Brownie v. Merritt Hospitality, LLC

Plaintiff: Everton Brownie
Defendant: Merritt Hospitality, LLC
Undetermined: ENE Evaluator
Case Number: 2:2019cv00036
Filed: February 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Vermont
Presiding Judge: William K Sessions
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 12, 2019 Filing 14 PROPOSED Stipulated Discovery Schedule/Order by Everton Brownie.(Ricci, Stefan)
April 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #9 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Eric J. Janson; granting #10 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Leslie V. Maffeo. Signed by Judge William K. Sessions III on 4/10/2019. (This is a text-only Order.) (eae)
April 10, 2019 Filing 12 STIPULATED DISCOVERY LETTER SENT re: #11 Proposed Stipulated Discovery Schedule/Order non-compliance with Local Rule 26(a)(1); case will be set for a scheduling conference unless stipulated schedule is filed. (law)
April 10, 2019 Filing 11 PROPOSED Stipulated Discovery Schedule/Order by Everton Brownie.(Ricci, Stefan)
April 8, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE OF DOCKET ENTRY CORRECTION re: #7 Evaluator Assigned. Document has been replaced to correct address of evaluator. The corrected document is now attached to #7 as well as this entry. (jlh)
April 5, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Appearance Pro Hac Vice of Leslie V. Maffeo filed by Merritt Hospitality, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Leslie V. Maffeo, #2 Exhibit A)(jlh)
April 5, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Appearance Pro Hac Vice of Eric J. Janson filed by Merritt Hospitality, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Eric J. Janson, #2 Exhibit A)(jlh)
March 26, 2019 Filing 7 ASSIGNED Early Neutral Evaluator: Stephen D. Ellis, Esq. (eh) (Main Document 7 replaced on 4/8/2019) (jlh).
March 22, 2019 Filing 6 EVALUATOR SELECTION Response by all parties. (Kennedy, J.) Text clarified on 3/25/2019 (hbc).
March 5, 2019 Filing 5 ENE LETTER re: Potential Evaluators sent; responses due by 3/22/2019. (eh)
March 5, 2019 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Local Rule 7.1(a) by Merritt Hospitality, LLC (Kennedy, J.)
March 5, 2019 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint by Merritt Hospitality, LLC.(Kennedy, J.)
February 27, 2019 Filing 2 LETTER to Vermont Superior Court, Civil Division, Bennington Unit re: #1 Notice of Removal. (law)
February 27, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Merritt Hospitality, LLC from Vermont Superior Court, Bennington Unit, Civil Division, case number 357-12-18. ( Filing fee $ 400) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(law)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Vermont District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brownie v. Merritt Hospitality, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Everton Brownie
Represented By: Stefan Ricci, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Merritt Hospitality, LLC
Represented By: J. Patrick Kennedy, Esq.
Represented By: Leslie V. Maffeo, Esq.
Represented By: Eric J. Janson, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: ENE Evaluator
Represented By: Stephen D. Ellis, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?