Lambling v. Cervini

Plaintiff: Joanne Lambling
Defendant: Debra Cervini
Case Number: 2:2019cv00032
Filed: February 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Vermont
Presiding Judge: Christina Reiss
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 18, 2019 Filing 5 ENE LETTER re: selection past due. Responses due by 4/25/2019. (eh)
March 22, 2019 Filing 4 ENE LETTER re: Potential Evaluators sent; responses due by 4/8/2019. (eh)
March 21, 2019 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint by Debra Cervini.(MacIlwaine, Wm.)
March 21, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Wm. Andrew MacIlwaine, Esq on behalf of Debra Cervini.(MacIlwaine, Wm.)
February 27, 2019 ISSUED Summons as to Debra Cervini.(kac)
February 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Debra Cervini filed by Joanne Lambling. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (pac)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Vermont District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lambling v. Cervini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joanne Lambling
Represented By: Allan Sullivan, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Debra Cervini
Represented By: Wm. Andrew MacIlwaine, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?