue. Motion Hearing set for 6/10/2019 at 02:00 PM in Burlington Courtroom 110 before Judge William K. Sessions III.(jam)
May 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER granting #35 Motion for Admission of John C. Lynch Pro Hac Vice; granting #36 Motion for Admission of Elizabeth S. Flowers Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge William K. Sessions III on 5/28/2019. (This is a text-only Order.) (eae)
May 24, 2019 Filing 39 DISCOVERY CERTIFICATE - Supplemental Initial Disclosures by Ally Bank. (Lamb, Shannon)
May 21, 2019 Filing 38 DISCOVERY CERTIFICATE re: Estate's Supplemental Disclosures by Stephen W. Webster.(Ellis, Stephen)
May 16, 2019 Filing 37 AMENDED MOTION to Lift Stay filed by Stephen W. Webster. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Ellis, Stephen)
May 14, 2019 Filing 36 MOTION for Appearance Pro Hac Vice of Elizabeth S. Flowers filed by Ally Bank. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Elizabeth S. Flowers, #2 Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Proposed Order, #4 Certificate of Service)(law)
May 14, 2019 Filing 35 MOTION for Appearance Pro Hac Vice of John C. Lynch filed by Ally Bank. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of John C. Lynch, #2 Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Proposed Order, #4 Certificate of Service) (law).
May 14, 2019 Filing 34 MOTION to Lift Stay filed by Stephen W. Webster.(Ellis, Stephen)
May 13, 2019 Filing 33 DISCOVERY CERTIFICATE - Initial Disclosures by Ally Bank.(Lamb, Shannon)
May 13, 2019 Filing 32 DISCOVERY CERTIFICATE - Initial Disclosures by Best Friends Animal Society.(McGee, III, P.)
May 13, 2019 Filing 31 REPLY to Response to #21 EMERGENCY MOTION for Hearing re #14 MOTION to Change Venue , #17 EMERGENCY MOTION to Stay Proceedings and MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer and MOTION for Leave to File Surreply re: #14 Emergency Motion to Stay Proceedings, #14 MOTION to Change Venue filed by Best Friends Animal Society. (McGee, III, P.)
May 13, 2019 Filing 30 DISCOVERY CERTIFICATE - Initial Disclosures by Stephen W. Webster.(Ellis, Stephen)
May 10, 2019 Filing 29 REPLY to Response to #21 EMERGENCY MOTION for Hearing re #14 MOTION to Change Venue , #17 EMERGENCY MOTION to Stay Proceedings and MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer and MOTION for Leave to File Surreply re: #14 Emergency Motion to Stay Proceedings filed by Stephen W. Webster. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Ellis, Stephen)
May 10, 2019 Filing 28 RESPONSE in Opposition re #21 EMERGENCY MOTION for Hearing re #14 MOTION to Change Venue , #17 EMERGENCY MOTION to Stay Proceedings and MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer and MOTION for Leave to File Surreply re: #14 Emergency Motion to Stay Proceedings filed by Ally Bank. (Lamb, Shannon)
May 8, 2019 Filing 27 NOTICE OF DOCKET ENTRY CORRECTION re: #26 Reply to Response to Motion filed by Stephen W. Webster. The reply was combined with it's attachment into one document. They have been broken apart and are now separately attached to Document #26 and this entry. (Attachments: #1 Probate Court's ruling) (law)
May 7, 2019 Filing 26 REPLY to Response to #21 EMERGENCY MOTION for Hearing re #14 MOTION to Change Venue , #17 EMERGENCY MOTION to Stay Proceedings and MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer and MOTION for Leave to File Surreply re: #14 Emergency Motion to Stay Proceedings filed by Stephen W. Webster. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Ellis, Stephen) (Main Document 26 replaced on 5/8/2019) (law). (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/8/2019: #2 Probate Court's ruling) (law).
May 6, 2019 Filing 25 RESPONSE to #14 MOTION to Change Venue filed by Ally Bank. (Lamb, Shannon)
May 3, 2019 Filing 24 PROPOSED Stipulated Discovery Schedule/Order by Stephen W. Webster. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Ellis, Stephen)
May 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting #17 EMERGENCY MOTION to Stay Proceedings and MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer. Signed by Judge William K. Sessions III on 5/2/2019. (This is a text-only Order.) (eae)
May 2, 2019 Filing 22 RESPONSE in Opposition re #21 EMERGENCY MOTION for Hearing re #14 MOTION to Change Venue , #17 EMERGENCY MOTION to Stay Proceedings and MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer and MOTION for Leave to File Surreply re: #14 Emergency Motion to Stay Proceedings, #17 EMERGENCY MOTION to Stay Proceedings and MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Best Friends Animal Society. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(McGee, III, P.)
