West et al v. Gobeille et al
Plaintiff: Joseph Bruyette and Richard West
Defendant: Al Gobeille, Michael Touchette, Centurion of Vermont, LLC, Martha Maksym and Benjamin Watts
Case Number: 2:2019cv00081
Filed: May 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Vermont
Presiding Judge: William K Sessions
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER granting #29 Unopposed Motion to Extend Deadline for Submission of a Discovery Schedule. Signed by Judge William K. Sessions III on 7/18/2019. (This is a text-only Order.) (eae)
July 17, 2019 Filing 29 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Discovery Schedule filed by Joseph Bruyette, Richard West.(Costello, Kevin)
July 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER granting #27 Unopposed Motion to Stay Deadline for Submission of Discovery Schedule. Signed by Judge William K. Sessions III on 7/10/2019. (This is a text-only Order.) (eae)
July 9, 2019 Filing 27 UNOPPOSED MOTION to Stay Deadline for Submission of Discovery Schedule filed by Joseph Bruyette, Richard West.(Diaz, James)
June 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER granting #24 Motion for Admission of Michael J. Bentley Pro Hac Vice; granting #25 Motion for Admission of Molly M. Walker Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge William K. Sessions III on 6/27/2019. (This is a text-only Order.) (eae)
June 20, 2019 Filing 25 MOTION for Appearance Pro Hac Vice of Molly M. Walker filed by Centurion of Vermont, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Molly M. Walker, #2 Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Exhibit A)(jlh)
June 20, 2019 Filing 24 MOTION for Appearance Pro Hac Vice of Michael J. Bentley filed by Centurion of Vermont, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Michael J. Bentley, #2 Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Exhibit A)(jlh)
June 20, 2019 Filing 23 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re: Motion for Appearance Pro Hac Vice of Molly M. Walker by Centurion of Vermont, LLC.(Eaton, Pamela) Text clarified on 6/20/2019 (law).
June 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting #14 Motion for Extension of Time; #21 Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Judge William K. Sessions III on 6/17/2019. (This is a text-only Order.) (eae)
June 17, 2019 Filing 21 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint filed by Centurion of Vermont, LLC.(Eaton, Pamela)
June 17, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Pamela L.P. Eaton, Esq on behalf of Centurion of Vermont, LLC.(Eaton, Pamela)
June 17, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Stephen J. Soule, Esq on behalf of Centurion of Vermont, LLC.(Soule, Stephen)
June 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #17 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Kevin Costello. Signed by Judge William K. Sessions III on 6/17/2019. (This is a text-only Order.) (eae)
June 13, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION for Appearance Pro Hac Vice of Kevin Costello filed by Joseph Bruyette, Richard West. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Kevin Costello, #2 Certificate of Good Standing), #3 Certificates of Service) (law).
June 13, 2019 Filing 16 REPLY to Response to #14 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Al Gobeille, Martha Maksym, Michael Touchette, Benjamin Watts. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Bianchi, Jared)
June 11, 2019 Filing 15 RESPONSE in Opposition re #14 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Joseph Bruyette, Richard West. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Certificate of Service)(Valente, James)
June 10, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Al Gobeille, Martha Maksym, Michael Touchette, Benjamin Watts.(Bianchi, Jared)
June 4, 2019 Filing 13 SUMMONS RETURNED Executed. Centurion of Vermont, LLC served on 5/30/2019, answer due 6/20/2019. (Diaz, James)
May 31, 2019 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Joseph Bruyette, Richard West re #2 MOTION to Certify Class upon Centurion of Vermont, LLC.(Diaz, James)
May 31, 2019 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Joseph Bruyette, Richard West re #2 MOTION to Certify Class upon Office of the Vermont Attorney General.(Diaz, James)
May 31, 2019 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Joseph Bruyette, Richard West re: Declaration of James Diaz and attached exhibits to #1 Complaint upon Centurion of Vermont, LLC.(Diaz, James)
May 31, 2019 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Joseph Bruyette, Richard West re: Declaration of James Diaz and attached exhibits to #1 Complaint upon Office of the Vermont Attorney General.(Diaz, James)
May 31, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS RETURNED Executed. Benjamin Watts served on 5/28/2019, answer due 6/18/2019. (Diaz, James) Text clarified on 5/31/2019 (law).
May 31, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS RETURNED Executed. Michael Touchette served on 5/28/2019, answer due 6/18/2019. (Diaz, James) Text clarified on 5/31/2019 (law).
May 31, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS RETURNED Executed. Martha Maksym served on 5/28/2019, answer due 6/18/2019. (Diaz, James) Text clarified on 5/31/2019 (law).
May 31, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS RETURNED Executed. Al Gobeille served on 5/28/2019, answer due 6/18/2019. (Diaz, James) Text clarified on 5/31/2019 (law).
May 24, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Robert M. LaRose, Esq on behalf of Al Gobeille, Martha Maksym, Michael Touchette, Benjamin Watts.(LaRose, Robert)
May 24, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jared C. Bianchi, Esq on behalf of Al Gobeille, Martha Maksym, Michael Touchette, Benjamin Watts.(Bianchi, Jared)
May 21, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION to Certify Class filed by Joseph Bruyette, Richard West. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of James Valente, #2 Declaration of Richard West, #3 Declaration of Joseph Bruyette, #4 Declaration of Kevin Costello, #5 Declaration of James Diaz, #6 Declaration of Lia Ernst, #7 Declaration of Dr. Stacey Trooskin, MD, PhD, MPH, #8 Exhibit 1, #9 Exhibit 2, #10 Exhibit 3, #11 Exhibit 4, #12 Exhibit 5, #13 Exhibit 6, #14 Exhibit 7, #15 Exhibit 8, #16 Exhibit 9, #17 Exhibit 10)(law)
May 21, 2019 Filing 1 CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT against Centurion of Vermont, LLC, Al Gobeille, Martha Maksym, Michael Touchette, Benjamin Watts filed by Richard West, Joseph Bruyette.Summonses issued. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of James Diaz, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit 13, #15 Exhibit 14, #16 Exhibit 15, #17 Exhibit 16, #18 Exhibit 17, #19 Exhibit 18, #20 Exhibit 19, #21 Exhibit 20, #22 Exhibit 21, #23 Exhibit 22, #24 Exhibit 23, #25 Exhibit 24, #26 Exhibit 25, #27 Exhibit 26, #28 Civil Cover Sheet)(law)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Vermont District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: West et al v. Gobeille et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Al Gobeille
Represented By: Jared C. Bianchi, Esq.
Represented By: Robert M. LaRose, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Touchette
Represented By: Jared C. Bianchi, Esq.
Represented By: Robert M. LaRose, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Centurion of Vermont, LLC
Represented By: Michael J. Bentley, Esq.
Represented By: Stephen J. Soule, Esq.
Represented By: Molly M. Walker, Esq.
Represented By: Pamela L.P. Eaton, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Martha Maksym
Represented By: Jared C. Bianchi, Esq.
Represented By: Robert M. LaRose, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Benjamin Watts
Represented By: Jared C. Bianchi, Esq.
Represented By: Robert M. LaRose, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Bruyette
Represented By: James M. Diaz, Esq.
Represented By: Lia N. Ernst, Esq.
Represented By: James A. Valente, Esq.
Represented By: Kevin Costello, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard West
Represented By: James M. Diaz, Esq.
Represented By: Lia N. Ernst, Esq.
Represented By: James A. Valente, Esq.
Represented By: Kevin Costello, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?