United States of America v. Sanders et al
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Any Tenants or Occupants Residing at 6281 Route 30 Unit 1, West Townshend, VT 05359 and Teresa Sanders
Case Number: 2:2019cv00161
Filed: September 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Vermont
Presiding Judge: Christina Reiss
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1345
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 8, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Donald F. Hayes, Esq on behalf of Teresa Sanders.(Hayes, Donald)
October 3, 2019 Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed: Teresa Sanders waiver sent on 9/12/2019, answer due 11/12/2019.(Ranaldo, Melissa)
September 12, 2019 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Compliance by United States of America. (Ranaldo, Melissa)
September 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Foreclosure by Power of Sale against Teresa Sanders, Any Tenants or Occupants Residing at 6281 Route 30 Unit 1, West Townshend, VT 05359 filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet) (pac)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Vermont District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Sanders et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Any Tenants or Occupants Residing at 6281 Route 30 Unit 1, West Townshend, VT 05359
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teresa Sanders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Melissa A. D. Ranaldo, AUSA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?