Cicak v. The Standard Insurance Co. Inc.
Plaintiff: Serifa Cicak
Defendant: The Standard Insurance Co. Inc.
Case Number: 2:2019cv00138
Filed: August 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Vermont
Presiding Judge: John M Conroy
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1001
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 10, 2019 Filing 6 DISCOVERY CERTIFICATE - Initial Disclosures by The Standard Insurance Co. Inc..(Borick, Matthew)
October 9, 2019 Filing 5 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Local Rule 7.1(a) by The Standard Insurance Co. Inc. (Borick, Matthew)
October 9, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint by The Standard Insurance Co. Inc..(Borick, Matthew)
September 18, 2019 Filing 3 CONSENT to Direct Assignment by Serifa Cicak (Jarvis, Craig)
September 18, 2019 Filing 2 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed: The Standard Insurance Co. Inc. waiver sent on 8/19/2019, answer due 10/18/2019.(Jarvis, Craig)
August 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against The Standard Insurance Co. Inc. filed by Serifa Cicak. Summons issued. LR 73 Forms issued. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (eh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Vermont District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cicak v. The Standard Insurance Co. Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Serifa Cicak
Represented By: Craig A. Jarvis, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Standard Insurance Co. Inc.
Represented By: Matthew S. Borick, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?