May 1, 2019 Filing 21 EMERGENCY MOTION for Hearing re #14 MOTION to Change Venue , #17 EMERGENCY MOTION to Stay Proceedings and MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer and, MOTION for Leave to File Surreply re: #14 EMERGENCY MOTION to Stay Proceedings filed by Stephen W. Webster. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Ellis, Stephen)
April 30, 2019 Filing 20 REPLY to Response to #17 EMERGENCY MOTION to Stay Proceedings and MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Ally Bank. (Lamb, Shannon)
April 29, 2019 Filing 19 RESPONSE in Opposition re #17 EMERGENCY MOTION to Stay Proceedings and MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Stephen W. Webster. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Ellis, Stephen)
April 29, 2019 Filing 18 RESPONSE in Opposition re #14 MOTION to Change Venue filed by Stephen W. Webster. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Ellis, Stephen)
April 26, 2019 Filing 17 EMERGENCY MOTION to Stay Proceedings and MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #13 Counterclaim filed by Ally Bank.(Kennelly, John). Added MOTION to Stay and link on 4/29/2019 (law).
April 26, 2019 Filing 16 LETTER SENT re: #15 Proposed Stipulated Discovery Schedule/Order non-compliance with Local Rule 26(a)(1); case may be placed on the master calendar unless a compliant stipulated schedule is filed. (law)
April 25, 2019 Filing 15 PROPOSED Stipulated Discovery Schedule/Order by Stephen W. Webster. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Ellis, Stephen)
April 22, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION to Change Venue filed by Best Friends Animal Society.(McGee, III, P.)
April 11, 2019 Filing 13 ANSWER to Complaint, COUNTERCLAIM against Ally Bank filed by Stephen W. Webster. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O, #16 Exhibit P, #17 Exhibit Q, #18 Certificate of Service)(Ellis, Stephen)
April 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #9 Stipulated and Joint Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #4 First Amended Complaint for Interpleader. Best Friends Animal Society answer due 4/22/2019. Signed by Judge William K. Sessions III on 4/10/2019. (law)
April 8, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE OF DOCKET ENTRY CORRECTION re: #9 STIPULATED AND JOINT MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #4 Amended Complaint filed by Best Friends Animal Society. The Proposed Order was not included at the time of filing. The proposed order is now attached to #9 as well as this entry. (jlh)
April 8, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by P. Scott McGee, III, Esq on behalf of Best Friends Animal Society.(McGee, III, P.)
April 8, 2019 Filing 9 STIPULATED AND JOINT MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #4 Amended Complaint filed by Best Friends Animal Society.(McGee, III, P.) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/8/2019: #1 Proposed Order) (jlh).
March 11, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE OF DOCKET ENTRY CORRECTION re: #7 Acceptance of Service and Waiver of Summons. The docket entry has been clarified to show Stephen W. Webster answer due 4/29/2019. (law)
March 11, 2019 Filing 7 ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE and Waiver of Summons: Stephen W. Webster served on 2/26/2019, answer due 4/29/2019.(Lamb, Shannon) Text/dates clarified on 3/11/2019 (law).
March 7, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Stephen D. Ellis, Esq on behalf of Stephen W. Webster.(Ellis, Stephen)
March 1, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF DOCKET ENTRY CORRECTION re: #4 Amended Complaint filed by Ally Bank. Exhibits 1 and 2 have been replaced on the docket as portions were illegible. The corrected documents are now attached to #4 as well as this entry. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 2) (jlh)
February 27, 2019 Filing 4 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR INTERPLEADER against Best Friends Animal Society, Stephen W. Webster filed by Ally Bank. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9)(jam) (Attachment 1 replaced on 3/1/2019) (jlh). (Attachment 2 replaced on 3/1/2019) (jlh).
February 15, 2019 Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed: Best Friends Animal Society waiver sent on 2/6/2019, answer due 4/8/2019.(Lamb, Shannon)
February 6, 2019 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Local Rule 7.1(a) by Ally Bank. (law)
February 6, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Interpleader against Best Friends Animal Society, Stephen W. Webster filed by Ally Bank. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(law)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Vermont District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ally Bank v. Webster et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Best Friends Animal Society
Represented By: P. Scott McGee, III, Esq.
Represented By: Micaela Tucker, Esq.
Represented By: Clint Hansen, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Best Friends Animal Sanctuary
Represented By: P. Scott McGee, III, Esq.
Represented By: Micaela Tucker, Esq.
Represented By: Clint Hansen, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephen W. Webster
Represented By: Stephen D. Ellis, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ally Bank
Represented By: Shannon E. Lamb, Esq.
Represented By: John J. Kennelly, Esq.
Represented By: Elizabeth S. Flowers, Esq.
Represented By: John C. Lynch, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?