UCB, Inc. et al v. Mylan Technologies, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: UCB, Inc., LTS Lohmann Therapie-Systeme AG, UCB Pharma GmbH and UCB Manufacturing Ireland Limited
Defendant: Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Mylan Technologies, Inc. and Mylan, Inc.
Counter Claimant: Mylan Technologies Inc.
Case Number: 2:2019cv00148
Filed: August 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Vermont
Presiding Judge: William K Sessions
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 26, 2019 Filing 93 CASE TRANSFERRED in from District of Delaware; Case Number 1:17-cv-00322.
August 26, 2019 Case electronically transferred to District of Vermont. (ntl) [Transferred from Delaware on 8/26/2019.]
August 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 92 SO ORDERED, re #91 Stipulation and Order Regarding Transfer of Case to the District of Vermont -- Party Mylan, Inc. and Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc. terminated. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 8/26/19. (ntl) [Transferred from Delaware on 8/26/2019.]
August 21, 2019 Filing 91 STIPULATION regarding Transfer to District of Vermont by LTS Lohmann Therapie-Systeme AG, UCB Manufacturing Ireland Limited, UCB Pharma GmbH, UCB, Inc.. (Fahnestock, Derek) [Transferred from Delaware on 8/26/2019.]
August 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 90 ORAL ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that if the parties still intend to submit a stipulation and proposed order to transfer this case (see D.I. 88, 89), they shall do so no later than August 21, 2019, or submit a joint status report either showing cause why they need additional time or advising the Court as to whether the motion to transfer (D.I. 82) remains ripe for decision. ORDERED by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 8/15/19. (ntl) [Transferred from Delaware on 8/26/2019.]
July 19, 2019 Filing 89 Letter to the Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Stamatios Stamoulis regarding Venue Transfer - re #88 Letter. (Stamoulis, Stamatios) [Transferred from Delaware on 8/26/2019.]
July 17, 2019 Filing 88 Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Jack B. Blumenfeld regarding Requests to Transfer Action - re #79 MOTION to Dismiss for Improper Venue , #82 MOTION to Transfer Case to District of Vermont. (Blumenfeld, Jack) [Transferred from Delaware on 8/26/2019.]
February 25, 2019 Filing 87 REDACTED VERSION of #86 Reply Brief by LTS Lohmann Therapie-Systeme AG, UCB Manufacturing Ireland Limited, UCB Pharma GmbH, UCB, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit I)(Raucci, Anthony) [Transferred from Delaware on 8/26/2019.]
February 14, 2019 Filing 86 [SEALED] REPLY BRIEF re #82 MOTION to Transfer Case to District of Vermont filed by LTS Lohmann Therapie-Systeme AG, UCB Manufacturing Ireland Limited, UCB Pharma GmbH, UCB, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit I)(Raucci, Anthony) [Transferred from Delaware on 8/26/2019.]
February 6, 2019 Filing 85 [SEALED] REPLY BRIEF re #79 MOTION to Dismiss for Improper Venue filed by Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Mylan Technologies, Inc., Mylan, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Stamoulis, Stamatios) [Transferred from Delaware on 8/26/2019.]
February 1, 2019 Filing 84 REDACTED VERSION of #83 Brief (Combined Opening and Answering), by LTS Lohmann Therapie-Systeme AG, UCB Manufacturing Ireland Limited, UCB Pharma GmbH, UCB, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-H)(Raucci, Anthony) [Transferred from Delaware on 8/26/2019.]
January 29, 2019 Filing 83 [SEALED] BRIEF (Combined Opening and Answering) re #82 MOTION to Transfer Case to District of Vermont, #79 MOTION to Dismiss for Improper Venue filed by LTS Lohmann Therapie-Systeme AG, UCB Manufacturing Ireland Limited, UCB Pharma GmbH, UCB, Inc..Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 2/12/2019. Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 2/5/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-H)(Raucci, Anthony) [Transferred from Delaware on 8/26/2019.]
January 29, 2019 Filing 82 MOTION to Transfer Case to District of Vermont - filed by LTS Lohmann Therapie-Systeme AG, UCB Manufacturing Ireland Limited, UCB Pharma GmbH, UCB, Inc.. (Raucci, Anthony) [Transferred from Delaware on 8/26/2019.]
January 24, 2019 Filing 81 NOTICE of Change of Address by Stamatios Stamoulis (Stamoulis, Stamatios) [Transferred from Delaware on 8/26/2019.]
January 15, 2019 Filing 80 [SEALED] OPENING BRIEF in Support re #79 MOTION to Dismiss for Improper Venue filed by Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Mylan Technologies, Inc., Mylan, Inc..Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 1/29/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Stamoulis, Stamatios) [Transferred from Delaware on 8/26/2019.]
January 15, 2019 Filing 79 MOTION to Dismiss for Improper Venue - filed by Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Mylan Technologies, Inc., Mylan, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Stamoulis, Stamatios) [Transferred from Delaware on 8/26/2019.]
December 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORAL ORDER: Having reviewed the parties' status report (D.I. 77), IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the following schedule and page limitations shall apply to the forthcoming motion(s) to dismiss/transfer, should the parties file such motions: (i) Defendants' opening brief, not to exceed fifteen (15) pages, due on January 15; (ii) Plaintiffs' combined answering/opening brief, not to exceed fifteen (15) pages, due on January 29; (iii) Defendants' reply/response brief, not to exceed seven (7) pages, due on February 6; and (iv) Plaintiffs' reply brief, not to exceed seven (7) pages, due on February 14. Ordered by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 12/28/2018. (etg) [Transferred from Delaware on 8/26/2019.]
