Martell et al v. City of St. Albans, Vermont et al

Plaintiff: Lynn Cook and Dwight Martell
Defendant: Dominic Cloud, Matt Mulheron, Charles Sargent, City of St. Albans, Vermont and City of St. Albans, VT
Case Number: 2:2019cv00093
Filed: June 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Vermont
Presiding Judge: John M Conroy
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 31, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 31, 2019 Filing 14 CONSENT to Direct Assignment by City of St. Albans, VT, Dominic Cloud, Matt Mulheron, Charles Sargent. (McNeil, Colin) Filers added on 8/1/2019 (law).
July 26, 2019 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Lynn Cook, Dwight Martell re #12 Consent to Direct Assignment.(Paritz, Sandra)
July 26, 2019 Filing 12 CONSENT to Direct Assignment by Lynn Cook, Dwight Martell (Paritz, Sandra)
July 18, 2019 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Lynn Cook, Dwight Martell.(Paritz, Sandra)
July 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: On or before 7/29/2019, Plaintiffs shall return executed their Magistrate Judge Assignment Form. Signed by Judge John M. Conroy on 7/12/2019. (eh)
July 11, 2019 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE for #6 , #7 , #8 Waivers of Service Returned Executed by Lynn Cook, Dwight Martell. (Paritz, Sandra) Links added on 7/12/2019 (hbc).
July 11, 2019 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed: Matt Mulheron waiver sent on 7/2/2019, answer due 9/3/2019. (Paritz, Sandra) Date waiver sent corrected on 7/12/2019 (hbc).
July 11, 2019 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed: Dominic Cloud waiver sent on 7/2/2019, answer due 9/3/2019. (Paritz, Sandra) Date waiver sent corrected on 7/12/2019 (hbc).
July 11, 2019 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed: Charles Sargent waiver sent on 7/2/2019, answer due 9/3/2019. (Paritz, Sandra) Date waiver sent corrected on 7/12/2019 (hbc).
June 28, 2019 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed: City of St. Albans, VT waiver sent on 6/4/2019, answer due 8/5/2019. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Paritz, Sandra)
June 11, 2019 Filing 4 COMPLAINT against Dominic Cloud, Matt Mulheron, Charles Sargent, City of St. Albans, VT filed by Dwight Martell, Lynn Cook. LR 73 Forms issued. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2) (eh)
June 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis as to Dwight Martell; granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis as to Lynn Cook. Signed by Judge John M. Conroy on 6/11/2019. (This is a text-only Order.) (eh)
June 4, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis filed by Lynn Cook. (eh)
June 4, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis filed by Dwight Martell. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Complaint (Sealed), #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (eh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Vermont District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Martell et al v. City of St. Albans, Vermont et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dominic Cloud
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matt Mulheron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles Sargent
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of St. Albans, Vermont
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of St. Albans, VT
Represented By: Colin K. McNeil, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lynn Cook
Represented By: Sandra L. Paritz, Esq.
Represented By: Rebecca E. Smith, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dwight Martell
Represented By: Sandra L. Paritz, Esq.
Represented By: Rebecca E. Smith, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?