Causey v. Walsh et al
Plaintiff: Jennifer L. Causey
Defendant: Sean C. Walsh, Eric G. Mart, Does 1 through 50, Inclusive, Nanci A. Smith, Franklin County and Does 1 through 50
Case Number: 2:2019cv00118
Filed: July 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Vermont
Presiding Judge: Christina Reiss
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 4, 2019 Filing 16 RESPONSE in Opposition re #12 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Jennifer L. Causey. (Causey, Jennifer)
August 30, 2019 Filing 15 RESPONSE in Opposition re: #11 MOTION to Dismiss and MOTION For More Definite Statement filed by Jennifer L. Causey. (Causey, Jennifer) Text clarified on 9/3/2019 (jlh).
August 29, 2019 Filing 14 JOINDER re: #12 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and SUPPLEMENTAL DOCUMENT re: #11 MOTION to Dismiss and MOTION For More Definite Statement by Nanci A. Smith . (Gagnon, William) Text clarified on 8/29/2019 (jlh).
August 21, 2019 Filing 13 ANSWER to Complaint and REQUEST to be Removed as Defendant by Franklin County. (pac) Motion relief added on 8/23/2019 (jlh).
August 19, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Eric G. Mart. (Attachments: #1 Attachment, #2 Certificate of Service)(Shahi, Kaveh)
August 16, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION to Dismiss and MOTION For More Definite Statement filed by Nanci A. Smith.(Gagnon, William). Added MOTION for More Definite Statement on 9/3/2019 (jlh).
August 16, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by William L. Gagnon, Esq on behalf of Nanci A. Smith.(Gagnon, William)
August 7, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE OF DOCKET ENTRY CORRECTION re: #6 Summons Returned Executed filed by Jennifer L. Causey. The document has been replaced as Page 1 was omitted. The complete document is now attached to #6 and this entry. (law)
August 6, 2019 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT of Service filed by Jennifer L. Causey. Franklin County served on 7/29/2019, answer due 8/19/2019(Causey, Jennifer)
August 6, 2019 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT of Service filed by Jennifer L. Causey. Nanci A. Smith served on 7/29/2019, answer due 8/19/2019(Causey, Jennifer)
August 6, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED filed by Jennifer L. Causey. Eric G. Mart served on 7/30/2019, answer due 8/20/2019. (Causey, Jennifer) Text clarified on 8/7/2019 (law). (Main Document 6 replaced on 8/7/2019) (law).
August 6, 2019 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service filed by Jennifer L. Causey. Sean C. Walsh served on 7/26/2019, answer due 8/16/2019(Causey, Jennifer)
July 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER GRANTING #3 Motion to Amend #1 Complaint. Signed by Judge Christina Reiss on 7/23/2019. (This is a text-only Order.) (ejh)
July 22, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION to Amend #1 Complaint filed by Jennifer L. Causey.(Causey, Jennifer)
July 12, 2019 ISSUED Summons as to Franklin County, Eric G. Mart, Nanci A. Smith, Sean C. Walsh.(kac)
July 11, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF PRO SE APPEARANCE by Jennifer L. Causey. (pac)
July 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT For Damages against Does 1 through 50, Inclusive, Franklin County, Eric G. Mart, Nanci A. Smith, Sean C. Walsh filed by Jennifer L. Causey. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (pac)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Vermont District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Causey v. Walsh et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sean C. Walsh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric G. Mart
Represented By: Kaveh S. Shahi, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 50, Inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nanci A. Smith
Represented By: William L. Gagnon, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Franklin County
Represented By: James A. Hughes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 50
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer L. Causey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?