Efthimiatos v. United States of America
Petitioner: Angelo Peter Efthimiatos
Respondent: United States of America
Case Number: 2:2019cv00043
Filed: March 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Vermont
Presiding Judge: Christina Reiss
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 20, 2019 Filing 8 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from Eastern District of New York; Case Number 1:19-cv-00288.
March 20, 2019 Case transferred to the District of Vermont. Original file, copy of transfer order, and docket sheet sent. (Barrett, C)[Transferred from New York Eastern on 3/20/2019.]
March 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE to the federal district court of Vermont. Ordered by Judge Jack B. Weinstein on 3/11/2019. C/M by chambers. (Barrett, C) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 3/20/2019.]
March 11, 2019 Filing 6 REPLY in Support re #1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2241 filed by Angelo Efthimiatos. (Barrett, C) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 3/20/2019.]
February 25, 2019 Filing 5 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2241 filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E) (Kassner, Gillian)[Transferred from New York Eastern on 3/20/2019.]
February 11, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Gillian Allyn Kassner on behalf of United States of America (aty to be noticed) (Kassner, Gillian) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 3/20/2019.]
February 8, 2019 Filing 4 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Order to Show Cause dated 1/15/2019 (ECF No. #2 ) sent to Angelo Efthimiatos. Returned w/notation by USP/FPC Leavenworth: "Return to Sender," "Inmate Not At This Institution". Also returned marked: "Return to Sender," "Refused," "Unable to Forward." (Barrett, C) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 3/20/2019.]
January 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE and Electronic Service upon the US Attorneys Office re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Nancy Dellamonte, Angelo Efthimiatos - The court has Angelo Efthimiatos' petition for a writ of habeas corpus. Theclerk of court shall file and docket under a new index number without payment of fees.The United States Attorney shall respond within 40 days.Ordered by Judge Jack B. Weinstein on 1/15/2019. (Marziliano, August) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 3/20/2019.]
January 15, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2241 filed by Angelo Efthimiatos, Nancy Dellamonte. (Marziliano, August) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 3/20/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Vermont District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Efthimiatos v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Angelo Peter Efthimiatos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: United States of America
Represented By: Nicole P. Cate, AUSA
Represented By: Eugenia A. Cowles, AUSA
Represented By: Gillian A. Kassner, AUSA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?