Wang et al v. Jianming et al
Plaintiff: Wei Wang, Xiaofeng Feng and Guangyi Xiong
Defendant: Shen Jianming, ShenLaw LLC and Jianming Shen
Case Number: 2:2019cv00086
Filed: May 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Vermont
Office: Burlington Office
Presiding Judge: Christina Reiss
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: Motion to Quash
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 26, 2019 Filing 16 RESPONSE in Opposition re #15 THIRD PARTY MOTION to Continue August 1, 2019 Hearing on Motion to Quash filed by Xiaofeng Feng, Wei Wang, Guangyi Xiong. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Barr, Russell)
July 19, 2019 Filing 15 THIRD PARTY MOTION to Continue August 1, 2019 Hearing on Motion to Quash filed by Nicholas M. Hulme.(Lilienthal, Phillipa)
June 12, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Phillipa G. Lilienthal, Esq on behalf of Nicholas M. Hulme.(Lilienthal, Phillipa)
June 12, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Hearing re: #1 MOTION to Quash Subpoena for Deposition and MOTION for Protective Order, and, in the alternative MOTION to Transfer Case, #3 SECOND MOTION to Quash Subpoena for Deposition Duces Tecum and for Protective Order, Motion to Stay, and, in alternative, Motion to Transfer Subpoena-Related Motion, #2 MOTION to stay deposition duces tecum. Motion Hearing set for 8/1/2019 at 01:00 PM in Burlington Courtroom 542 before Judge Christina Reiss.(jbr)
May 29, 2019 Filing 12 CASE TRANSFERRED in from Middle District of Florida; Case Number 2:19-cv-00274.
May 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER adopting #10 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #4 Response in Opposition to Motion filed by Xiaofeng Feng, Guangyi Xiong, Wei Wang, #9 MOTION to transfer case filed by Xiaofeng Feng, Guangyi Xiong, Wei Wang, #5 Supplement filed by Nicholas M. Hulme, #3 Se. The R&R (Doc. #10 ) is ACCEPTED and ADOPTED and incorporated into this Order. Hulme's Motions to Quash, Motions for Protective Order, and Motions to Transfer (Docs. 1; 3) are GRANTED in part. As discussed in the R&R, these Motions are granted solely on the request to transfer. The Clerk is DIRECTED to TRANSFER these motions to the United States District Court for the District of Vermont. These matters are to be transferred to the pending case, Wang v. Jianming, Case No. 2:17-cv-00153-cr, for consideration of Hulme's Motions to Quash, Motions for Protective Order, and Motions to Transfer (Docs. 1; 3), along with the Motion to Stay (Doc. #2 ). Upon transfer, the Clerk is DIRECTED to terminate all deadlines, transfer any pending motions, and close the Fort Myers file. Signed by Judge Sheri Polster Chappell on 5/28/2019. (LMF) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 5/29/2019.]
May 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION recommending that #1 non-party Nicholas M. Hulme's Motion to Quash Subpoena for Deposition and for Protective Order, and, in the Alternative, Motion to Transfer; #2 Motion to Stay Deposition Duces Tecum; and #3 Composite Motion to Quash Subpoena for Deposition Duces Tecum and for Protective Order, Motion to Stay, and, in the Alternative, Motion to Transfer Subpoena-related Motion be transferred to the United States District Court for the District of Vermont pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 45(f). Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas N. Frazier on 5/10/2019. (CAS) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 5/29/2019.]
April 29, 2019 ***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid by attorney Russell D Barr, appearing on behalf of Xiaofeng Feng, Wei Wang, Guangyi Xiong (Filing fee $150 receipt number FtM013687.). (MLS) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 5/29/2019.]
April 25, 2019 Filing 9 MEMORANDUM in opposition re #3 Motion to Quash and Joint MOTION to transfer subpoena related Motion filed by Xiaofeng Feng, Wei Wang, Guangyi Xiong. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Index, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8)(Barr, Russell) Modified on 4/26/2019 as to event type/docket text (MLS). [Transferred from Florida Middle on 5/29/2019.]
April 25, 2019 Filing 8 MISCELLANEOUS CASE 2:19-mc-5-FtM-29UAM transferred to civil docket. All further proceedings are to be docketed in civil case number 2:19-cv-274-FtM-38UAM. (MLS) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 5/29/2019.]
April 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 the Motion for Special Admission to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas N. Frazier on 4/25/2019. (HAP) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 5/29/2019.]
April 24, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Russell D. Barr to appear pro hac vice by Xiaofeng Feng, Wei Wang, Guangyi Xiong. (Barr, Russell) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Unassigned Magistrate. [Transferred from Florida Middle on 5/29/2019.]
April 19, 2019 Filing 5 SUPPLEMENT re #3 SECOND MOTION to Quash Subpoena for Deposition Duces Tecum and MOTION for Protective Order, MOTION to Stay, and, in alternative, MOTION to Transfer Subpoena-Related Motion by Nicholas M. Hulme. (Attachments: #1 Composite Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8)(Kerem, David) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 5/29/2019.]
April 12, 2019 Filing 4 RESPONSE in Opposition re #1 MOTION to Quash Subpoena for Deposition and MOTION for Protective Order and, in the alternative, MOTION to Transfer Case filed by Xiaofeng Feng, Wei Wang, Guangyi Xiong. (Attachments: #1 Composite Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Barr, Russell) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 5/29/2019.]
April 11, 2019 Filing 3 SECOND MOTION to Quash Subpoena for Deposition Duces Tecum and for Protective Order, Motion to Stay, and, in alternative, Motion to Transfer Subpoena-Related Motion by Nicholas M. Hulme. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 and Composite Exhibit 2)(Kerem, David) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 5/29/2019.]
March 28, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION to stay deposition duces tecum by Nicholas M. Hulme. (Kerem, David) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 5/29/2019.]
March 21, 2019 FEES paid by Nicholas M. Hulme (Filing fee $47.00 receipt number FTM013559) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 5/29/2019.]
March 21, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION to Quash Subpoena for Deposition and MOTION for Protective Order, and, in alternative, MOTION to Transfer Subpoena-Related Motion with Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Nicholas M. Hulme. (WRW) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Unassigned Magistrate. [Transferred from Florida Middle on 5/29/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Vermont District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wang et al v. Jianming et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shen Jianming
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ShenLaw LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jianming Shen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wei Wang
Represented By: Russell D. Barr, Esq.
Represented By: Chandler W. Matson, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Xiaofeng Feng
Represented By: Russell D. Barr, Esq.
Represented By: Chandler W. Matson, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Guangyi Xiong
Represented By: Russell D. Barr, Esq.
Represented By: Chandler W. Matson, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?