December 20, 2018 Filing 77 Joint STATUS REPORT by Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Stamoulis, Stamatios) [Transferred from Delaware on 8/26/2019.]
December 13, 2018 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #76 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Submit Status Report to December 20, 2018 filed by UCB Manufacturing Ireland Limited, LTS Lohmann Therapie-Systeme AG, UCB, Inc., UCB Pharma GmbH. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 12/13/18. (ntl) [Transferred from Delaware on 8/26/2019.]
December 12, 2018 Filing 76 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Submit Status Report to December 20, 2018 - filed by LTS Lohmann Therapie-Systeme AG, UCB Manufacturing Ireland Limited, UCB Pharma GmbH, UCB, Inc.. (Fahnestock, Derek) [Transferred from Delaware on 8/26/2019.]
December 11, 2018 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #74 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for the parties to submit a status report regarding venue to December 5, 2018 filed by UCB Manufacturing Ireland Limited, LTS Lohmann Therapie-Systeme AG, UCB, Inc., UCB Pharma GmbH, #75 Joint STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Submit Status Report to December 13, 2018 filed by UCB Manufacturing Ireland Limited, LTS Lohmann Therapie-Systeme AG, UCB, Inc., UCB Pharma GmbH. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 12/10/18. (ntl) [Transferred from Delaware on 8/26/2019.]
December 6, 2018 Filing 75 Joint STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Submit Status Report to December 13, 2018 - filed by LTS Lohmann Therapie-Systeme AG, UCB Manufacturing Ireland Limited, UCB Pharma GmbH, UCB, Inc.. (Raucci, Anthony) [Transferred from Delaware on 8/26/2019.]
November 30, 2018 Filing 74 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for the parties to submit a status report regarding venue to December 5, 2018 - filed by LTS Lohmann Therapie-Systeme AG, UCB Manufacturing Ireland Limited, UCB Pharma GmbH, UCB, Inc.. (Fahnestock, Derek) [Transferred from Delaware on 8/26/2019.]
November 26, 2018 Pro Hac Vice Attorney James S. Trainor, Jr for LTS Lohmann Therapie-Systeme AG, UCB Inc., UCB Manufacturing Ireland Limited, and UCB Pharma GmbH added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. Associated Cases: 1:17-cv-00322-LPS, 1:16-cv-01023-LPS(ceg) [Transferred from Delaware on 8/26/2019.]
November 16, 2018 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #73 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for the parties to submit a status report regarding the venue to November 30, 2018 filed by Mylan Technologies, Inc., Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Mylan, Inc. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 11/16/18. (ntl) [Transferred from Delaware on 8/26/2019.]
November 14, 2018 Filing 73 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for the parties to submit a status report regarding the venue to November 30, 2018 - filed by Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Mylan Technologies, Inc., Mylan, Inc.. (Stamoulis, Stamatios) [Transferred from Delaware on 8/26/2019.]
October 11, 2018 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Jitendra Malik,Alissa M. Pacchioli for Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Mylan Technologies, Inc., Mylan, Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (crb) [Transferred from Delaware on 8/26/2019.]
September 28, 2018 Filing 72 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Eleanor G. Tennyson by LTS Lohmann Therapie-Systeme AG, UCB Manufacturing Ireland Limited, UCB Pharma GmbH, UCB, Inc. (Tennyson, Eleanor) [Transferred from Delaware on 8/26/2019.]
September 25, 2018 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #71 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Alissa Piccoli and Jitendra Malik filed by Mylan Technologies, Inc., Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Mylan, Inc. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 9/25/18. (ntl) [Transferred from Delaware on 8/26/2019.]
September 21, 2018 Filing 71 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Alissa Piccoli and Jitendra Malik - filed by Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Mylan Technologies, Inc., Mylan, Inc.. (Stamoulis, Stamatios) [Transferred from Delaware on 8/26/2019.]
July 19, 2018 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #70 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Silvia Medina filed by UCB Manufacturing Ireland Limited, LTS Lohmann Therapie-Systeme AG, UCB, Inc., UCB Pharma GmbH. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 7/19/18. (ntl) [Transferred from Delaware on 8/26/2019.]
July 18, 2018 Filing 70 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Silvia Medina - filed by LTS Lohmann Therapie-Systeme AG, UCB Manufacturing Ireland Limited, UCB Pharma GmbH, UCB, Inc.. (Tennyson, Eleanor) [Transferred from Delaware on 8/26/2019.]
July 18, 2018 Filing 69 NOTICE of Change of Firm Affiliation by LTS Lohmann Therapie-Systeme AG, UCB Manufacturing Ireland Limited, UCB Pharma GmbH, UCB, Inc. (Tennyson, Eleanor) [Transferred from Delaware on 8/26/2019.]
June 20, 2018 Filing 68 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Initial Invalidity Contentions filed by Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Mylan Technologies, Inc., Mylan, Inc..(Stamoulis, Stamatios) [Transferred from Delaware on 8/26/2019.]
