UCB, Inc. et al v. Mylan Technologies, Inc.
Plaintiff: UCB Pharma GmbH, UCB, Inc. and LTS Lohmann Therapie-Systeme AG
Defendant: Mylan Technologies, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2019cv00128
Filed: July 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Vermont
Presiding Judge: John M Conroy
Referring Judge: Christina Reiss
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER GRANTING #27 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Deepro R. Murkerjee, Esq. Signed by Judge Christina Reiss on 9/13/2019. (This is a text-only Order.) (ejh)
September 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER GRANTING #26 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Lance A. Soderstrom, Esq. Signed by Judge Christina Reiss on 9/13/2019. (This is a text-only Order.) (ejh)
September 12, 2019 Filing 27 MOTION for Appearance Pro Hac Vice of Deepro R. Murkerjee filed by Mylan Technologies, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(law)
September 12, 2019 Filing 26 MOTION for Appearance Pro Hac Vice of Lance A. Soderstrom filed by Mylan Technologies, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(law)
September 12, 2019 Filing 25 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re: #27 MOTION for Appearance Pro Hac Vice of Deepro R. Murkerjee by Mylan Technologies, Inc..(Perkins, Paul) Link added on 9/12/2019 (jlh).
September 12, 2019 Filing 24 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re: #26 MOTION for Appearance Pro Hac Vice of Lance A. Soderstrom by Mylan Technologies, Inc..(Perkins, Paul) Link added on 9/12/2019 (jlh).
September 9, 2019 Filing 23 ENE LETTER re: Potential Evaluators sent; responses due by 9/26/2019. (eh)
September 3, 2019 Filing 22 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Local Rule 7.1(a) by Mylan Technologies, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Perkins, Paul)
September 3, 2019 Filing 21 ANSWER to #16 Amended Complaint, COUNTERCLAIM against UCB Pharma GmbH, UCB, Inc. filed by Mylan Technologies, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Perkins, Paul)
August 12, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE of Case Reassignment pursuant to Local Rule 73(d). Case reassigned to Judge Christina Reiss. Judge John M. Conroy no longer assigned to the case. (law)
August 12, 2019 Filing 19 OBJECTION to Direct Assignment by Mylan Technologies, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Perkins, Paul)
August 12, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Paul J. Perkins, Esq on behalf of Mylan Technologies, Inc..(Perkins, Paul)
August 12, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Michael F. Hanley, Esq on behalf of Mylan Technologies, Inc..(Hanley, Michael)
August 12, 2019 ISSUED Summons as to Mylan Technologies, Inc.. (eh)
August 12, 2019 Filing 16 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Mylan Technologies, Inc. filed by UCB, Inc., UCB Pharma GmbH, LTS Lohmann Therapie-Systeme AG. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service) (eh)
July 30, 2019 Filing 15 SUMMONS RETURNED Executed. Mylan Technologies, Inc. served on 7/23/2019, answer due 8/13/2019. (Berger, Ritchie) Text clarified on 8/1/2019 (law).
