Carroll v. Schwan's Home Service, Inc.
Plaintiff: Dennis Carroll
Defendant: Schwan's Home Service, Inc.
Not Yet Classified: ENE Evaluator
Case Number: 2:2019cv00092
Filed: June 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Vermont
Presiding Judge: Christina Reiss
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 1, 2019 Filing 13 DISCOVERY CERTIFICATE - Initial Disclosures Pursuant to FRCP 26(a)(1) by Schwan's Home Service, Inc..(Werle, Mark)
August 1, 2019 Filing 12 DISCOVERY CERTIFICATE re: VSP video and audio from crash scene by Dennis Carroll.(Anderson, Matthew)
July 30, 2019 Filing 11 DISCOVERY CERTIFICATE - Notice of Deposition of Dennis Carroll by Schwan's Home Service, Inc..(Werle, Mark)
July 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 STIPULATED DISCOVERY SCHEDULE/ORDER Discovery due by 3/3/2020. Motions due by 3/3/2020. Early Neutral Evaluation set for 11/1/2019 at 09:00 AM. Ready for Trial by 4/2/2020. Signed by Judge Christina Reiss on 7/29/2019. (jbr)
July 29, 2019 Filing 9 ASSIGNED Early Neutral Evaluator: Michael J. Marks, Esq. (eh)
July 26, 2019 Filing 8 PROPOSED Stipulated Discovery Schedule/Order by Schwan's Home Service, Inc..(Werle, Mark)
July 19, 2019 Filing 7 DISCOVERY CERTIFICATE - Request to Produce to Plaintiff by Schwan's Home Service, Inc..(Werle, Mark)
July 19, 2019 Filing 6 DISCOVERY CERTIFICATE - Request for Admissions to Plaintiff by Schwan's Home Service, Inc..(Werle, Mark)
July 15, 2019 Filing 5 DISCOVERY CERTIFICATE - Initial Disclosures 5 Expert Disclosures, Requests to Admit, Interrogatories and Requests to Produce, Production Bates numbered 1 - 744 by Dennis Carroll.(Anderson, Matthew)
July 15, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS RETURNED Executed. Schwan's Home Service, Inc. served on 6/11/2019, answer due 7/2/2019.(Anderson, Matthew)
July 9, 2019 Filing 3 ENE LETTER re: Potential Evaluators sent; responses due by 7/26/2019. (eh)
July 3, 2019 Filing 2 ANSWER to Complaint by Schwan's Home Service, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Werle, Mark)
June 4, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT With Jury Demand against Schwan's Home Service, Inc. filed by Dennis Carroll. Summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Main Document (unredacted/sealed), #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (pac)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Vermont District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Carroll v. Schwan's Home Service, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dennis Carroll
Represented By: Matthew D. Anderson, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Schwan's Home Service, Inc.
Represented By: Mark F. Werle, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: ENE Evaluator
Represented By: Michael J. Marks, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?