Gregoire v. Weidmann Electrical Technology, Inc.
Plaintiff: Leonard Gregoire
Defendant: Weidmann Electrical Technology, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2019cv00158
Filed: September 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Vermont
Presiding Judge: Christina Reiss
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 14, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Benjamin J. Traverse, Esq on behalf of Weidmann Electrical Technology, Inc..(Traverse, Benjamin)
October 14, 2019 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed: Weidmann Electrical Technology, Inc. waiver sent on 9/14/2019, answer due 11/13/2019.(Traverse, Benjamin)
September 23, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF DOCKET ENTRY CORRECTION re: #1 Complaint filed by Leonard Gregoire. Attachments having been received are now attached to #1 as well as this entry. (Attachments: #1 Attachment B) (jlh)
September 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER GRANTING #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Judge Christina Reiss on 9/12/2019. (This is a text-only Order.) (ejh)
September 10, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis filed by Leonard Gregoire. (pac) (Main Document 2 replaced to include party names in caption on 9/12/2019) (jlh)
September 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Weidmann Electrical Technology, Inc. filed by Leonard Gregoire.Summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (pac) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/23/2019: #2 Attachment A, #3 Attachment B) (jlh).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Vermont District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gregoire v. Weidmann Electrical Technology, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leonard Gregoire
Represented By: Susan T. Edwards, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Weidmann Electrical Technology, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?