Nichols v. C.R. Bard, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: John Nichols
Defendant: C.R. Bard, Inc. and Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2019cv00097
Filed: June 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Vermont
Presiding Judge: Christina Reiss
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 26, 2019 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed: Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc. waiver sent on 6/18/2019, answer due 8/19/2019. (Pollock, David) Text clarified on 7/26/2019 (law).
July 23, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF DOCKET ENTRY CORRECTION re: #2 Waiver of Service Returned Executed filed by John Nichols. Document 2 was replaced as multiple returns were combined into one document. Each return should be docketed as its own entry rather than one entry for multiple returns. The single return is now attached to #2 and the entry has been clarified to read C.R. Bard Inc. waiver sent on 6/18/2019, answer due 8/19/2019. (law)
July 23, 2019 Filing 2 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed: C.R. Bard Inc. waiver sent on 6/18/2019, answer due 8/19/2019. .(Pollock, David) (Main Document 2 replaced and text clarified on 7/23/2019) (law).
June 7, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and Demand for Jury Trial against Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc., C.R. Bard, Inc. filed by John Nichols. Summonses issued. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (pac)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Vermont District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nichols v. C.R. Bard, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Nichols
Represented By: David J. Pollock, Esq.
Represented By: Rosemarie R. Bogdan, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C.R. Bard, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?