McLaughlin v. Langrock Sperry & Wool, LLP

Plaintiff: Jay R. McLaughlin
Defendant: Langrock Sperry & Wool, LLP
Case Number: 2:2019cv00112
Filed: June 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Vermont
Presiding Judge: Christina Reiss
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 22, 2019 Filing 12 ANSWER to #10 Counterclaim by Jay R. McLaughlin.(Weimer, Gregory)
August 15, 2019 Filing 11 ENE LETTER re: Potential Evaluators sent; responses due by 9/3/2019. (eh)
August 13, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint, COUNTERCLAIM against Jay R. McLaughlin filed by Langrock Sperry & Wool, LLP. by Langrock Sperry & Wool, LLP. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Cooley, James)
July 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER GRANTING #8 Stipulated Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer. Signed by Judge Christina Reiss on 7/15/2019. (This is a text-only Order.) (ejh)
July 12, 2019 Filing 8 STIPULATED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint filed by Langrock Sperry & Wool, LLP.(Cooley, James)
July 12, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Christopher D. Ekman, Esq on behalf of Langrock Sperry & Wool, LLP.(Ekman, Christopher)
July 12, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by James M. Cooley on behalf of Langrock Sperry & Wool, LLP.(Cooley, James)
July 12, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS RETURNED Executed. Langrock Sperry & Wool, LLP served on 7/2/2019, answer due 7/23/2019.(Weimer, Gregory)
July 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER GRANTING #3 Motion of Lee H. Bals, Esq. for Admission Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Christina Reiss on 7/11/2019. (This is a text-only Order.) (ejh)
July 3, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Appearance Pro Hac Vice of Lee H. Bals filed by Jay R. McLaughlin. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Lee H. Bals, #2 Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Proposed Order)(jlh)
June 28, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Gregory A. Weimer, Esq. on behalf of Jay R. McLaughlin. (pac)
June 28, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Langrock Sperry & Wool, LLP filed by Jay R. McLaughlin. Summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Civil Cover Sheet) (pac)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Vermont District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McLaughlin v. Langrock Sperry & Wool, LLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jay R. McLaughlin
Represented By: Gregory A. Weimer, Esq.
Represented By: Lee H. Bals, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Langrock Sperry & Wool, LLP
Represented By: Christopher D. Ekman, Esq.
Represented By: James M. Cooley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?