Montpelier v. Green Mountain Care et al
Plaintiff: Princess C. Montpelier
Defendant: Green Mountain Care and Cory Gustafson
Case Number: 2:2019cv00084
Filed: May 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Vermont
Presiding Judge: William K Sessions
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 9, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Kate T. Gallagher on behalf of Green Mountain Care, Cory Gustafson.(Gallagher, Kate)
June 27, 2019 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed: Green Mountain Care waiver sent on 5/29/2019, answer due 7/29/2019.(jam)
June 27, 2019 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed: Cory Gustafson (official capacity) waiver sent on 5/29/2019, answer due 7/29/2019..(jam)
June 27, 2019 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed: Cory Gustafson (individual capacity) waiver sent on 5/29/2019, answer due 7/29/2019.(jam)
May 30, 2019 Filing 4 ERRATA re: Attachment 1 Affidavit of Princess C. Montpelier as to #1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis. (jam)
May 29, 2019 ISSUED Waivers as to Green Mountain Care, Cory Gustafson.(law)
May 28, 2019 Filing 3 COMPLAINT against Green Mountain Care filed by Princess C. Montpelier. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Certificate of Service)(jam)
May 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER granting #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Judge William K. Sessions III on 5/28/2019. (jam)
May 24, 2019 Filing 1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis filed by Princess C. Montpelier. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Princess C. Montpelier, #2 Notice of Pro Se Appearance, #3 Proposed Complaint (document is sealed), #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(law)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Vermont District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Montpelier v. Green Mountain Care et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Green Mountain Care
Represented By: Kate T. Gallagher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cory Gustafson
Represented By: Kate T. Gallagher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Princess C. Montpelier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?