Nationwide Agribusiness Insurance Company et al v. Church & Dwight Co., Inc.
Plaintiff: Nationwide Agribusiness Insurance Company and Pheonix Feeds & Nutrition, Inc.
Defendant: Church & Dwight Co., Inc.
Not Yet Classified: ENE Evaluator
Case Number: 2:2019cv00135
Filed: August 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Vermont
Presiding Judge: William K Sessions
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1446
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #18 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice Tanya Y. Shah; granting #19 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Diane Fleming Averell. Signed by Judge William K. Sessions III on 9/12/2019. (This is a text-only Order.) (eae)
September 12, 2019 Filing 19 MOTION for Appearance Pro Hac Vice of Diane Fleming Averell filed by Church & Dwight Co., Inc. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Diane Fleming Averell, #2 Certificate of Good Standing)(law)
September 12, 2019 Filing 18 MOTION for Appearance Pro Hac Vice of Tanya Y. Shah filed by Church & Dwight Co., Inc. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Tanya Y. Shah, #2 Certificate of Good Standing)(law)
September 6, 2019 Filing 17 ASSIGNED Early Neutral Evaluator: Michael J. Marks, Esq. (eh)
September 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 STIPULATED DISCOVERY SCHEDULE/ORDER Discovery due by 4/17/2020. Motions due by 6/5/2020. Early Neutral Evaluation set for 2/3/2020 at 09:00 AM. Ready for Trial by 9/14/2020. Signed by Judge William K. Sessions III on 9/5/2019. (jam)
September 5, 2019 Filing 15 PROPOSED Stipulated Discovery Schedule/Order by Church & Dwight Co., Inc..(Borick, Matthew)
September 5, 2019 Filing 14 STIPULATION AS TO ENE by all parties.(Borick, Matthew)
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #10 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. ; granting #12 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Teirney Christenson. Signed by Judge William K. Sessions III on 8/20/2019. (This is a text-only Order.) (eae)
August 19, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION for Appearance Pro Hac Vice of Teirney Christenson filed by Nationwide Agribusiness Insurance Company, Pheonix Feeds & Nutrition, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Certificate of Service)(law)
August 19, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by James C. Foley, Jr., Esq on behalf of Nationwide Agribusiness Insurance Company, Pheonix Feeds & Nutrition, Inc. (law)
August 19, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney filed by Nationwide Agribusiness Insurance Company, Pheonix Feeds & Nutrition, Inc.(law)
August 12, 2019 Filing 9 ENE LETTER re: Potential Evaluators sent; responses due by 8/29/2019. (eh)
August 9, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint by Church & Dwight Co., Inc..(Borick, Matthew)
August 9, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Filing #1 Notice of Removal by Church & Dwight Co., Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(originally filed 8/5/2019 in state court)(jam)
August 9, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS RETURNED Executed. Church & Dwight Co., Inc. served on 7/15/2019, answer due 8/5/2019. (originally filed 7/18/2019 in state court)(jam)
August 9, 2019 Filing 5 COMPLAINT against Church & Dwight Co., Inc. filed by Nationwide Agribusiness Insurance Company, Pheonix Feeds & Nutrition, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons) (originally filed 6/27/2019 in state court).(jam)
August 9, 2019 Filing 4 RECEIVED FILE and certified copy of docket sheet from State Court. (jam)
August 2, 2019 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Local Rule 7.1(a) by Church & Dwight Co., Inc. (law)
August 2, 2019 Filing 2 LETTER to Vermont Superior Court, Civil Division, Addison Unit requesting original case file and certified docket sheet. (law)
August 2, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Church & Dwight Co., Inc. from Vermont Superior Court, Addison Unit, Civil Division, case number 134-6-19 Ancv. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(law)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Vermont District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nationwide Agribusiness Insurance Company et al v. Church & Dwight Co., Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Church & Dwight Co., Inc.
Represented By: Matthew S. Borick, Esq.
Represented By: Walter E. Judge, Jr., Esq.
Represented By: Diane F. Averell, Esq.
Represented By: Tanya Y. Shah, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nationwide Agribusiness Insurance Company
Represented By: John M. Mazzuchi, Esq.
Represented By: Teirney Christenson, Esq.
Represented By: James C. Foley, Jr., Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pheonix Feeds & Nutrition, Inc.
Represented By: John M. Mazzuchi, Esq.
Represented By: Teirney Christenson, Esq.
Represented By: James C. Foley, Jr., Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: ENE Evaluator
Represented By: Michael J. Marks, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?