June 1, 2018 Filing 67 NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Plaintiffs' Responses and Objections to Mylan Technologies, Inc., Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc., and Mylan, Inc.'s First Set of Interrogatories to Plaintiffs (Nos. 1-11); and (2) Plaintiffs' Responses and Objections to Defendants Mylan Technologies, Inc., Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc., and Mylan, Inc.'s First Set of Requests for Production (Nos. 1-53), filed by UCB Manufacturing Ireland Limited, UCB Pharma GmbH, UCB, Inc..(Tennyson, Eleanor) [Transferred from Delaware on 8/26/2019.]
May 30, 2018 Filing 66 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs' Initial Infringement Contentions filed by LTS Lohmann Therapie-Systeme AG, UCB Manufacturing Ireland Limited, UCB Pharma GmbH, UCB, Inc..(Tennyson, Eleanor) [Transferred from Delaware on 8/26/2019.]
May 23, 2018 Filing 65 NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Defendant Mylan Technologies, Inc., Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc., and Mylan, Inc,s Initial Disclosures Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1) and (2) Defendant Mylan Technologies, Inc., Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc., and Mylan, Inc.s Initial Disclosures Pursuant to Paragraph 3 of the Default Standard for Discovery filed by Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Mylan Technologies, Inc., Mylan, Inc..(Stamoulis, Stamatios) [Transferred from Delaware on 8/26/2019.]
May 23, 2018 Filing 64 NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Plaintiffs' Initial Disclosures Pursuant to Rule 26(a)(1), (2) Identification of Asserted Patents and Accused Products and (3) Plaintiffs' Paragraph 3 Initial Disclosures filed by LTS Lohmann Therapie-Systeme AG, UCB Manufacturing Ireland Limited, UCB Pharma GmbH, UCB, Inc..(Fahnestock, Derek) [Transferred from Delaware on 8/26/2019.]
May 18, 2018 Filing 63 NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Defendant Mylan Technologies, Inc., Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc., and Mylan, Inc,s Responses and Objections to Plaintiffs First Set of Interrogatories to Defendants (Nos. 1-10) and (2) Defendant Mylan Technologies, Inc., Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc., and Mylan, Inc.s Responses and Objections to Plaintiffs First Set of Requests for Production (Nos. 1-36) filed by Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Mylan Technologies, Inc., Mylan, Inc..(Stamoulis, Stamatios) [Transferred from Delaware on 8/26/2019.]
May 1, 2018 Filing 62 NOTICE of Change of Firm by Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Mylan Technologies, Inc., Mylan, Inc. (Stamoulis, Stamatios) [Transferred from Delaware on 8/26/2019.]
April 26, 2018 Filing 61 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendants' First Set of Requests for Production (Nos. 1-53) and Defendants' First Set of Interrogatories to Plaintiffs (Nos. 1-10) filed by Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Mylan Technologies, Inc., Mylan, Inc..(Stamoulis, Stamatios) [Transferred from Delaware on 8/26/2019.]
April 16, 2018 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #60 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Peter C. Richardson and Traci Medford-Rosow filed by UCB Manufacturing Ireland Limited, LTS Lohmann Therapie-Systeme AG, UCB, Inc., UCB Pharma GmbH. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 4/16/18. (ntl) [Transferred from Delaware on 8/26/2019.]
April 12, 2018 Filing 60 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Peter C. Richardson and Traci Medford-Rosow - filed by LTS Lohmann Therapie-Systeme AG, UCB Manufacturing Ireland Limited, UCB Pharma GmbH, UCB, Inc.. (Fahnestock, Derek) [Transferred from Delaware on 8/26/2019.]
April 11, 2018 Filing 59 NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Plaintiffs' First Set of Interrogatories to Defendants (Nos. 1-10) and (2) Plaintiffs' First Set of Requests for Production (Nos. 1-36) filed by LTS Lohmann Therapie-Systeme AG, UCB Manufacturing Ireland Limited, UCB Pharma GmbH, UCB, Inc..(Fahnestock, Derek) [Transferred from Delaware on 8/26/2019.]
April 5, 2018 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #58 Stipulation Regarding Venue Discovery filed by Mylan Technologies, Inc., Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Mylan, Inc. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 4/5/18. (ntl) [Transferred from Delaware on 8/26/2019.]
April 2, 2018 Filing 58 STIPULATION Regarding Venue Discovery by Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Mylan Technologies, Inc., Mylan, Inc.. (Stamoulis, Stamatios) [Transferred from Delaware on 8/26/2019.]
March 28, 2018 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #57 Joint STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME concerning venue related discovery to various dates (see stipulation) filed by UCB Manufacturing Ireland Limited, LTS Lohmann Therapie-Systeme AG, UCB, Inc., UCB Pharma GmbH. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 3/28/18. (ntl) [Transferred from Delaware on 8/26/2019.]
March 26, 2018 Filing 57 Joint STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME concerning venue related discovery to various dates (see stipulation) - filed by LTS Lohmann Therapie-Systeme AG, UCB Manufacturing Ireland Limited, UCB Pharma GmbH, UCB, Inc.. (Fahnestock, Derek) [Transferred from Delaware on 8/26/2019.]
