Groff v. Hertz Corporation
Plaintiff: Lori Groff
Defendant: Hertz Corporation
Not Yet Classified: ENE Evaluator
Case Number: 2:2019cv00162
Filed: September 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Vermont
Presiding Judge: William K Sessions
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 4, 2019 Filing 18 DISCOVERY CERTIFICATE - First Set of Interrogatories and Requests to Produce by Lori Groff.(law)
October 29, 2019 Filing 17 ASSIGNED Early Neutral Evaluator: Karen McAndrew, Esq. (eh)
October 28, 2019 Filing 16 EVALUATOR SELECTION Response by Lori Groff. (eh)
October 11, 2019 Filing 15 ENE LETTER re: Potential Evaluators sent; responses due by 10/28/2019. (hbc)
October 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #9 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Daniel I. Small; granting #10 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Paul H. Galligan. Signed by Judge William K. Sessions III on 10/7/2019. (eae)
October 3, 2019 Filing 13 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Local Rule 7.1(a) by Hertz Corporation (Kennedy, J.)
October 3, 2019 Filing 12 ANSWER to Complaint by Hertz Corporation.(Kennedy, J.)
October 3, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE OF DOCKET ENTRY CORRECTION re: #9 ASSENTED-TO MOTION for Appearance Pro Hac Vice of Daniel I. Small filed by Hertz Corporation. Exhibit A has been replaced to correct the date of admission. The corrected exhibit is now attached to #9 and this entry. (law)
September 30, 2019 Filing 10 ASSENTED-TO MOTION for Appearance Pro Hac Vice of Paul H. Galligan filed by Hertz Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Paul H. Galligan, #2 Exhibit A)(law)
September 30, 2019 Filing 9 ASSENTED-TO MOTION for Appearance Pro Hac Vice of Daniel I. Small filed by Hertz Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Daniel I. Small, #2 Exhibit A)(law) (Attachment 2 replaced on 10/3/2019) (law).
September 27, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE by Hertz Corporation of Filing #1 Notice of Removal. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (originally filed 9/18/2019 in state court)(law)
September 27, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Assigned Docket Number. (originally filed 7/29/2019 in state court)(law)
September 27, 2019 Filing 6 COMPLAINT against Hertz Corporation filed by Lori Groff. (Attachments: #1 Demand for Jury Trial, #2 Proposed Summons) (originally filed 7/26/2019 in state court)(law)
September 27, 2019 Filing 5 RECEIVED FILE and certified copy of docket sheet from State Court. (law)
September 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STIPULATION and ORDER Extending the Time for Defendant to Answer or Respond to Complaint. Hertz Corporation answer due by 10/3/2019. Signed by Judge William K. Sessions III on 9/20/2019. (jam)
September 20, 2019 Filing 3 STIPULATION Extending the Time for Defendant to Answer or Respond to Complaint by Hertz Corporation (Kennedy, J.)
September 16, 2019 Filing 2 LETTER to Vermont Superior Court, Civil Division, Chittenden Unit requesting original case file and certified docket sheet. (law)
September 16, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Hertz Corporation from Vermont Superior Court, Civil Division, Chittenden Unit, case number 641-7-19 Cncv. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(law)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Vermont District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Groff v. Hertz Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hertz Corporation
Represented By: J. Patrick Kennedy, Esq.
Represented By: Daniel I. Small, Esq.
Represented By: Paul H. Galligan, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lori Groff
Represented By: Christopher J. McVeigh, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: ENE Evaluator
Represented By: Karen McAndrew, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?