July 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #11 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Silvia M. Medina; granting #12 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Kevin X. McGann; granting #13 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of James S. Trainor, Jr. Signed by Judge John M. Conroy on 7/30/2019. (This is a text-only Order.) (eh)
July 29, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION for Appearance Pro Hac Vice of James S. Trainor, Jr. filed by LTS Lohmann Therapie-Systeme AG, UCB Pharma GmbH, UCB, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of James S. Trainor, Jr., #2 Certificate of Good Standing)(law)
July 29, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION for Appearance Pro Hac Vice of Kevin X. McGann filed by LTS Lohmann Therapie-Systeme AG, UCB Pharma GmbH, UCB, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Kevin X. McGann, #2 Certificate of Good Standing)(law)
July 29, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for Appearance Pro Hac Vice of Silvia M. Medina filed by LTS Lohmann Therapie-Systeme AG, UCB Pharma GmbH, UCB, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Silvia M. Medina, #2 Certificate of Good Standing)(law)
July 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Peter C. Richardson; granting #9 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Traci Medford-Rosow. Signed by Judge John M. Conroy on 7/29/2019. (This is a text-only Order.) (eh)
July 26, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Appearance Pro Hac Vice of Traci Medford-Rosow, Esq. filed by LTS Lohmann Therapie-Systeme AG, UCB Pharma GmbH, UCB, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Traci Medford-Rosow, #2 Certificate of Good Standing)(law)
July 26, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Appearance Pro Hac Vice of Peter C. Richardson, Esq. filed by LTS Lohmann Therapie-Systeme AG, UCB Pharma GmbH, UCB, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Peter C. Richardson, #2 Certificate of Good Standing)(law)
July 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #4 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Derek J. Fahnestock; granting #5 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Jack B. Blumenfeld, Esq.; granting #6 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Anthony D. Raucci, Esq. Signed by Judge John M. Conroy on 7/26/2019. (This is a text-only Order.) (eh)
July 23, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Appearance Pro Hac Vice of Anthony D. Raucci, Esq. filed by LTS Lohmann Therapie-Systeme AG, UCB Pharma GmbH, UCB, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Anthony D. Raucci, #2 Certificate of Good Standing)(law)
July 23, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Appearance Pro Hac Vice of Jack B. Blumenfeld, Esq. filed by LTS Lohmann Therapie-Systeme AG, UCB Pharma GmbH, UCB, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Jack B. Blumenfeld, #2 Certificate of Good Standing)(law)
July 23, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Appearance Pro Hac Vice of Derek J. Fahnestock, Esq. filed by LTS Lohmann Therapie-Systeme AG, UCB Pharma GmbH, UCB, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Derek J. Fahnestock, #2 Certificate of Good Standing)(law)
July 19, 2019 Filing 3 MAILED Form AO 120 to U.S. Patent and Trademark Office (Document image is sealed). (eh)
July 16, 2019 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Local Rule 7.1(a) by LTS Lohmann Therapie-Systeme AG, UCB Pharma GmbH, UCB, Inc. (eh)
July 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Mylan Technologies, Inc. filed by UCB, Inc., UCB Pharma GmbH, LTS Lohmann Therapie-Systeme AG. Summons issued. LR 73 Forms issued. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (eh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Vermont District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: UCB, Inc. et al v. Mylan Technologies, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UCB Pharma GmbH
Represented By: Ritchie E. Berger, Esq.
Represented By: Kendall A. Hoechst, Esq.
Represented By: James S. Trainor, Jr., Esq.
Represented By: Silvia M. Medina, Esq.
Represented By: Anthony D. Raucci, Esq.
Represented By: Kevin X. McGann, Esq.
Represented By: Derek J. Fahnestock, Esq.
Represented By: Traci J. Medford-Rosow, Esq.
Represented By: Peter C. Richardson, Esq.
Represented By: Jack B. Blumenfeld, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UCB, Inc.
Represented By: Ritchie E. Berger, Esq.
Represented By: Kendall A. Hoechst, Esq.
Represented By: James S. Trainor, Jr., Esq.
Represented By: Silvia M. Medina, Esq.
Represented By: Anthony D. Raucci, Esq.
Represented By: Kevin X. McGann, Esq.
Represented By: Derek J. Fahnestock, Esq.
Represented By: Traci J. Medford-Rosow, Esq.
Represented By: Peter C. Richardson, Esq.
Represented By: Jack B. Blumenfeld, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LTS Lohmann Therapie-Systeme AG
Represented By: Ritchie E. Berger, Esq.
Represented By: Kendall A. Hoechst, Esq.
Represented By: James S. Trainor, Jr., Esq.
Represented By: Silvia M. Medina, Esq.
Represented By: Anthony D. Raucci, Esq.
Represented By: Kevin X. McGann, Esq.
Represented By: Derek J. Fahnestock, Esq.
Represented By: Traci J. Medford-Rosow, Esq.
Represented By: Peter C. Richardson, Esq.
Represented By: Jack B. Blumenfeld, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mylan Technologies, Inc.
Represented By: Lance A. Soderstrom, Esq.
Represented By: Deepro R. Mukerjee, Esq.
Represented By: Michael F. Hanley, Esq.
Represented By: Paul J. Perkins, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?