March 19, 2018 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #56 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME concerning venue related discovery to dates as outlined in stipulation filed by UCB Manufacturing Ireland Limited, LTS Lohmann Therapie-Systeme AG, UCB, Inc., UCB Pharma GmbH. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 3/19/18. (ntl) [Transferred from Delaware on 8/26/2019.]
March 15, 2018 Filing 56 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME concerning venue related discovery to dates as outlined in stipulation - filed by LTS Lohmann Therapie-Systeme AG, UCB Manufacturing Ireland Limited, UCB Pharma GmbH, UCB, Inc.. (Fahnestock, Derek) [Transferred from Delaware on 8/26/2019.]
March 9, 2018 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #55 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME certain discovery deadlines to various dates filed by Mylan Technologies, Inc., Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Mylan, Inc., #54 Joint STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to change deadlines concerning venue related discovery to (see stipulation) filed by UCB Manufacturing Ireland Limited, LTS Lohmann Therapie-Systeme AG, UCB, Inc., UCB Pharma GmbH. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 3/9/18. (ntl) [Transferred from Delaware on 8/26/2019.]
March 8, 2018 Filing 55 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME certain discovery deadlines to various dates - filed by Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Mylan Technologies, Inc., Mylan, Inc.. (Stamoulis, Stamatios) [Transferred from Delaware on 8/26/2019.]
March 5, 2018 Filing 54 Joint STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to change deadlines concerning venue related discovery to (see stipulation) - filed by LTS Lohmann Therapie-Systeme AG, UCB Manufacturing Ireland Limited, UCB Pharma GmbH, UCB, Inc.. (Fahnestock, Derek) [Transferred from Delaware on 8/26/2019.]
March 2, 2018 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #53 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Venue Related Discovery to (see Table in Stipulation for Dates) filed by UCB Manufacturing Ireland Limited, LTS Lohmann Therapie-Systeme AG, UCB, Inc., UCB Pharma GmbH. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 3/2/18. (ntl) [Transferred from Delaware on 8/26/2019.]
February 26, 2018 Filing 53 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Venue Related Discovery to (see Table in Stipulation for Dates) - filed by LTS Lohmann Therapie-Systeme AG, UCB Manufacturing Ireland Limited, UCB Pharma GmbH, UCB, Inc.. (Fahnestock, Derek) [Transferred from Delaware on 8/26/2019.]
February 20, 2018 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #52 Amended STIPULATION TO EXTEND Various Discovery Deadlines filed by Mylan Technologies, Inc., Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Mylan, Inc. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 2/20/18. (ntl) [Transferred from Delaware on 8/26/2019.]
February 14, 2018 Filing 52 Amended STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME Various Discovery Deadlines to February 20, 2018 - filed by Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Mylan Technologies, Inc., Mylan, Inc.. (Stamoulis, Stamatios) [Transferred from Delaware on 8/26/2019.]
February 13, 2018 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #51 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME Various Discovery Deadlines to February 19, 2018 filed by Mylan Technologies, Inc., Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Mylan, Inc. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 2/12/18. (ntl) [Transferred from Delaware on 8/26/2019.]
February 9, 2018 Filing 51 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME Various Discovery Deadlines to February 19, 2018 - filed by Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Mylan Technologies, Inc., Mylan, Inc.. (Stamoulis, Stamatios) [Transferred from Delaware on 8/26/2019.]
January 22, 2018 Filing 50 [SEALED] NOTICE to Take Deposition of Mylan Technologies, Inc., Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc. and Mylan, Inc. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 30(b)(6) on April 5, 2018 filed by LTS Lohmann Therapie-Systeme AG, UCB Manufacturing Ireland Limited, UCB Pharma GmbH, UCB, Inc..(Fahnestock, Derek) [Transferred from Delaware on 8/26/2019.]
January 22, 2018 Filing 49 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Keith Meckstroth on April 10, 2018 filed by LTS Lohmann Therapie-Systeme AG, UCB Manufacturing Ireland Limited, UCB Pharma GmbH, UCB, Inc..(Fahnestock, Derek) [Transferred from Delaware on 8/26/2019.]
January 22, 2018 Filing 48 NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Plaintiffs' First Set of Venue-Related Requests for Production (Nos. 1-23); and (2) Plaintiffs' First Set of Venue-Related Interrogatories to Defendants (Nos. 1-8) filed by LTS Lohmann Therapie-Systeme AG, UCB Manufacturing Ireland Limited, UCB Pharma GmbH, UCB, Inc..(Fahnestock, Derek) [Transferred from Delaware on 8/26/2019.]
January 22, 2018 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #47 Stipulated Protective Order. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 1/22/18. (ntl) [Transferred from Delaware on 8/26/2019.]
January 22, 2018 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #45 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Submit Proposed Protective Order to January 17, 2018 filed by UCB Manufacturing Ireland Limited, LTS Lohmann Therapie-Systeme AG, UCB, Inc., UCB Pharma GmbH; #46 Joint STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to submit a proposed form of a protective order to January 18, 2018 filed by UCB Manufacturing Ireland Limited, LTS Lohmann Therapie-Systeme AG, UCB, Inc., UCB Pharma GmbH. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 1/22/18. (ntl) [Transferred from Delaware on 8/26/2019.]
January 18, 2018 Filing 47 PROPOSED ORDER -- Stipulated Protective Order -- by LTS Lohmann Therapie-Systeme AG, UCB Manufacturing Ireland Limited, UCB Pharma GmbH, UCB, Inc.. (Fahnestock, Derek) [Transferred from Delaware on 8/26/2019.]
