Ford v. Quorum Health Resources, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Timothy Ford
Defendant: Joshua Dufresne, Quorum Health Resources, LLC, Michael Halstead, Richard Dexter, III, George Lamb, William Holmes, John Bond, Stephen Lyon, Eric Bibens, II, Robert Flint, Scott Towle and Wayne Scholz
Case Number: 2:2019cv00142
Filed: August 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Vermont
Presiding Judge: John M Conroy
Referring Judge: Christina Reiss
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 11, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Martha Van Oot, Esq on behalf of Eric Bibens, II, John Bond, Richard Dexter, III, Joshua Dufresne, Robert Flint, George Lamb, Stephen Lyon.(Van Oot, Martha)
October 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER GRANTING #15 Assented-to Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant Quorum Health Resources, LLC's Answer is due by 11/18/2019. Signed by Judge Christina Reiss on 10/10/2019. (This is a text-only Order.) (ejh)
October 9, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE OF DOCKET ENTRY CORRECTION re: #14 Summons Returned Executed The docket entry has been clarified to indicate Stephen Lyon was served on 10/1/2019, answer due 10/22/2019. (law)
October 8, 2019 Filing 15 ASSENTED-TO MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint filed by Michael Halstead, William Holmes, Quorum Health Resources, LLC, Wayne Scholz, Scott Towle. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Joslin, Peter)
October 8, 2019 Filing 14 SUMMONS RETURNED Executed. Stephen Lyon served on 10/1/2019, answer due 10/22/2019.(Ellis, Stephen) Party served clarified on 10/9/2019 (law).
October 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER GRANTING #12 Assented-to Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint. The Answer or responsive pleading shall be due 11/18/2019. Signed by Judge Christina Reiss on 10/4/2019. (This is a text-only Order.) (ejh)
October 3, 2019 Filing 12 ASSENTED-TO MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint filed by Eric Bibens, II, John Bond, Richard Dexter, III, Joshua Dufresne, Robert Flint, George Lamb, Stephen Lyon.(Van Oot, Martha) Text clarified on 10/3/2019 (law).
October 2, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Case Reassignment pursuant to Local Rule 73(d). Case reassigned to Judge Christina Reiss. Judge John M. Conroy no longer assigned to the case. (law)
October 1, 2019 Filing 10 OBJECTION to Direct Assignment by Timothy Ford (Ellis, Stephen)
September 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: Plaintiff's Magistrate Judge Assignment form due by 10/4/2019. Signed by Judge John M. Conroy on 9/20/2019. (hbc)
September 13, 2019 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed: John Bond waiver sent on 8/15/2019, answer due 10/15/2019.(Ellis, Stephen)
September 13, 2019 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed: Eric Bibens, II waiver sent on 8/15/2019, answer due 10/15/2019.(Ellis, Stephen)
September 13, 2019 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed: Robert Flint waiver sent on 8/15/2019, answer due 10/15/2019.(Ellis, Stephen)
September 13, 2019 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed: Richard Dexter, III waiver sent on 8/15/2019, answer due 10/15/2019.(Ellis, Stephen)
September 13, 2019 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed: Joshua Dufresne waiver sent on 8/15/2019, answer due 10/15/2019.(Ellis, Stephen)
September 13, 2019 Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed: George Lamb waiver sent on 8/15/2019, answer due 10/15/2019.(Ellis, Stephen)
September 13, 2019 Filing 2 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed: Michael Halstead waiver sent on 8/15/2019, answer due 10/15/2019; William Holmes waiver sent on 8/15/2019, answer due 10/15/2019; Quorum Health Resources, LLC waiver sent on 8/15/2019, answer due 10/15/2019; Wayne Scholz waiver sent on 8/15/2019, answer due 10/15/2019; Scott Towle waiver sent on 8/15/2019, answer due 10/15/2019.(Ellis, Stephen)
August 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Quorum Health Resources, LLC, Scott Towle, William Holmes, Michael Halstead, Wayne Scholz, George Lamb, Richard Dexter, III, Stephen Lyon, Eric Bibens, II, Joshua Dufresne, Robert Flint, and John Bond filed by Timothy Ford. LR 73 Forms issued. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (eh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Vermont District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ford v. Quorum Health Resources, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joshua Dufresne
Represented By: Martha Van Oot, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Quorum Health Resources, LLC
Represented By: Peter B. Joslin, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Halstead
Represented By: Peter B. Joslin, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Dexter, III
Represented By: Martha Van Oot, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: George Lamb
Represented By: Martha Van Oot, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Holmes
Represented By: Peter B. Joslin, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Bond
Represented By: Martha Van Oot, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephen Lyon
Represented By: Martha Van Oot, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric Bibens, II
Represented By: Martha Van Oot, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Flint
Represented By: Martha Van Oot, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Towle
Represented By: Peter B. Joslin, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wayne Scholz
Represented By: Peter B. Joslin, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timothy Ford
Represented By: Stephen D. Ellis, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?