Knutsen et al v. United States of America
Plaintiff: The Estate of Rowan Knutsen, Corey Knutsen and Meghan Ferguson
Defendant: United States of America
Case Number: 2:2019cv00107
Filed: June 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Vermont
Presiding Judge: John M Conroy
Referring Judge: William K Sessions
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1346
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 18, 2019 Filing 6 OBJECTION to Direct Assignment by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(law)
July 10, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF DOCKET ENTRY CORRECTION re: #4 Affidavit of Service filed by Corey Knutsen, The Estate of Rowan Knutsen, Meghan Ferguson. The main document was uploaded with its attachments as a singular pdf. The document has been broken apart and reattached to the entry. The corrected documents are now attached to #4 as well as this entry. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2) (jlh)
July 8, 2019 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT of Service filed by Corey Knutsen, The Estate of Rowan Knutsen, Meghan Ferguson. United States of America served on 6/27/2019, answer due 8/26/2019. (Perkins, Paul) (Main Document 4 replaced on 7/10/2019) (jlh). (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/10/2019: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2) (jlh).
June 28, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Case Reassignment pursuant to Local Rule 73(d). Case reassigned to Judge William K. Sessions III. Judge John M. Conroy no longer assigned to the case. (law)
June 25, 2019 Filing 2 OBJECTION to Direct Assignment by Meghan Ferguson, Corey Knutsen, The Estate of Rowan Knutsen (Perkins, Paul)
June 21, 2019 ISSUED Summons as to U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General.(law)
June 21, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against United States of America filed by Corey Knutsen, The Estate of Rowan Knutsen, Meghan Ferguson. LR 73 Forms issued. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Merit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(law)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Vermont District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Knutsen et al v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Estate of Rowan Knutsen
Represented By: Michael F. Hanley, Esq.
Represented By: Paul J. Perkins, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Corey Knutsen
Represented By: Michael F. Hanley, Esq.
Represented By: Paul J. Perkins, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Meghan Ferguson
Represented By: Michael F. Hanley, Esq.
Represented By: Paul J. Perkins, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Represented By: Jason M. Turner, AUSA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?