January 17, 2018 Filing 46 Joint STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to submit a proposed form of a protective order to January 18, 2018 - filed by LTS Lohmann Therapie-Systeme AG, UCB Manufacturing Ireland Limited, UCB Pharma GmbH, UCB, Inc.. (Fahnestock, Derek) [Transferred from Delaware on 8/26/2019.]
January 16, 2018 Filing 45 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Submit Proposed Protective Order to January 17, 2018 - filed by LTS Lohmann Therapie-Systeme AG, UCB Manufacturing Ireland Limited, UCB Pharma GmbH, UCB, Inc.. (Fahnestock, Derek) [Transferred from Delaware on 8/26/2019.]
January 12, 2018 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #44 Joint STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to submit a proposed form of a protective order to January 16, 2018 filed by UCB Manufacturing Ireland Limited, LTS Lohmann Therapie-Systeme AG, UCB, Inc., UCB Pharma GmbH. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 1/12/18. (ntl) [Transferred from Delaware on 8/26/2019.]
January 12, 2018 Filing 44 Joint STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to submit a proposed form of a protective order to January 16, 2018 - filed by LTS Lohmann Therapie-Systeme AG, UCB Manufacturing Ireland Limited, UCB Pharma GmbH, UCB, Inc.. (Fahnestock, Derek) [Transferred from Delaware on 8/26/2019.]
January 10, 2018 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #43 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for the parties to submit a proposed protective order and for Defendants to serve supplemental declarations address venue-related topics to January 12, 2018 and January 16, 2018, respectively filed by UCB Manufacturing Ireland Limited, LTS Lohmann Therapie-Systeme AG, UCB, Inc., UCB Pharma GmbH. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 1/9/18. (ntl) [Transferred from Delaware on 8/26/2019.]
January 8, 2018 Filing 43 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for the parties to submit a proposed protective order and for Defendants to serve supplemental declarations address venue-related topics to January 12, 2018 and January 16, 2018, respectively - filed by LTS Lohmann Therapie-Systeme AG, UCB Manufacturing Ireland Limited, UCB Pharma GmbH, UCB, Inc.. (Fahnestock, Derek) [Transferred from Delaware on 8/26/2019.]
December 11, 2017 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED re #42 Joint Status Report re scope and timing of discovery. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 12/11/17. (ntl) [Transferred from Delaware on 8/26/2019.]
December 8, 2017 Filing 42 Joint STATUS REPORT by LTS Lohmann Therapie-Systeme AG, UCB Manufacturing Ireland Limited, UCB Pharma GmbH, UCB, Inc.. (Fahnestock, Derek) [Transferred from Delaware on 8/26/2019.]
December 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 41 MEMORANDUM ORDER re #13 MOTION to Dismiss for Improper Venue filed by Mylan Technologies, Inc., Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Mylan, Inc., and #22 MOTION to Transfer Case to District of Vermont filed by UCB Manufacturing Ireland Limited, LTS Lohmann Therapie-Systeme AG, UCB, Inc., UCB Pharma GmbH are DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE to renew after a period of venue-related discovery. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 12/1/17. (ntl) [Transferred from Delaware on 8/26/2019.]
September 27, 2017 Filing 40 REDACTED VERSION of #38 Letter by LTS Lohmann Therapie-Systeme AG, UCB Manufacturing Ireland Limited, UCB Pharma GmbH, UCB, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Fahnestock, Derek) [Transferred from Delaware on 8/26/2019.]
September 27, 2017 Filing 39 REDACTED VERSION of #36 Letter by LTS Lohmann Therapie-Systeme AG, UCB Manufacturing Ireland Limited, UCB Pharma GmbH, UCB, Inc.. (Fahnestock, Derek) [Transferred from Delaware on 8/26/2019.]
September 22, 2017 Filing 38 [SEALED] Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Jack B. Blumenfeld regarding response to Mylan's September 20, 2017 letter regarding venue motion - re #35 Letter. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Blumenfeld, Jack) [Transferred from Delaware on 8/26/2019.]
September 22, 2017 Filing 37 [SEALED] Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Stamatios Stamoulis regarding Supplemental Letter on Motion to Transfer - re 33 Order,,, #36 Letter. (Stamoulis, Stamatios) [Transferred from Delaware on 8/26/2019.]
September 20, 2017 Filing 36 [SEALED] Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Jack B. Blumenfeld regarding response to the Court's September 11, 2017 Order - re 33 Order,,,. (Blumenfeld, Jack) [Transferred from Delaware on 8/26/2019.]
September 20, 2017 Filing 35 [SEALED] Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Stamatios Stamoulis regarding Impact of Recent Decisions on Motion to Transfer - re 33 Order,,,. (Stamoulis, Stamatios) [Transferred from Delaware on 8/26/2019.]
September 12, 2017 Filing 34 Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Jack B. Blumenfeld regarding coordination of cases. (Blumenfeld, Jack) [Transferred from Delaware on 8/26/2019.]
September 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORAL ORDER: In light of the Court's filing today of its opinions in Boston Scientific Corporation ("BSC") v. Cook Group Incorporated, C.A. No. 15-980 (D.I. 315), and Bristol-Myers Squibb Co. ("BMS") v. Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc., C.A. No. 17-379 (D.I. 36), cases presenting venue challenges that may be similar in at least some respects to the venue challenge pending here, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: (1) on September 20, 2017, the parties shall file simultaneous opening letter briefs, not to exceed three (3) pages per side, addressing how the venue issue should be resolved here in light of BSC and BMS; and (2) on September 22, 2017, the parties shall file simultaneous responsive letter briefs, not to exceed two (2) pages per side. ORDERED by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 9/11/17. (ntl) [Transferred from Delaware on 8/26/2019.]
September 6, 2017 Filing 32 Official Transcript of Oral Argument Hearing held on August 24, 2017 en banc before Chief Judge Leonard P. Stark and Judge Christopher J. Burke. Court Reporter Brian Gaffigan, Telephone (302) 573-6360. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date, it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 9/27/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/10/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/5/2017. (bpg) [Transferred from Delaware on 8/26/2019.]
August 24, 2017 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Leonard P. Stark and Judge Christopher J. Burke - Oral Argument held on 8/24/2017. (Court Reporter B. Gaffigan.) (ntl) [Transferred from Delaware on 8/26/2019.]
August 23, 2017 Filing 31 Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Jack B. Blumenfeld regarding August 24, 2017 hearing. (Blumenfeld, Jack) [Transferred from Delaware on 8/26/2019.]
August 22, 2017 Filing 30 REDACTED VERSION of #27 Declaration by Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Mylan Technologies, Inc., Mylan, Inc.. (Stamoulis, Stamatios) [Transferred from Delaware on 8/26/2019.]
August 22, 2017 Filing 29 REDACTED VERSION of #26 Reply Brief by Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Mylan Technologies, Inc., Mylan, Inc.. (Stamoulis, Stamatios) [Transferred from Delaware on 8/26/2019.]
August 22, 2017 Filing 28 Joint STATUS REPORT by Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Pfizer Inc.. (Farnan, Michael) [Transferred from Delaware on 8/26/2019.]
August 18, 2017 Filing 27 [SEALED] DECLARATION re #26 Reply Brief of Keith Meckstroth by Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Mylan Technologies, Inc., Mylan, Inc.. (Stamoulis, Stamatios) [Transferred from Delaware on 8/26/2019.]
August 18, 2017 Filing 26 [SEALED] REPLY BRIEF re #13 MOTION to Dismiss for Improper Venue filed by Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Mylan Technologies, Inc., Mylan, Inc.. (Stamoulis, Stamatios) [Transferred from Delaware on 8/26/2019.]
August 18, 2017 Filing 25 REDACTED VERSION of #23 Brief (Combined Opening and Answering), by LTS Lohmann Therapie-Systeme AG, UCB Manufacturing Ireland Limited, UCB Pharma GmbH, UCB, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A-G)(Fahnestock, Derek) [Transferred from Delaware on 8/26/2019.]
August 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORAL ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that, in preparation for the consolidated oral argument on August 24, 2017, the parties in the following cases: UCB, Inc. v. Mylan Technologies, Inc. (C.A. No. 17-322-LPS), Mallinckrodt IP v. B. Braun Medical Inc. (C.A. No. 17-365-LPS; 17-660-LPS), and Bristol-Myers Squibb Company v. Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc. (C.A. No. 17-379-LPS), shall meet and confer and, no later than August 22, file one joint status report indicating how the parties propose to divide their time, which parties will present which issues, and the order of presentation. Ordered by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 8/17/17. (etg) [Transferred from Delaware on 8/26/2019.]
August 10, 2017 Filing 23 [SEALED] BRIEF (Combined Opening and Answering) re #22 MOTION to Transfer Case to District of Vermont (Conditional), #13 MOTION to Dismiss for Improper Venue filed by LTS Lohmann Therapie-Systeme AG, UCB Manufacturing Ireland Limited, UCB Pharma GmbH, UCB, Inc..Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 8/24/2017. Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 8/17/2017. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A-G)(Fahnestock, Derek) [Transferred from Delaware on 8/26/2019.]
August 10, 2017 Filing 22 MOTION to Transfer Case to District of Vermont (Conditional) - filed by LTS Lohmann Therapie-Systeme AG, UCB Manufacturing Ireland Limited, UCB Pharma GmbH, UCB, Inc.. (Fahnestock, Derek) [Transferred from Delaware on 8/26/2019.]
August 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORAL ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Court will hear consolidated oral argument on August 24, 2017 on the motions to dismiss for improper venue in the following cases: UCB, Inc. v. Mylan Technologies, Inc. (C.A. No. 17-322-LPS D.I. 13), Mallinckrodt IP v. B. Braun Medical Inc. (C.A. No. 17-365-LPS D.I. 12; 17-660-LPS D.I. 8), and Bristol-Myers Squibb Company v. Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc. (C.A. No. 17-379-LPS D.I. 14), with Chief Judge Stark and Magistrate Judge Burke jointly presiding. The parties in these cases present similar if not identical issues regarding venue in ANDA cases after the Supreme Court's decision in TC Heartland, and the Court will find it helpful to hear argument in all cases at the same time. The hearing will begin at 3:30 p.m., and each side, collectively, will have 45 minutes, divided among the parties as they see fit. In each of the cases identified in this Order, responsive briefs shall be filed no later than August 10, 2017 and reply briefs shall be filed no later than August 18, 2017. Ordered by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 8/1/2017. (etg) [Transferred from Delaware on 8/26/2019.]
July 26, 2017 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #20 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Kevin X. McGann, James S. Trainor, Jr. and Robert E. Counihan of WHITE & CASE LLP filed by UCB Manufacturing Ireland Limited, LTS Lohmann Therapie-Systeme AG, UCB, Inc., UCB Pharma GmbH. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 7/26/17. (ntl) [Transferred from Delaware on 8/26/2019.]
July 26, 2017 Filing 20 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Kevin X. McGann, James S. Trainor, Jr. and Robert E. Counihan of WHITE & CASE LLP - filed by LTS Lohmann Therapie-Systeme AG, UCB Manufacturing Ireland Limited, UCB Pharma GmbH, UCB, Inc.. (Fahnestock, Derek) [Transferred from Delaware on 8/26/2019.]
July 26, 2017 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #19 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Respond to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss for Improper Venue to August 10, 2017 filed by UCB Manufacturing Ireland Limited, LTS Lohmann Therapie-Systeme AG, UCB, Inc., UCB Pharma GmbH. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 7/26/17. (ntl) [Transferred from Delaware on 8/26/2019.]
July 25, 2017 Filing 19 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Respond to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss for Improper Venue to August 10, 2017 - filed by LTS Lohmann Therapie-Systeme AG, UCB Manufacturing Ireland Limited, UCB Pharma GmbH, UCB, Inc.. (Fahnestock, Derek) [Transferred from Delaware on 8/26/2019.]
July 25, 2017 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Stephanie M. Roberts,Deepro R. Mukerjee,Joseph M. Janusz,Lance A Soderstrom for Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc.,Stephanie M. Roberts,Deepro R. Mukerjee,Joseph M. Janusz,Lance A Soderstrom for Mylan Technologies, Inc.,Stephanie M. Roberts,Deepro R. Mukerjee,Joseph M. Janusz,Lance A Soderstrom for Mylan, Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (crb) [Transferred from Delaware on 8/26/2019.]
July 19, 2017 Filing 18 REDACTED VERSION of #15 Declaration by Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Mylan Technologies, Inc., Mylan, Inc.. (Stamoulis, Stamatios) [Transferred from Delaware on 8/26/2019.]
July 19, 2017 Filing 17 REDACTED VERSION of #14 Opening Brief in Support, by Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Mylan Technologies, Inc., Mylan, Inc.. (Stamoulis, Stamatios) [Transferred from Delaware on 8/26/2019.]
July 17, 2017 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #16 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Deepro R. Mukerjee, Lance Soderstrom, Stephanie Roberts and Joseph M. Janusz filed by Mylan Technologies, Inc., Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Mylan, Inc. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 7/17/17. (ntl) [Transferred from Delaware on 8/26/2019.]
July 14, 2017 Filing 16 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Deepro R. Mukerjee, Lance Soderstrom, Stephanie Roberts and Joseph M. Janusz - filed by Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Mylan Technologies, Inc., Mylan, Inc.. (Stamoulis, Stamatios) [Transferred from Delaware on 8/26/2019.]
July 13, 2017 Filing 15 [SEALED] DECLARATION re #13 MOTION to Dismiss for Improper Venue , #14 Opening Brief in Support, of Keith Meckstroth by Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Mylan Technologies, Inc., Mylan, Inc.. (Stamoulis, Stamatios) [Transferred from Delaware on 8/26/2019.]
July 13, 2017 Filing 14 [SEALED] OPENING BRIEF in Support re #13 MOTION to Dismiss for Improper Venue filed by Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Mylan Technologies, Inc., Mylan, Inc..Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 7/27/2017. (Stamoulis, Stamatios) [Transferred from Delaware on 8/26/2019.]
July 13, 2017 Filing 13 MOTION to Dismiss for Improper Venue - filed by Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Mylan Technologies, Inc., Mylan, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Stamoulis, Stamatios) [Transferred from Delaware on 8/26/2019.]
June 12, 2017 Filing 12 Amended Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Mylan Technologies, Inc., Mylan, Inc.. (Stamoulis, Stamatios) [Transferred from Delaware on 8/26/2019.]
May 10, 2017 Filing 11 ANSWER to #8 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by LTS Lohmann Therapie-Systeme AG, UCB Manufacturing Ireland Limited, UCB Pharma GmbH, UCB, Inc..(Fahnestock, Derek) [Transferred from Delaware on 8/26/2019.]
April 19, 2017 Filing 10 Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) US 6,699,498 B1; . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Stamoulis, Stamatios) [Transferred from Delaware on 8/26/2019.]
April 19, 2017 Filing 9 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Other Affiliate Abbott Laboratories for Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Mylan Technologies, Inc., Mylan, Inc. filed by Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Mylan Technologies, Inc., Mylan, Inc.. (Stamoulis, Stamatios) [Transferred from Delaware on 8/26/2019.]
April 19, 2017 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, , COUNTERCLAIM against All Plaintiffs by Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Mylan Technologies, Inc., Mylan, Inc..(Stamoulis, Stamatios) [Transferred from Delaware on 8/26/2019.]
March 30, 2017 Filing 7 DECLARATION of Mailing (as to service on Mylan Technologies, Inc. and Mylan Inc.) by LTS Lohmann Therapie-Systeme AG, UCB Manufacturing Ireland Limited, UCB Pharma GmbH, UCB, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - D)(Blumenfeld, Jack) [Transferred from Delaware on 8/26/2019.]
March 29, 2017 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by UCB Manufacturing Ireland Limited, UCB, Inc., UCB Pharma GmbH, LTS Lohmann Therapie-Systeme AG. Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc. served on 3/29/2017, answer due 4/19/2017. (Blumenfeld, Jack) [Transferred from Delaware on 8/26/2019.]
March 29, 2017 Case Assigned to Judge Leonard P. Stark. Please include the initials of the Judge (LPS) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb) [Transferred from Delaware on 8/26/2019.]
March 27, 2017 Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc. on 3/27/2017; Mylan Technologies, Inc. on 3/27/2017; Mylan, Inc. on 3/27/2017. Requesting party or attorney should pick up issued summons at the Help Desk, Room 4209, or call 302-573-6170 and ask the Clerk to mail the summons to them. (ceg) [Transferred from Delaware on 8/26/2019.]
March 24, 2017 Filing 5 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent UCB GmbH for UCB Pharma GmbH; Corporate Parent UCB S.A. for UCB Manufacturing Ireland Limited; Corporate Parent UCB S.A. through UCB Hoding Inc. for UCB, Inc.; Corporate Parent dievini Hopp BioTech Holding GmbH & Co. KG for LTS Lohmann Therapie-Systeme AG filed by LTS Lohmann Therapie-Systeme AG, UCB Manufacturing Ireland Limited, UCB Pharma GmbH, UCB, Inc. (ceg) [Transferred from Delaware on 8/26/2019.]
March 24, 2017 Filing 4 Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 6,884,434 B1; 7,413,747 B2; 8,246,979 B2; 8,246,980 B2; 8,617,591 B2. (ceg) [Transferred from Delaware on 8/26/2019.]
March 24, 2017 Filing 3 Supplemental information for patent cases involving an Abbreviated New Drug Application (ANDA) - Date Patentee(s) Received Notice: 2/28/2017. Date of Expiration of Patent: See Attached.Thirty Month Stay Deadline: 8/28/2019. (ceg) [Transferred from Delaware on 8/26/2019.]
March 24, 2017 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (ceg) [Transferred from Delaware on 8/26/2019.]
March 24, 2017 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT filed against Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Mylan Technologies, Inc., Mylan, Inc. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0311-2109676.) - filed by UCB Manufacturing Ireland Limited, UCB, Inc., UCB Pharma GmbH, LTS Lohmann Therapie-Systeme AG. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-E, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(ceg) [Transferred from Delaware on 8/26/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Vermont District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: UCB, Inc. et al v. Mylan Technologies, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UCB, Inc.
Represented By: Maryellen Noreika
Represented By: James S. Trainor, Jr., Esq.
Represented By: Derek J. Fahnestock, Esq.
Represented By: Eleanor G. Tennyson
Represented By: Anthony D. Raucci, Esq.
Represented By: Jack B. Blumenfeld, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LTS Lohmann Therapie-Systeme AG
Represented By: Maryellen Noreika
Represented By: Derek J. Fahnestock, Esq.
Represented By: Eleanor G. Tennyson
Represented By: Anthony D. Raucci, Esq.
Represented By: Jack B. Blumenfeld, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UCB Pharma GmbH
Represented By: Maryellen Noreika
Represented By: James S. Trainor, Jr., Esq.
Represented By: Derek J. Fahnestock, Esq.
Represented By: Eleanor G. Tennyson
Represented By: Anthony D. Raucci, Esq.
Represented By: Jack B. Blumenfeld, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UCB Manufacturing Ireland Limited
Represented By: Maryellen Noreika
Represented By: James S. Trainor, Jr., Esq.
Represented By: Derek J. Fahnestock, Esq.
Represented By: Eleanor G. Tennyson
Represented By: Anthony D. Raucci, Esq.
Represented By: Jack B. Blumenfeld, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: Joseph M. Janusz, Esq.
Represented By: Deepro R. Mukerjee, Esq.
Represented By: Stamatios Stamoulis, Esq.
Represented By: Lance A. Soderstrom, Esq.
Represented By: Jitendra Malik, Esq.
Represented By: Alissa M. Pacchioli, Esq.
Represented By: Stephanie M. Roberts, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mylan Technologies, Inc.
Represented By: Joseph M. Janusz, Esq.
Represented By: Deepro R. Mukerjee, Esq.
Represented By: Stamatios Stamoulis, Esq.
Represented By: Lance A. Soderstrom, Esq.
Represented By: Jitendra Malik, Esq.
Represented By: Alissa M. Pacchioli, Esq.
Represented By: Stephanie M. Roberts, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mylan, Inc.
Represented By: Joseph M. Janusz, Esq.
Represented By: Deepro R. Mukerjee, Esq.
Represented By: Stamatios Stamoulis, Esq.
Represented By: Lance A. Soderstrom, Esq.
Represented By: Jitendra Malik, Esq.
Represented By: Alissa M. Pacchioli, Esq.
Represented By: Stephanie M. Roberts, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: Mylan Technologies Inc.
Represented By: Stamatios Stamoulis, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?